EP3229224 - ORGANIC LIGHT EMITTING DISPLAY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.11.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.06.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.05.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, PL, PT, SK | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Display Co., Ltd. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | [2017/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, YuHoon 105-805, 119, Dongjak-daero 29-gil, Dangjak-gu 06990 Seoul / KR | [2017/41] | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Straße 4 80335 München / DE | [2017/41] | Application number, filing date | 17160272.5 | 10.03.2017 | [2017/41] | Priority number, date | KR20160043732 | 08.04.2016 Original published format: KR 20160043732 | KR20160097304 | 29.07.2016 Original published format: KR 20160097304 | [2017/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3229224 | Date: | 11.10.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3229224 | Date: | 06.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.05.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G09G3/3225, G09G3/20, H10K59/121, H10K59/35, H10K59/123 | [2023/25] | CPC: |
G09G3/2003 (EP,US);
H10K59/353 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G09G3/2074 (US);
G09G3/3225 (EP,US);
G09G3/3266 (US);
H10K59/10 (CN);
H10K59/1213 (EP,KR,US);
H10K59/123 (EP,KR,US);
H10K59/131 (US);
H10K71/00 (KR);
G09G2300/0443 (US);
G09G2300/0452 (EP,US);
G09G2300/0809 (US);
G09G2310/0291 (US);
G09G2320/0646 (US);
|
Former IPC [2017/41] | G09G3/3225, G09G3/20, H01L27/32 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/01] |
Former [2017/41] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ORGANISCHE LICHTEMITTIERENDE ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG | [2017/41] | English: | ORGANIC LIGHT EMITTING DISPLAY DEVICE | [2017/41] | French: | AFFICHEUR ÉLECTROLUMINESCENT ORGANIQUE | [2017/41] | Examination procedure | 10.03.2017 | Examination requested [2017/41] | 10.03.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.11.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.07.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.11.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.03.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.05.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.09.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.01.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 08.05.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.10.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 25.10.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.10.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.12.2023 | CZ | 06.12.2023 | EE | 06.12.2023 | ES | 06.12.2023 | HR | 06.12.2023 | IT | 06.12.2023 | LT | 06.12.2023 | LV | 06.12.2023 | NL | 06.12.2023 | PL | 06.12.2023 | RO | 06.12.2023 | RS | 06.12.2023 | SE | 06.12.2023 | SK | 06.12.2023 | SM | 06.12.2023 | BG | 06.03.2024 | NO | 06.03.2024 | GR | 07.03.2024 | IS | 06.04.2024 | PT | 08.04.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 06.12.2023 | |
CZ | 06.12.2023 | ||
EE | 06.12.2023 | ||
ES | 06.12.2023 | ||
HR | 06.12.2023 | ||
LT | 06.12.2023 | ||
LV | 06.12.2023 | ||
NL | 06.12.2023 | ||
RO | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
SE | 06.12.2023 | ||
SM | 06.12.2023 | ||
BG | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
IS | 06.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | EE | 06.12.2023 | |
ES | 06.12.2023 | ||
HR | 06.12.2023 | ||
LT | 06.12.2023 | ||
LV | 06.12.2023 | ||
NL | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
SE | 06.12.2023 | ||
SM | 06.12.2023 | ||
BG | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
IS | 06.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | ES | 06.12.2023 | |
HR | 06.12.2023 | ||
LT | 06.12.2023 | ||
LV | 06.12.2023 | ||
NL | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
SE | 06.12.2023 | ||
SM | 06.12.2023 | ||
BG | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
IS | 06.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | ES | 06.12.2023 | |
HR | 06.12.2023 | ||
LT | 06.12.2023 | ||
LV | 06.12.2023 | ||
NL | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
SE | 06.12.2023 | ||
BG | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
IS | 06.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | ES | 06.12.2023 | |
HR | 06.12.2023 | ||
LT | 06.12.2023 | ||
LV | 06.12.2023 | ||
NL | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
SE | 06.12.2023 | ||
BG | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | ES | 06.12.2023 | |
HR | 06.12.2023 | ||
LT | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
SE | 06.12.2023 | ||
BG | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 06.12.2023 | |
BG | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 07.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2015144925 (BAEK HEUME IL [KR], et al) [X] 1,9-11* paragraphs [0148] - [0164]; figures 7,8 *; | [X]US2015364525 (LIN HSIN CHIH [CN], et al) [X] 1-8,11 * paragraphs [0003] , [0044]; figures 1,2 * | Examination | US2006027819 | JP2012028170 | by applicant | KR20140020120 | US9324262 |