06.09.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] |
27.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] |
23.06.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.07.2023 [2023/30] |
02.06.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.07.2023 [2023/27] |
28.01.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.03.2022 [2022/09] |
14.01.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.02.2022 [2022/07] |
08.10.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.11.2021 [2021/45] |
14.05.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.06.2021 [2021/24] |
23.04.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.05.2021 [2021/21] |
23.04.2021 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 26.05.2021 [2021/21] |
05.03.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.04.2021 [2021/14] |
26.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.03.2021 [2021/13] |
19.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.03.2021 [2021/12] |
12.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.03.2021 [2021/11] |
05.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.03.2021 [2021/10] |
29.01.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.03.2021 [2021/09] |
25.12.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.01.2021 [2021/04] |
04.12.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.01.2021 [2021/01] |
20.11.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.12.2020 [2020/52] |
13.11.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.12.2020 [2020/51] |
06.11.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.12.2020 [2020/50] |
30.10.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.12.2020 [2020/49] |
23.10.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.11.2020 [2020/48] |
16.10.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.11.2020 [2020/47] |
15.05.2020 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 17.06.2020 [2020/25] |
09.05.2020 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
01.04.2020 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
01.04.2020 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
14.03.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
27.01.2020 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
05.12.2019 |
Change - classification |
published on 01.01.2020 [2020/01] |
05.12.2019 |
Change - classification |
published on 01.01.2020 [2020/01] |
02.12.2019 |
Change - representative |
|
16.11.2019 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
16.07.2019 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
16.03.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.12.2018 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
15.09.2018 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
20.08.2018 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
18.07.2018 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
06.07.2018 |
First examination report |
|
24.03.2018 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
18.08.2017 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 20.09.2017 [2017/38] |
18.08.2017 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
18.08.2017 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 20.09.2017 [2017/38] |
10.03.2017 |
Change - representative |
|