EP3375557 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING BLANKS FOR ENDODONTIC INSTRUMENTS, AND SUCH BLANKS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.06.2024 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.03.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.09.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.03.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 17.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.07.2024 [2024/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Coltène/Whaledent GmbH + Co. KG Raiffeisenstrasse 30 89129 Langenau / DE | [2022/10] |
Former [2018/38] | For all designated states Coltène/Whaledent AG Feldwiesenstrasse 20 9450 Altstätten / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MANNSCHEDEL, Werner Käthe-Kollwitz-Weg 23 89129 Langenau / DE | [2018/38] | Representative(s) | Hepp Wenger Ryffel AG Friedtalweg 5 9500 Wil / CH | [2018/38] | Application number, filing date | 17161178.3 | 15.03.2017 | [2018/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3375557 | Date: | 19.09.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3375557 | Date: | 23.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.09.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B23H9/00, A61C5/42, // B23H1/00 | [2018/38] | CPC: |
B23H9/00 (EP);
A61C5/42 (EP);
B23H1/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/17] |
Former [2018/38] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON ROHLINGEN FÜR ENDODONTISCHE INSTRUMENTE SOWIE DERARTIGE ROHLINGE | [2018/38] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING BLANKS FOR ENDODONTIC INSTRUMENTS, AND SUCH BLANKS | [2018/38] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'ÉBAUCHES POUR INSTRUMENTS D'ENDODONTIE ET DE TELLES ÉBAUCHES | [2018/38] | Examination procedure | 15.03.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.03.2019 | Examination requested [2019/17] | 15.03.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.09.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.01.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.02.2023 | Date of oral proceedings | 24.02.2023 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 27.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 12.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 24.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.08.2023 | CZ | 23.08.2023 | DK | 23.08.2023 | EE | 23.08.2023 | ES | 23.08.2023 | FI | 23.08.2023 | HR | 23.08.2023 | IT | 23.08.2023 | LT | 23.08.2023 | LV | 23.08.2023 | NL | 23.08.2023 | PL | 23.08.2023 | RO | 23.08.2023 | RS | 23.08.2023 | SE | 23.08.2023 | SK | 23.08.2023 | SM | 23.08.2023 | NO | 23.11.2023 | GR | 24.11.2023 | IS | 23.12.2023 | PT | 26.12.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/23] | AT | 23.08.2023 | |
CZ | 23.08.2023 | ||
DK | 23.08.2023 | ||
EE | 23.08.2023 | ||
ES | 23.08.2023 | ||
FI | 23.08.2023 | ||
HR | 23.08.2023 | ||
LT | 23.08.2023 | ||
LV | 23.08.2023 | ||
NL | 23.08.2023 | ||
PL | 23.08.2023 | ||
RO | 23.08.2023 | ||
RS | 23.08.2023 | ||
SE | 23.08.2023 | ||
SK | 23.08.2023 | ||
SM | 23.08.2023 | ||
NO | 23.11.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | ||
IS | 23.12.2023 | ||
PT | 26.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 23.08.2023 | |
CZ | 23.08.2023 | ||
DK | 23.08.2023 | ||
FI | 23.08.2023 | ||
HR | 23.08.2023 | ||
LT | 23.08.2023 | ||
LV | 23.08.2023 | ||
NL | 23.08.2023 | ||
PL | 23.08.2023 | ||
RO | 23.08.2023 | ||
RS | 23.08.2023 | ||
SE | 23.08.2023 | ||
SM | 23.08.2023 | ||
NO | 23.11.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | ||
IS | 23.12.2023 | ||
PT | 26.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 23.08.2023 | |
FI | 23.08.2023 | ||
HR | 23.08.2023 | ||
LT | 23.08.2023 | ||
LV | 23.08.2023 | ||
NL | 23.08.2023 | ||
PL | 23.08.2023 | ||
RS | 23.08.2023 | ||
SE | 23.08.2023 | ||
SM | 23.08.2023 | ||
NO | 23.11.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | ||
IS | 23.12.2023 | ||
PT | 26.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 23.08.2023 | |
FI | 23.08.2023 | ||
HR | 23.08.2023 | ||
LT | 23.08.2023 | ||
LV | 23.08.2023 | ||
NL | 23.08.2023 | ||
PL | 23.08.2023 | ||
RS | 23.08.2023 | ||
SE | 23.08.2023 | ||
NO | 23.11.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | ||
IS | 23.12.2023 | ||
PT | 26.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 23.08.2023 | |
FI | 23.08.2023 | ||
LT | 23.08.2023 | ||
NL | 23.08.2023 | ||
SE | 23.08.2023 | ||
NO | 23.11.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | ||
IS | 23.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 23.08.2023 | |
NL | 23.08.2023 | ||
NO | 23.11.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US2004171333 (ALOISE CARLOS A [US], et al) [AD] 1* abstract *; | [XY]US2005100859 (GRAYBILL LONNIE M [US], et al) [X] 1,6-8 * paragraph [0012] * [Y] 9; | [XY]US2006185169 (LEWIS PAUL [US], et al) [X] 1,9 * figure 8 * [Y] 9; | [XY]US2016206401 (PERNOT JACQUES [FR], et al) [X] 1,3-5,7,8 * paragraph [0050] * * paragraph [0054] - paragraph [0055] * [Y] 9; | [E]EP3156163 (COLTÈNE/WHALEDENT AG [CH]) [E] 1,2,7-9 * claim 1 * * claims 7-9 * * paragraph [0011] * | Examination | US3762243 | EP0076997 | - YANZHEN ZHANG ET AL, "Study of the recast layer of a surface machined by sinking electrical discharge machining using water-in-oil emulsion as dielectric", APPLIED SURFACE SCIENCE, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM , NL, vol. 257, no. 14, doi:10.1016/J.APSUSC.2011.01.083, ISSN 0169-4332, (20110119), pages 5989 - 5997, (20110126), XP028368502 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.apsusc.2011.01.083 | by applicant | US6149501 | US7207111 |