15.11.2024 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 18.12.2024 [2024/51] |
19.01.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.02.2024 [2024/08] |
19.05.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.06.2023 [2023/25] |
14.04.2023 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 17.05.2023 [2023/20] |
17.02.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.03.2023 [2023/12] |
03.02.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.03.2023 [2023/10] |
27.01.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.03.2023 [2023/09] |
04.11.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.12.2022 [2022/49] |
21.10.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.11.2022 [2022/47] |
06.05.2022 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 08.06.2022 [2022/23] |
29.04.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.04.2022 |
Change - divisional application(s) |
published on 04.05.2022 [2022/18] |
25.03.2022 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
23.03.2022 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
23.03.2022 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
09.11.2021 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
23.10.2021 |
Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO |
|
22.10.2021 |
Change - applicant |
published on 24.11.2021 [2021/47] |
18.08.2021 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
08.05.2021 |
Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO |
|
28.04.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.02.2021 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
07.08.2020 |
Change - applicant |
published on 09.09.2020 [2020/37] |
30.05.2020 |
Change - representative |
|
28.04.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
21.03.2020 |
New entry: Decision on request for further processing |
|
16.03.2020 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
16.03.2020 |
New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing |
|
14.03.2020 |
New entry: Receipt of request for further processing |
|
14.01.2020 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
16.09.2019 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
28.05.2019 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
04.05.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.04.2019 |
Change - representative |
|
29.01.2019 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
02.01.2019 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
07.09.2018 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
24.08.2018 |
First examination report |
|
30.07.2018 |
New entry: Receipt of request for further processing |
|
30.07.2018 |
New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing |
|
20.06.2018 |
New entry: Decision on request for further processing |
|
11.06.2018 |
New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing |
|
11.06.2018 |
New entry: Receipt of request for further processing |
|
01.06.2018 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
02.05.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.03.2018 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
04.07.2017 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 02.08.2017 [2017/31] |
04.07.2017 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
04.07.2017 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 02.08.2017 [2017/31] |
17.03.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.03.2017 |
Change - representative |
|