EP3376367 - ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF THE TRANSFER OF A GOOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 09.09.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.04.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.03.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 17.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.09.2022 | Refusal of application | published on 12.10.2022 [2022/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | [2018/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KRÄNZLE, Ulrich Zum Weierle 20a 78333 Stockach / DE | [2018/38] | Representative(s) | Siemens Patent Attorneys Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/38] | Maier, Daniel Oliver Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 17160484.6 | 13.03.2017 | [2018/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3376367 | Date: | 19.09.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.08.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/16, G06F3/01 | [2018/38] | CPC: |
G02B27/017 (EP,US);
G06F1/163 (EP);
G06F3/011 (EP);
G06F3/012 (EP);
G06F3/013 (EP);
G06F3/017 (EP);
G06F3/0304 (EP);
G06Q10/087 (EP);
G06V10/17 (EP,US);
G06V30/224 (EP,US);
G02B2027/014 (EP);
G02B2027/0178 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/17] |
Former [2018/38] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | QUITTIEREN EINES ÜBERFÜHRENS EINES GUTES | [2018/38] | English: | ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF THE TRANSFER OF A GOOD | [2018/38] | French: | ACQUITTEMENT D'UN TRANSFERT DE BIEN | [2018/38] | Examination procedure | 19.03.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.03.2019 | Examination requested [2019/17] | 19.03.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.04.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.09.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.12.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.04.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.12.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.05.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.10.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.05.2022 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 13.06.2022 | 25.05.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2022/41] | 04.06.2022 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2022/41] | 13.06.2022 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2015212576 (AMBRUS ANTHONY J [US], et al) [A] 1-15* abstract *; | [I]US2015324568 (PUBLICOVER NELSON GEORGE [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0011] , [0113] , [ 201]; figures 5,17 *; | [A]DE102015214350 (SIEMENS HEALTHCARE GMBH [DE]) [A] 8-15 * abstract * |