EP3216507 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR IMPROVED PREFILTRATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.11.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.12.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.07.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.09.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.03.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 11.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE, SI | published on 20.03.2024 [2024/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Della Toffola S.p.A. Via Feltrina, 72 31040 Signoressa di Trevignano (TV) / IT | [2023/03] |
Former [2017/37] | For all designated states Della Toffola S.p.A. Via Feltrina, 72 31040 Trevignano / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DELLA TOFFOLA, Giacomo Via Montello, 74 31044 Montebelluna / IT | 02 /
BONOTTO, Amedeo Via Cal di Prade, 47 31028 Vazzola / IT | [2023/02] |
Former [2017/37] | 01 /
DELLA TOFFOLA, Giacomo Via Montello, 74 31044 MONTEBLLUNA / IT | ||
02 /
BONOTTO, Amedeo Via Cal di Prade, 47 31028 VAZZOLA / IT | Representative(s) | Marri, Luca Dragotti & Associati S.r.l. Via Paris Bordone, 9 31100 Treviso / IT | [2023/03] |
Former [2017/37] | Piovesana, Paolo Via F. Baracca, 5/a 30173 Venezia-Mestre / IT | Application number, filing date | 17159766.9 | 08.03.2017 | [2017/37] | Priority number, date | IT2016UA01501 | 09.03.2016 Original published format: IT UA20161501 | [2017/37] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3216507 | Date: | 13.09.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3216507 | Date: | 18.01.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.08.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B01D35/16, B01D29/44, B01D29/60, B01D29/64, B01D29/66, B01D29/86, B01D29/88 | [2017/37] | CPC: |
B01D29/44 (EP);
B01D29/603 (EP);
B01D29/6476 (EP);
B01D29/66 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/16] |
Former [2017/37] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG FÜR VERBESSERTE VORFILTRATION | [2017/37] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR IMPROVED PREFILTRATION | [2017/37] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE PRÉFILTRATION AMÉLIORÉE | [2017/37] | Examination procedure | 08.03.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.03.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.03.2018 | Examination requested [2018/16] | 23.09.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.03.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.07.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.12.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 06.12.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.12.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 19.10.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 18.01.2023 | DK | 18.01.2023 | EE | 18.01.2023 | FI | 18.01.2023 | HR | 18.01.2023 | LT | 18.01.2023 | LV | 18.01.2023 | MC | 18.01.2023 | NL | 18.01.2023 | PL | 18.01.2023 | RO | 18.01.2023 | RS | 18.01.2023 | SE | 18.01.2023 | SI | 18.01.2023 | SK | 18.01.2023 | SM | 18.01.2023 | IE | 08.03.2023 | LU | 08.03.2023 | BE | 31.03.2023 | CH | 31.03.2023 | LI | 31.03.2023 | GB | 18.04.2023 | NO | 18.04.2023 | GR | 19.04.2023 | IS | 18.05.2023 | PT | 18.05.2023 | [2024/11] |
Former [2024/09] | CZ | 18.01.2023 | |
DK | 18.01.2023 | ||
EE | 18.01.2023 | ||
FI | 18.01.2023 | ||
HR | 18.01.2023 | ||
LT | 18.01.2023 | ||
LV | 18.01.2023 | ||
MC | 18.01.2023 | ||
NL | 18.01.2023 | ||
PL | 18.01.2023 | ||
RO | 18.01.2023 | ||
RS | 18.01.2023 | ||
SE | 18.01.2023 | ||
SK | 18.01.2023 | ||
SM | 18.01.2023 | ||
IE | 08.03.2023 | ||
LU | 08.03.2023 | ||
CH | 31.03.2023 | ||
LI | 31.03.2023 | ||
GB | 18.04.2023 | ||
NO | 18.04.2023 | ||
GR | 19.04.2023 | ||
IS | 18.05.2023 | ||
PT | 18.05.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | CZ | 18.01.2023 | |
DK | 18.01.2023 | ||
EE | 18.01.2023 | ||
FI | 18.01.2023 | ||
HR | 18.01.2023 | ||
LT | 18.01.2023 | ||
LV | 18.01.2023 | ||
MC | 18.01.2023 | ||
NL | 18.01.2023 | ||
PL | 18.01.2023 | ||
RO | 18.01.2023 | ||
RS | 18.01.2023 | ||
SE | 18.01.2023 | ||
SK | 18.01.2023 | ||
SM | 18.01.2023 | ||
IE | 08.03.2023 | ||
LU | 08.03.2023 | ||
GB | 18.04.2023 | ||
NO | 18.04.2023 | ||
GR | 19.04.2023 | ||
IS | 18.05.2023 | ||
PT | 18.05.2023 | ||
Former [2024/02] | CZ | 18.01.2023 | |
DK | 18.01.2023 | ||
EE | 18.01.2023 | ||
FI | 18.01.2023 | ||
HR | 18.01.2023 | ||
LT | 18.01.2023 | ||
LV | 18.01.2023 | ||
MC | 18.01.2023 | ||
NL | 18.01.2023 | ||
PL | 18.01.2023 | ||
RO | 18.01.2023 | ||
RS | 18.01.2023 | ||
SE | 18.01.2023 | ||
SK | 18.01.2023 | ||
SM | 18.01.2023 | ||
LU | 08.03.2023 | ||
NO | 18.04.2023 | ||
GR | 19.04.2023 | ||
IS | 18.05.2023 | ||
PT | 18.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | CZ | 18.01.2023 | |
DK | 18.01.2023 | ||
EE | 18.01.2023 | ||
FI | 18.01.2023 | ||
HR | 18.01.2023 | ||
LT | 18.01.2023 | ||
LV | 18.01.2023 | ||
MC | 18.01.2023 | ||
NL | 18.01.2023 | ||
PL | 18.01.2023 | ||
RO | 18.01.2023 | ||
RS | 18.01.2023 | ||
SE | 18.01.2023 | ||
SK | 18.01.2023 | ||
SM | 18.01.2023 | ||
NO | 18.04.2023 | ||
GR | 19.04.2023 | ||
IS | 18.05.2023 | ||
PT | 18.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | CZ | 18.01.2023 | |
DK | 18.01.2023 | ||
EE | 18.01.2023 | ||
FI | 18.01.2023 | ||
HR | 18.01.2023 | ||
LT | 18.01.2023 | ||
LV | 18.01.2023 | ||
MC | 18.01.2023 | ||
NL | 18.01.2023 | ||
PL | 18.01.2023 | ||
RO | 18.01.2023 | ||
RS | 18.01.2023 | ||
SE | 18.01.2023 | ||
SM | 18.01.2023 | ||
NO | 18.04.2023 | ||
GR | 19.04.2023 | ||
IS | 18.05.2023 | ||
PT | 18.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | DK | 18.01.2023 | |
EE | 18.01.2023 | ||
FI | 18.01.2023 | ||
HR | 18.01.2023 | ||
LT | 18.01.2023 | ||
LV | 18.01.2023 | ||
MC | 18.01.2023 | ||
NL | 18.01.2023 | ||
PL | 18.01.2023 | ||
RS | 18.01.2023 | ||
SE | 18.01.2023 | ||
SM | 18.01.2023 | ||
NO | 18.04.2023 | ||
GR | 19.04.2023 | ||
IS | 18.05.2023 | ||
PT | 18.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | DK | 18.01.2023 | |
FI | 18.01.2023 | ||
HR | 18.01.2023 | ||
LT | 18.01.2023 | ||
LV | 18.01.2023 | ||
NL | 18.01.2023 | ||
PL | 18.01.2023 | ||
RS | 18.01.2023 | ||
SE | 18.01.2023 | ||
SM | 18.01.2023 | ||
NO | 18.04.2023 | ||
GR | 19.04.2023 | ||
IS | 18.05.2023 | ||
PT | 18.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/39] | FI | 18.01.2023 | |
HR | 18.01.2023 | ||
LT | 18.01.2023 | ||
LV | 18.01.2023 | ||
NL | 18.01.2023 | ||
PL | 18.01.2023 | ||
RS | 18.01.2023 | ||
SE | 18.01.2023 | ||
NO | 18.04.2023 | ||
GR | 19.04.2023 | ||
IS | 18.05.2023 | ||
PT | 18.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | FI | 18.01.2023 | |
HR | 18.01.2023 | ||
LT | 18.01.2023 | ||
LV | 18.01.2023 | ||
NL | 18.01.2023 | ||
PL | 18.01.2023 | ||
RS | 18.01.2023 | ||
SE | 18.01.2023 | ||
NO | 18.04.2023 | ||
GR | 19.04.2023 | ||
PT | 18.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | FI | 18.01.2023 | |
HR | 18.01.2023 | ||
LT | 18.01.2023 | ||
LV | 18.01.2023 | ||
NL | 18.01.2023 | ||
RS | 18.01.2023 | ||
SE | 18.01.2023 | ||
NO | 18.04.2023 | ||
GR | 19.04.2023 | ||
PT | 18.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | FI | 18.01.2023 | |
HR | 18.01.2023 | ||
LT | 18.01.2023 | ||
LV | 18.01.2023 | ||
NL | 18.01.2023 | ||
RS | 18.01.2023 | ||
SE | 18.01.2023 | ||
NO | 18.04.2023 | ||
PT | 18.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | HR | 18.01.2023 | |
LT | 18.01.2023 | ||
NL | 18.01.2023 | ||
RS | 18.01.2023 | ||
NO | 18.04.2023 | ||
PT | 18.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | LT | 18.01.2023 | |
NL | 18.01.2023 | ||
RS | 18.01.2023 | ||
PT | 18.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | LT | 18.01.2023 | |
NL | 18.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/31] | NL | 18.01.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2720314 (BOOTH GEORGE M) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US3249438 (TOPOL GEORGE J) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US4026806 (DRORI MORDEKI) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [Y]GB1535062 (SOCEA) [Y] 1-15 * claim 7 * * figure 4 * * page 3, line 85 - line 90 * * page 4, line 89 *; | [Y]US4436633 (ROBINSKY ELI I [CA], et al) [Y] 1-15 * column 3, line 41 - line 44 * * figure 1 *; | [Y]US2009277847 (SCHMIDT HARALD [DE], et al) [Y] 5,12* paragraph [0026] *; | [A]WO2012004649 (WAM IND SPA [IT], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [Y]US2014263106 (HAMPTON JOHN [US], et al) [Y] 4,13,14 * claim 1 *; | [A]US2015298035 (JAY JEFFREY [US]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | Examination | US2009314695 | by applicant | GB1535062 | US4436633 |