EP3222488 - SUPPORT FOR FASTENING AN EUROBALISE AND FASTENING SYSTEM COMPRISING AT LEAST ONE SUCH SUPPORT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.05.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.05.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.01.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.09.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 31.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALSTOM Transport Technologies 48, rue Albert Dhalenne 93400 Saint-Ouen / FR | [2017/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZANETTI, Adrien 41, rue Francis Chirat 69100 VILLEURBANNE / FR | 02 /
BLANCHET, Damien 27, rue Joliot Curie 69780 MIONS / FR | 03 /
BROSSARD, Guillaume Pfarrstr. 101 10317 BERLIN / DE | 04 /
FAUCHEUX, Gregory 62 rue Rochon 69270 COUZON A LE MONT D'OR FRANCE / FR | [2017/39] | Representative(s) | Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [2017/39] | Application number, filing date | 17161668.3 | 17.03.2017 | [2017/39] | Priority number, date | FR20160052277 | 17.03.2016 Original published format: FR 1652277 | [2017/39] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3222488 | Date: | 27.09.2017 | Language: | FR | [2017/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3222488 | Date: | 27.06.2018 | Language: | FR | [2018/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.08.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B61L3/12 | [2017/39] | CPC: |
B61L3/121 (EP);
B61L3/126 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/42] |
Former [2017/39] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | HALTERUNG ZUR BEFESTIGUNG EINER EUROBALISE, UND BEFESTIGUNGSSYSTEM, DAS MINDESTENS EINE SOLCHE HALTERUNG UMFASST | [2017/39] | English: | SUPPORT FOR FASTENING AN EUROBALISE AND FASTENING SYSTEM COMPRISING AT LEAST ONE SUCH SUPPORT | [2017/39] | French: | SUPPORT DE FIXATION D'UNE EUROBALISE ET SYSTÈME DE FIXATION COMPORTANT AU MOINS UN TEL SUPPORT | [2017/39] | Examination procedure | 17.03.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.09.2017 | Examination requested [2017/42] | 18.01.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.05.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 14.05.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.05.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 28.03.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/23] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.03.2017 | AL | 27.06.2018 | CY | 27.06.2018 | CZ | 27.06.2018 | EE | 27.06.2018 | FI | 27.06.2018 | LT | 27.06.2018 | LV | 27.06.2018 | MC | 27.06.2018 | MK | 27.06.2018 | MT | 27.06.2018 | RS | 27.06.2018 | SI | 27.06.2018 | SK | 27.06.2018 | SM | 27.06.2018 | TR | 27.06.2018 | BG | 27.09.2018 | GR | 28.09.2018 | IS | 27.10.2018 | IE | 17.03.2019 | [2022/32] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 17.03.2017 | |
AL | 27.06.2018 | ||
CY | 27.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 27.06.2018 | ||
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
MC | 27.06.2018 | ||
MT | 27.06.2018 | ||
RS | 27.06.2018 | ||
SI | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
SM | 27.06.2018 | ||
TR | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
IE | 17.03.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 27.06.2018 | |
CY | 27.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 27.06.2018 | ||
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
MC | 27.06.2018 | ||
MT | 27.06.2018 | ||
RS | 27.06.2018 | ||
SI | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
SM | 27.06.2018 | ||
TR | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
IE | 17.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 27.06.2018 | |
CZ | 27.06.2018 | ||
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
MC | 27.06.2018 | ||
MT | 27.06.2018 | ||
RS | 27.06.2018 | ||
SI | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
SM | 27.06.2018 | ||
TR | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
IE | 17.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 27.06.2018 | |
CZ | 27.06.2018 | ||
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
MC | 27.06.2018 | ||
RS | 27.06.2018 | ||
SI | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
SM | 27.06.2018 | ||
TR | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
IE | 17.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 27.06.2018 | |
CZ | 27.06.2018 | ||
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
MC | 27.06.2018 | ||
RS | 27.06.2018 | ||
SI | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
SM | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
IE | 17.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 27.06.2018 | |
CZ | 27.06.2018 | ||
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
MC | 27.06.2018 | ||
RS | 27.06.2018 | ||
SI | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
SM | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/46] | CZ | 27.06.2018 | |
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
MC | 27.06.2018 | ||
RS | 27.06.2018 | ||
SI | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
SM | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | CZ | 27.06.2018 | |
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
RS | 27.06.2018 | ||
SI | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
SM | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | CZ | 27.06.2018 | |
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
RS | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
SM | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | CZ | 27.06.2018 | |
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
RS | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | EE | 27.06.2018 | |
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
RS | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 27.06.2018 | |
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
RS | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | FI | 27.06.2018 | |
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
RS | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | FI | 27.06.2018 | |
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
RS | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | FI | 27.06.2018 | |
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | FI | 27.06.2018 | |
LT | 27.06.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2002331935 (HIGASHI NIPPON RYOKAKU TETSUDO, et al) [A] 1-10* figures 1,3 *; | [A]JP2006205803 (HIGASHI NIPPON RYOKAKU TETSUDO, et al) [A] 1-10 * figures 1-8 * * figures 15-23 *; | [A]EP2386457 (SIEMENS SCHWEIZ AG [CH]) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0014] * * figures 1-4 *; | [A]DE102010020419 (DB NETZ AG [DE]) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0029] * * figure 2 * |