EP3375856 - FABRIC SOFTENER COMPOSITION COMPRISING ENCAPSULATED BENEFIT AGENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.07.2021 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.03.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.01.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.10.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.12.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.03.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 17.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.05.2024 | New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of an appeal | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [2018/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FERNANDEZ-PRIETO, Susana Procter & Gamble Services Company NV Temselaan 100 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | 02 /
SMETS, Johan Procter & Gamble Services Company NV Temselaan 100 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | 03 /
SAVEYN, Pieter Jan Maria Procter & Gamble Services Company NV Temselaan 100 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | 04 /
ORLANDINI, Laura Procter & Gamble 47, route de Saint-Georges 1213 Petit-Lancy 1 / CH | [2018/38] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/35] | P&G Patent Belgium UK N.V. Procter & Gamble Services Company S.A. Temselaan 100 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | ||
Former [2018/38] | Yorquez Ramirez, Maria Isabel, et al Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited Whitley Road Longbenton Newcastle upon Tyne NE12 9TS / GB | Application number, filing date | 17161464.7 | 16.03.2017 | [2018/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3375856 | Date: | 19.09.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3375856 | Date: | 01.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.09.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C11D3/00, C11D3/50, C11D1/62, C11D3/22, C11D3/37, C11D17/00 | [2018/38] | CPC: |
C11D3/222 (EP,US);
C11D1/62 (EP,US);
C11D17/0039 (EP,US);
C11D3/0015 (EP,US);
C11D3/3757 (EP,US);
C11D3/3773 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/17] |
Former [2018/38] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | WEICHMACHERZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT VERKAPSELTEM PFLEGESTOFF | [2018/38] | English: | FABRIC SOFTENER COMPOSITION COMPRISING ENCAPSULATED BENEFIT AGENT | [2018/38] | French: | COMPOSITION D'ADOUCISSANT TEXTILE COMPRENANT UN AGENT BÉNÉFIQUE ENCAPSULÉ | [2018/38] | Examination procedure | 19.03.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.03.2019 | Examination requested [2019/17] | 19.03.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.01.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.04.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.10.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.01.2021 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 02.03.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.07.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 12.07.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.07.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
31.05.2022
02.06.2022
ADMISSIBLE Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158 Rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [2022/27] | 14.06.2022 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 24.10.2022 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 27.11.2023 | Date of oral proceedings | 16.01.2024 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 16.01.2024 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | Appeal following opposition | 14.03.2024 | Appeal received No. T0402/24 | 14.03.2024 | Payment of appeal fee | 16.05.2024 | Statement of grounds filed | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.03.2017 | AL | 01.09.2021 | AT | 01.09.2021 | CY | 01.09.2021 | CZ | 01.09.2021 | DK | 01.09.2021 | EE | 01.09.2021 | ES | 01.09.2021 | FI | 01.09.2021 | HR | 01.09.2021 | IT | 01.09.2021 | LT | 01.09.2021 | LV | 01.09.2021 | MC | 01.09.2021 | MK | 01.09.2021 | NL | 01.09.2021 | PL | 01.09.2021 | RO | 01.09.2021 | RS | 01.09.2021 | SE | 01.09.2021 | SI | 01.09.2021 | SK | 01.09.2021 | SM | 01.09.2021 | BG | 01.12.2021 | NO | 01.12.2021 | GR | 02.12.2021 | IS | 01.01.2022 | PT | 03.01.2022 | IE | 16.03.2022 | LU | 16.03.2022 | BE | 31.03.2022 | CH | 31.03.2022 | LI | 31.03.2022 | [2024/22] |
Former [2024/20] | HU | 16.03.2017 | |
AL | 01.09.2021 | ||
AT | 01.09.2021 | ||
CY | 01.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 01.09.2021 | ||
DK | 01.09.2021 | ||
EE | 01.09.2021 | ||
ES | 01.09.2021 | ||
FI | 01.09.2021 | ||
HR | 01.09.2021 | ||
IT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LV | 01.09.2021 | ||
MC | 01.09.2021 | ||
NL | 01.09.2021 | ||
PL | 01.09.2021 | ||
RO | 01.09.2021 | ||
RS | 01.09.2021 | ||
SE | 01.09.2021 | ||
SI | 01.09.2021 | ||
SK | 01.09.2021 | ||
SM | 01.09.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
NO | 01.12.2021 | ||
GR | 02.12.2021 | ||
IS | 01.01.2022 | ||
PT | 03.01.2022 | ||
IE | 16.03.2022 | ||
LU | 16.03.2022 | ||
BE | 31.03.2022 | ||
CH | 31.03.2022 | ||
LI | 31.03.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 16.03.2017 | |
AL | 01.09.2021 | ||
AT | 01.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 01.09.2021 | ||
DK | 01.09.2021 | ||
EE | 01.09.2021 | ||
ES | 01.09.2021 | ||
FI | 01.09.2021 | ||
HR | 01.09.2021 | ||
IT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LV | 01.09.2021 | ||
MC | 01.09.2021 | ||
NL | 01.09.2021 | ||
PL | 01.09.2021 | ||
RO | 01.09.2021 | ||
RS | 01.09.2021 | ||
SE | 01.09.2021 | ||
SI | 01.09.2021 | ||
SK | 01.09.2021 | ||
SM | 01.09.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
NO | 01.12.2021 | ||
GR | 02.12.2021 | ||
IS | 01.01.2022 | ||
PT | 03.01.2022 | ||
IE | 16.03.2022 | ||
LU | 16.03.2022 | ||
BE | 31.03.2022 | ||
CH | 31.03.2022 | ||
LI | 31.03.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 01.09.2021 | |
AT | 01.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 01.09.2021 | ||
DK | 01.09.2021 | ||
EE | 01.09.2021 | ||
ES | 01.09.2021 | ||
FI | 01.09.2021 | ||
HR | 01.09.2021 | ||
IT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LV | 01.09.2021 | ||
MC | 01.09.2021 | ||
NL | 01.09.2021 | ||
PL | 01.09.2021 | ||
RO | 01.09.2021 | ||
RS | 01.09.2021 | ||
SE | 01.09.2021 | ||
SI | 01.09.2021 | ||
SK | 01.09.2021 | ||
SM | 01.09.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
NO | 01.12.2021 | ||
GR | 02.12.2021 | ||
IS | 01.01.2022 | ||
PT | 03.01.2022 | ||
IE | 16.03.2022 | ||
LU | 16.03.2022 | ||
BE | 31.03.2022 | ||
CH | 31.03.2022 | ||
LI | 31.03.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AL | 01.09.2021 | |
AT | 01.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 01.09.2021 | ||
DK | 01.09.2021 | ||
EE | 01.09.2021 | ||
ES | 01.09.2021 | ||
FI | 01.09.2021 | ||
HR | 01.09.2021 | ||
IT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LV | 01.09.2021 | ||
MC | 01.09.2021 | ||
NL | 01.09.2021 | ||
PL | 01.09.2021 | ||
RO | 01.09.2021 | ||
RS | 01.09.2021 | ||
SE | 01.09.2021 | ||
SI | 01.09.2021 | ||
SK | 01.09.2021 | ||
SM | 01.09.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
NO | 01.12.2021 | ||
GR | 02.12.2021 | ||
IS | 01.01.2022 | ||
PT | 03.01.2022 | ||
IE | 16.03.2022 | ||
LU | 16.03.2022 | ||
CH | 31.03.2022 | ||
LI | 31.03.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AL | 01.09.2021 | |
AT | 01.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 01.09.2021 | ||
DK | 01.09.2021 | ||
EE | 01.09.2021 | ||
ES | 01.09.2021 | ||
FI | 01.09.2021 | ||
HR | 01.09.2021 | ||
IT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LV | 01.09.2021 | ||
MC | 01.09.2021 | ||
NL | 01.09.2021 | ||
PL | 01.09.2021 | ||
RO | 01.09.2021 | ||
RS | 01.09.2021 | ||
SE | 01.09.2021 | ||
SI | 01.09.2021 | ||
SK | 01.09.2021 | ||
SM | 01.09.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
NO | 01.12.2021 | ||
GR | 02.12.2021 | ||
IS | 01.01.2022 | ||
PT | 03.01.2022 | ||
IE | 16.03.2022 | ||
LU | 16.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AL | 01.09.2021 | |
AT | 01.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 01.09.2021 | ||
DK | 01.09.2021 | ||
EE | 01.09.2021 | ||
ES | 01.09.2021 | ||
FI | 01.09.2021 | ||
HR | 01.09.2021 | ||
IT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LV | 01.09.2021 | ||
MC | 01.09.2021 | ||
NL | 01.09.2021 | ||
PL | 01.09.2021 | ||
RO | 01.09.2021 | ||
RS | 01.09.2021 | ||
SE | 01.09.2021 | ||
SI | 01.09.2021 | ||
SK | 01.09.2021 | ||
SM | 01.09.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
NO | 01.12.2021 | ||
GR | 02.12.2021 | ||
IS | 01.01.2022 | ||
PT | 03.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 01.09.2021 | |
AT | 01.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 01.09.2021 | ||
DK | 01.09.2021 | ||
EE | 01.09.2021 | ||
ES | 01.09.2021 | ||
FI | 01.09.2021 | ||
HR | 01.09.2021 | ||
IT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LV | 01.09.2021 | ||
NL | 01.09.2021 | ||
PL | 01.09.2021 | ||
RO | 01.09.2021 | ||
RS | 01.09.2021 | ||
SE | 01.09.2021 | ||
SI | 01.09.2021 | ||
SK | 01.09.2021 | ||
SM | 01.09.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
NO | 01.12.2021 | ||
GR | 02.12.2021 | ||
IS | 01.01.2022 | ||
PT | 03.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 01.09.2021 | |
AT | 01.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 01.09.2021 | ||
EE | 01.09.2021 | ||
ES | 01.09.2021 | ||
FI | 01.09.2021 | ||
HR | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LV | 01.09.2021 | ||
NL | 01.09.2021 | ||
PL | 01.09.2021 | ||
RO | 01.09.2021 | ||
RS | 01.09.2021 | ||
SE | 01.09.2021 | ||
SK | 01.09.2021 | ||
SM | 01.09.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
NO | 01.12.2021 | ||
GR | 02.12.2021 | ||
IS | 01.01.2022 | ||
PT | 03.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AT | 01.09.2021 | |
CZ | 01.09.2021 | ||
EE | 01.09.2021 | ||
ES | 01.09.2021 | ||
FI | 01.09.2021 | ||
HR | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LV | 01.09.2021 | ||
NL | 01.09.2021 | ||
PL | 01.09.2021 | ||
RO | 01.09.2021 | ||
RS | 01.09.2021 | ||
SE | 01.09.2021 | ||
SK | 01.09.2021 | ||
SM | 01.09.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
NO | 01.12.2021 | ||
GR | 02.12.2021 | ||
IS | 01.01.2022 | ||
PT | 03.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 01.09.2021 | |
CZ | 01.09.2021 | ||
EE | 01.09.2021 | ||
ES | 01.09.2021 | ||
FI | 01.09.2021 | ||
HR | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LV | 01.09.2021 | ||
NL | 01.09.2021 | ||
PL | 01.09.2021 | ||
RO | 01.09.2021 | ||
RS | 01.09.2021 | ||
SE | 01.09.2021 | ||
SK | 01.09.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
NO | 01.12.2021 | ||
GR | 02.12.2021 | ||
IS | 01.01.2022 | ||
PT | 03.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 01.09.2021 | |
ES | 01.09.2021 | ||
FI | 01.09.2021 | ||
HR | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LV | 01.09.2021 | ||
PL | 01.09.2021 | ||
RS | 01.09.2021 | ||
SE | 01.09.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
NO | 01.12.2021 | ||
GR | 02.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | ES | 01.09.2021 | |
FI | 01.09.2021 | ||
HR | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LV | 01.09.2021 | ||
PL | 01.09.2021 | ||
RS | 01.09.2021 | ||
SE | 01.09.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
NO | 01.12.2021 | ||
GR | 02.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | ES | 01.09.2021 | |
FI | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
RS | 01.09.2021 | ||
SE | 01.09.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
NO | 01.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | ES | 01.09.2021 | |
FI | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
SE | 01.09.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
NO | 01.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | LT | 01.09.2021 | |
NO | 01.12.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2011054389 (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al) [A] 1-15* claim 12 *; | [Y]US2014338134 (FERNANDEZ PRIETO SUSANA [ES], et al) [Y] 1-15 * claims 1-22 *; | [Y]EP2824169 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0004] , [00 5] , [0 21] , [0 34] , [0 47] - [0053] - [0 92]; example -; claims 1, 12-14 * | by applicant | US4137180 | WO03062361 | WO2007062833 | US2007275866 | WO2008057985 | WO2008076753 | WO2008079693 | WO2009037060 | US2013109612 | WO2015006635 | EP2496676 | - DEARDEN JC; BRESNAN, "The Measurement of Partition Coefficients", MOLECULAR INFORMATICS, (1988), vol. 7, no. 3, pages 133 - 144 | Opposition | WO2011054389 | US2011269658 | EP2620211 | WO2013154675 | US2013310301 | US8765659 | US2014338134 | EP2824169 | US2015159119 | WO2016061435 | EP3339408 | EP3339411 | EP3375855 | - Anonymous, "The world's first commercial-scale production facility for microfibrillated celluose", Production Plant | Exilva, a product by Borregaard, (20161103), pages 1 - 2, XP055930554 | - Anonymous, "Appendix A -Experimental report. Section 1: preparation of microcapsule dispersions", BEAU de LOMENIE, (20220531), pages 1 - 7, XP055930562 | - Anonymous, "Information sheet of Ultra Downy Free & Gentle Liquid Fabric Conditioner", Downy, (20220519), page 1, XP055930542 |