EP3220496 - IGNITION PLUG [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.03.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.04.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.12.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.04.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.12.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 18.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NGK Spark Plug Co., Ltd. 14-18, Takatsuji-cho Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 4678525 / JP | [2017/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Inoue, Masahiro c/o NGK Spark Plug Co., Ltd., 14-18 Takatsuji-cho, Mizuho-ku, Nagoya-shi Aichi, 4678525 / JP | [2017/38] | Representative(s) | Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Josephspitalstr. 15 80331 München / DE | [2017/38] | Application number, filing date | 17161342.5 | 16.03.2017 | [2017/38] | Priority number, date | JP20160052004 | 16.03.2016 Original published format: JP 2016052004 | JP20160202561 | 14.10.2016 Original published format: JP 2016202561 | [2017/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3220496 | Date: | 20.09.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3220496 | Date: | 13.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.08.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H01T13/32, H01T13/39 | [2017/38] | CPC: |
H01T13/32 (EP,US);
H01T13/20 (CN,US);
H01T13/34 (US);
H01T13/39 (EP,US);
H01T13/52 (CN)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/03] |
Former [2017/38] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ZÜNDKERZE | [2017/38] | English: | IGNITION PLUG | [2017/38] | French: | BOUGIE D'ALLUMAGE | [2017/38] | Examination procedure | 16.03.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.12.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.12.2017 | Examination requested [2018/03] | 25.04.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.06.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.12.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.04.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 06.04.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.04.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 16.02.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.03.2017 | AL | 13.05.2020 | AT | 13.05.2020 | CY | 13.05.2020 | CZ | 13.05.2020 | DK | 13.05.2020 | EE | 13.05.2020 | ES | 13.05.2020 | FI | 13.05.2020 | HR | 13.05.2020 | IT | 13.05.2020 | LT | 13.05.2020 | LV | 13.05.2020 | MC | 13.05.2020 | MK | 13.05.2020 | MT | 13.05.2020 | NL | 13.05.2020 | PL | 13.05.2020 | RO | 13.05.2020 | RS | 13.05.2020 | SE | 13.05.2020 | SI | 13.05.2020 | SK | 13.05.2020 | SM | 13.05.2020 | TR | 13.05.2020 | BG | 13.08.2020 | NO | 13.08.2020 | GR | 14.08.2020 | IS | 13.09.2020 | PT | 14.09.2020 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 16.03.2017 | |
AL | 13.05.2020 | ||
AT | 13.05.2020 | ||
CY | 13.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 13.05.2020 | ||
DK | 13.05.2020 | ||
EE | 13.05.2020 | ||
ES | 13.05.2020 | ||
FI | 13.05.2020 | ||
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
MC | 13.05.2020 | ||
MK | 13.05.2020 | ||
NL | 13.05.2020 | ||
PL | 13.05.2020 | ||
RO | 13.05.2020 | ||
RS | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
SI | 13.05.2020 | ||
SK | 13.05.2020 | ||
SM | 13.05.2020 | ||
TR | 13.05.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2024/22] | HU | 16.03.2017 | |
AL | 13.05.2020 | ||
AT | 13.05.2020 | ||
CY | 13.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 13.05.2020 | ||
DK | 13.05.2020 | ||
EE | 13.05.2020 | ||
ES | 13.05.2020 | ||
FI | 13.05.2020 | ||
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
MC | 13.05.2020 | ||
MK | 13.05.2020 | ||
NL | 13.05.2020 | ||
PL | 13.05.2020 | ||
RO | 13.05.2020 | ||
RS | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
SI | 13.05.2020 | ||
SK | 13.05.2020 | ||
SM | 13.05.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 16.03.2017 | |
AL | 13.05.2020 | ||
AT | 13.05.2020 | ||
CY | 13.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 13.05.2020 | ||
DK | 13.05.2020 | ||
EE | 13.05.2020 | ||
ES | 13.05.2020 | ||
FI | 13.05.2020 | ||
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
MC | 13.05.2020 | ||
NL | 13.05.2020 | ||
PL | 13.05.2020 | ||
RO | 13.05.2020 | ||
RS | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
SI | 13.05.2020 | ||
SK | 13.05.2020 | ||
SM | 13.05.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2023/27] | HU | 16.03.2017 | |
AL | 13.05.2020 | ||
AT | 13.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 13.05.2020 | ||
DK | 13.05.2020 | ||
EE | 13.05.2020 | ||
ES | 13.05.2020 | ||
FI | 13.05.2020 | ||
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
MC | 13.05.2020 | ||
NL | 13.05.2020 | ||
PL | 13.05.2020 | ||
RO | 13.05.2020 | ||
RS | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
SI | 13.05.2020 | ||
SK | 13.05.2020 | ||
SM | 13.05.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AL | 13.05.2020 | |
AT | 13.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 13.05.2020 | ||
DK | 13.05.2020 | ||
EE | 13.05.2020 | ||
ES | 13.05.2020 | ||
FI | 13.05.2020 | ||
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
MC | 13.05.2020 | ||
NL | 13.05.2020 | ||
PL | 13.05.2020 | ||
RO | 13.05.2020 | ||
RS | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
SI | 13.05.2020 | ||
SK | 13.05.2020 | ||
SM | 13.05.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 13.05.2020 | |
AT | 13.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 13.05.2020 | ||
DK | 13.05.2020 | ||
EE | 13.05.2020 | ||
ES | 13.05.2020 | ||
FI | 13.05.2020 | ||
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
NL | 13.05.2020 | ||
PL | 13.05.2020 | ||
RO | 13.05.2020 | ||
RS | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
SI | 13.05.2020 | ||
SK | 13.05.2020 | ||
SM | 13.05.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 13.05.2020 | |
AT | 13.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 13.05.2020 | ||
DK | 13.05.2020 | ||
EE | 13.05.2020 | ||
ES | 13.05.2020 | ||
FI | 13.05.2020 | ||
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
NL | 13.05.2020 | ||
PL | 13.05.2020 | ||
RO | 13.05.2020 | ||
RS | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
SK | 13.05.2020 | ||
SM | 13.05.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 13.05.2020 | |
AT | 13.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 13.05.2020 | ||
DK | 13.05.2020 | ||
EE | 13.05.2020 | ||
ES | 13.05.2020 | ||
FI | 13.05.2020 | ||
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
NL | 13.05.2020 | ||
RO | 13.05.2020 | ||
RS | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
SM | 13.05.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 13.05.2020 | |
DK | 13.05.2020 | ||
ES | 13.05.2020 | ||
FI | 13.05.2020 | ||
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
NL | 13.05.2020 | ||
RO | 13.05.2020 | ||
RS | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
SM | 13.05.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 13.05.2020 | |
FI | 13.05.2020 | ||
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
NL | 13.05.2020 | ||
RS | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 13.05.2020 | |
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
RS | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | FI | 13.05.2020 | |
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
RS | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 13.05.2020 | |
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 13.05.2020 | |
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 13.05.2020 | |
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | IS | 13.09.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [IY]US2011148276 (SAKAYANAGI NOBUAKI [JP], et al) [I] 1,2,4 * paragraphs [0094] , [0097] , [0117] , [0120]; table 1 * * figures 5-7 * [Y] 5; | [IY]US2013069516 (SUMOYAMA DAISUKE [JP], et al) [I] 1,2 * paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0103] - paragraph [0104] * * paragraphs [0144] , [0156] , [0194]; table 13 * * figures 1,6 * [Y] 5; | [YDA]JP2015125879 (NGK SPARK PLUG CO) [YD] 5 * abstract * * figures 1,3,5 * [A] 1-4; | [A]US2012019120 (NAKAYAMA KATSUTOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-4 * paragraph [0085]; figure 3(B); claims 1,11 *; | [A]US2010289398 (KATO TOMOAKI [JP], et al) [A] 1,2,4 * figure 3 *; | [A]US2010109502 (NAKAYAMA KATSUTOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1,2,4 * figure 3B *; | [A]US2004189169 (TANIGUCHI YUTAKA [JP], et al) [A] 1,2 * figure 5(d); table 1 * | Examination | US2013200773 | JP2013041754 | by applicant | JP2015125879 |