13.09.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] |
27.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] |
12.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] |
29.03.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.05.2024 [2024/18] |
27.01.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.03.2023 [2023/09] |
20.01.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.02.2023 [2023/08] |
21.10.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.11.2022 [2022/47] |
05.08.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.09.2022 [2022/36] |
17.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.07.2022 [2022/29] |
27.05.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.06.2022 [2022/26] |
22.04.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.05.2022 [2022/21] |
22.04.2022 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 25.05.2022 [2022/21] |
18.02.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.03.2022 [2022/12] |
11.02.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.03.2022 [2022/11] |
04.02.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.03.2022 [2022/10] |
28.01.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.03.2022 [2022/09] |
21.01.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.02.2022 [2022/08] |
14.01.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.02.2022 [2022/07] |
19.11.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.12.2021 [2021/51] |
12.11.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.12.2021 [2021/50] |
05.11.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.12.2021 [2021/49] |
22.10.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.11.2021 [2021/47] |
15.10.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.11.2021 [2021/46] |
14.05.2021 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 16.06.2021 [2021/24] |
12.05.2021 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
12.05.2021 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
17.04.2021 |
Change - representative |
|
09.04.2021 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
30.03.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.01.2021 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
18.12.2020 |
Change - inventor |
|
30.03.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.11.2019 |
Change - representative |
|
23.09.2019 |
Change - representative |
|
03.04.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.03.2019 |
Change - request for examination |
published on 24.04.2019 [2019/17] |
20.03.2019 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
17.08.2018 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] |
17.08.2018 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
17.08.2018 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] |
17.03.2017 |
Change - representative |
|