EP3258664 - MEDIA DATA PROCESSING METHOD AND APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.03.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.04.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.12.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.06.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 17.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE, MK | published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2017/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Shaobo Huawei Technologies Co.,Ltd. Intellectual Property Department G1-2F Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong / CN | 02 /
WANG, Xin Huawei Technologies Co.,Ltd. Intellectual Property Department G1-2F Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong / CN | 03 /
LIU, Yongliang Huawei Technologies Co.,Ltd. Intellectual Property Department G1-2F Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong / CN | 04 /
LIAN, Shiguo Huawei Technologies Co.,Ltd. Intellectual Property Department G1-2F Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong / CN | [2017/51] | Representative(s) | Kreuz, Georg Maria, et al Huawei Technologies Duesseldorf GmbH Riesstraße 25 80992 München / DE | [2020/21] |
Former [2017/51] | Kreuz, Georg Maria, et al Huawei Technologies Duesseldorf GmbH Riesstrasse 8 80992 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 17159498.9 | 01.12.2011 | [2017/51] | Priority number, date | CN20111069265 | 22.03.2011 Original published format: CN201110069265 | [2017/51] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3258664 | Date: | 20.12.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3258664 | Date: | 20.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.11.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06, H04L29/08, G06F21/60 | [2017/51] | CPC: |
H04L65/1069 (EP,US);
H04N21/835 (CN);
G06F21/60 (US);
H04L63/0428 (EP,US);
H04N21/26613 (CN);
H04L67/141 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/31] |
Former [2017/51] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | MEDIENDATENVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG | [2017/51] | English: | MEDIA DATA PROCESSING METHOD AND APPARATUS | [2017/51] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE TRAITEMENT DE DONNÉES MULTIMÉDIA | [2017/51] | Examination procedure | 07.03.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.06.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.06.2018 | Examination requested [2018/31] | 02.12.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.04.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 07.04.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.04.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP11861870.1 / EP2645663 | Opposition(s) | 23.02.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.12.2011 | AL | 20.05.2020 | AT | 20.05.2020 | CY | 20.05.2020 | CZ | 20.05.2020 | DK | 20.05.2020 | EE | 20.05.2020 | FI | 20.05.2020 | HR | 20.05.2020 | LT | 20.05.2020 | LV | 20.05.2020 | MC | 20.05.2020 | MK | 20.05.2020 | MT | 20.05.2020 | PL | 20.05.2020 | RO | 20.05.2020 | RS | 20.05.2020 | SE | 20.05.2020 | SI | 20.05.2020 | SK | 20.05.2020 | SM | 20.05.2020 | TR | 20.05.2020 | BG | 20.08.2020 | NO | 20.08.2020 | GR | 21.08.2020 | IS | 20.09.2020 | IE | 01.12.2020 | LU | 01.12.2020 | BE | 31.12.2020 | CH | 31.12.2020 | LI | 31.12.2020 | [2022/33] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 01.12.2011 | |
AL | 20.05.2020 | ||
AT | 20.05.2020 | ||
CY | 20.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 20.05.2020 | ||
DK | 20.05.2020 | ||
EE | 20.05.2020 | ||
FI | 20.05.2020 | ||
HR | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
MC | 20.05.2020 | ||
MT | 20.05.2020 | ||
PL | 20.05.2020 | ||
RO | 20.05.2020 | ||
RS | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
SI | 20.05.2020 | ||
SK | 20.05.2020 | ||
SM | 20.05.2020 | ||
TR | 20.05.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
NO | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
IE | 01.12.2020 | ||
LU | 01.12.2020 | ||
CH | 31.12.2020 | ||
LI | 31.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/52] | AL | 20.05.2020 | |
AT | 20.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 20.05.2020 | ||
DK | 20.05.2020 | ||
EE | 20.05.2020 | ||
FI | 20.05.2020 | ||
HR | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
MC | 20.05.2020 | ||
PL | 20.05.2020 | ||
RO | 20.05.2020 | ||
RS | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
SI | 20.05.2020 | ||
SK | 20.05.2020 | ||
SM | 20.05.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
NO | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
IE | 01.12.2020 | ||
LU | 01.12.2020 | ||
CH | 31.12.2020 | ||
LI | 31.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/47] | AL | 20.05.2020 | |
AT | 20.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 20.05.2020 | ||
DK | 20.05.2020 | ||
EE | 20.05.2020 | ||
FI | 20.05.2020 | ||
HR | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
MC | 20.05.2020 | ||
PL | 20.05.2020 | ||
RO | 20.05.2020 | ||
RS | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
SI | 20.05.2020 | ||
SK | 20.05.2020 | ||
SM | 20.05.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
NO | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
IE | 01.12.2020 | ||
LU | 01.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AL | 20.05.2020 | |
AT | 20.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 20.05.2020 | ||
DK | 20.05.2020 | ||
EE | 20.05.2020 | ||
FI | 20.05.2020 | ||
HR | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
MC | 20.05.2020 | ||
PL | 20.05.2020 | ||
RO | 20.05.2020 | ||
RS | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
SI | 20.05.2020 | ||
SK | 20.05.2020 | ||
SM | 20.05.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
NO | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
IE | 01.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/40] | AL | 20.05.2020 | |
AT | 20.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 20.05.2020 | ||
DK | 20.05.2020 | ||
EE | 20.05.2020 | ||
FI | 20.05.2020 | ||
HR | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
MC | 20.05.2020 | ||
PL | 20.05.2020 | ||
RO | 20.05.2020 | ||
RS | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
SI | 20.05.2020 | ||
SK | 20.05.2020 | ||
SM | 20.05.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
NO | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 20.05.2020 | |
AT | 20.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 20.05.2020 | ||
DK | 20.05.2020 | ||
EE | 20.05.2020 | ||
FI | 20.05.2020 | ||
HR | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
PL | 20.05.2020 | ||
RO | 20.05.2020 | ||
RS | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
SI | 20.05.2020 | ||
SK | 20.05.2020 | ||
SM | 20.05.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
NO | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 20.05.2020 | |
AT | 20.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 20.05.2020 | ||
DK | 20.05.2020 | ||
EE | 20.05.2020 | ||
FI | 20.05.2020 | ||
HR | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
PL | 20.05.2020 | ||
RO | 20.05.2020 | ||
RS | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
SK | 20.05.2020 | ||
SM | 20.05.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
NO | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 20.05.2020 | |
AT | 20.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 20.05.2020 | ||
DK | 20.05.2020 | ||
EE | 20.05.2020 | ||
FI | 20.05.2020 | ||
HR | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
RO | 20.05.2020 | ||
RS | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
SM | 20.05.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
NO | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 20.05.2020 | |
DK | 20.05.2020 | ||
FI | 20.05.2020 | ||
HR | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
RO | 20.05.2020 | ||
RS | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
SM | 20.05.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
NO | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 20.05.2020 | |
FI | 20.05.2020 | ||
HR | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
RS | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
NO | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 20.05.2020 | |
HR | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
RS | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
NO | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | FI | 20.05.2020 | |
HR | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
RS | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
NO | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 20.05.2020 | |
HR | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
NO | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 20.05.2020 | |
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
NO | 20.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 20.05.2020 | |
NO | 20.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | IS | 20.09.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - Frank Hartung ET AL, "DRM Protected Dynamic Adaptive HTTP Streaming", MMSys'11, February 23-25, 2011, San Jose, California, USA., (20110223), URL: http://www.hartung.fh-aachen.de/publications/ACM_MMSys2011_p277.pdf, (20130603), XP055064987 [A] 1-3 * abstract * * 2.1 Dynamic Adaptive HTTP Streaming (DASH) * * 3. DRM Protected DASH * * 3.2 Gap analysis: what is missing in the current standards * * 3.3 Proposed Extensions to DASH for Content Protection * * 3.3.1 MPD extensions * * 3.3.2 Architecture of Key Hierarchy * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/1943552.1943589 | [A] - 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT, "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Services and System Aspects; Transparent end-to-end Packet-switched Streaming Service (PSS); Protocols and codecs (Release 9), 3GPP TS 26.234 V9.4.0", 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT, (20100920), XP050442099 [A] 1-3 * 12.2.5.2 Media Presentation Description Attributes and Elements * * 12.7.1 Content Protection * | [A] - OPEN IPTV FORUM, "Specification HTTP Adaptive Streaming DRAFT V0.04.01", RELEASE 2, (20100423), XP050437971 [A] 1-3 * the whole document * |