Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2019038758 | ![]() | 07.02.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US56173809 | 17.09.2009 | US16138709 | 18.03.2009 | US9771608 | 17.09.2008 | US201414188139 | 24.02.2014 | US98103610 | 29.12.2010 | US201615044949 | 16.02.2016 | US201715397177 | 03.01.2017 | US201815981423 | 16.05.2018 | US14168608 | 31.12.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2017112938 | ![]() | 27.04.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US56173809 | 17.09.2009 | US16138709 | 18.03.2009 | US9771608 | 17.09.2008 | US201414188139 | 24.02.2014 | US98103610 | 29.12.2010 | US201615044949 | 16.02.2016 | US201715397177 | 03.01.2017 | US14168608 | 31.12.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9566246 | ![]() | 14.02.2017 | B2 | US2016158159 | 09.06.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US56173809 | 17.09.2009 | US16138709 | 18.03.2009 | US9771608 | 17.09.2008 | US201414188139 | 24.02.2014 | US98103610 | 29.12.2010 | US201615044949 | 16.02.2016 | US14168608 | 31.12.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9265812 | ![]() | 23.02.2016 | B2 | US2015031631 | 29.01.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US56173809 | 17.09.2009 | US16138709 | 18.03.2009 | US9771608 | 17.09.2008 | US98103610 | 29.12.2010 | US201414188139 | 24.02.2014 | US14168608 | 31.12.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8329198 | ![]() | 11.12.2012 | B2 | US2012093886 | 19.04.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US56173809 | 17.09.2009 | US16138709 | 18.03.2009 | US201113281129 | 25.10.2011 | US9771608 | 17.09.2008 | US201113233824 | 15.09.2011 | US14168608 | 31.12.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8535695 | ![]() | 17.09.2013 | B2 | US2012009229 | 12.01.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US56173809 | 17.09.2009 | US16138709 | 18.03.2009 | US9771608 | 17.09.2008 | US201113233824 | 15.09.2011 | US14168608 | 31.12.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2011257095 | ![]() | 20.10.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US56173809 | 17.09.2009 | US16138709 | 18.03.2009 | US9771608 | 17.09.2008 | US98103610 | 29.12.2010 | US14168608 | 31.12.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2010105627 | ![]() | 29.04.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US56173809 | 17.09.2009 | US16138709 | 18.03.2009 | US9771608 | 17.09.2008 | US14168608 | 31.12.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11986529 | ![]() | 21.05.2024 | B2 | US2022370622 | 24.11.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US56173809 | 17.09.2009 | US16138709 | 18.03.2009 | US9771608 | 17.09.2008 | US201414188139 | 24.02.2014 | US98103610 | 29.12.2010 | US201615044949 | 16.02.2016 | US201715397177 | 03.01.2017 | US202217847012 | 22.06.2022 | US201815981423 | 16.05.2018 | US202016990071 | 11.08.2020 | US202217879441 | 02.08.2022 | US14168608 | 31.12.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11969471 | ![]() | 30.04.2024 | B2 | US2022370621 | 24.11.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US56173809 | 17.09.2009 | US16138709 | 18.03.2009 | US9771608 | 17.09.2008 | US201414188139 | 24.02.2014 | US98103610 | 29.12.2010 | US201615044949 | 16.02.2016 | US201715397177 | 03.01.2017 | US202217847012 | 22.06.2022 | US201815981423 | 16.05.2018 | US202016990071 | 11.08.2020 | US202217879430 | 02.08.2022 | US14168608 | 31.12.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11400159 | ![]() | 02.08.2022 | B2 | US2020397906 | 24.12.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US56173809 | 17.09.2009 | US16138709 | 18.03.2009 | US9771608 | 17.09.2008 | US201414188139 | 24.02.2014 | US98103610 | 29.12.2010 | US201615044949 | 16.02.2016 | US201715397177 | 03.01.2017 | US201815981423 | 16.05.2018 | US202016990071 | 11.08.2020 | US14168608 | 31.12.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101814186B | ![]() | 14.03.2018 | B1 | KR20160142408 | 12.12.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US16138709 | 18.03.2009 | US9771608 | 17.09.2008 | WO2009IB07155 | 17.09.2009 | US14168608 | 31.12.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101683314B | ![]() | 06.12.2016 | B1 | KR20110058886 | 01.06.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | US16138709 | 18.03.2009 | US9771608 | 17.09.2008 | WO2009IB07155 | 17.09.2009 | US14168608 | 31.12.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5623406B | ![]() | 12.11.2014 | B2 | JP2012502973 | 02.02.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | US16138709 | 18.03.2009 | US9771608 | 17.09.2008 | WO2009IB07155 | 17.09.2009 | US14168608 | 31.12.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL276157 | ![]() | 30.09.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | US16138709 | 18.03.2009 | US9771608 | 17.09.2008 | WO2009IB07155 | 17.09.2009 | US14168608 | 31.12.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL245172 | ![]() | 31.08.2020 | B | Priority number | Date | US16138709 | 18.03.2009 | US9771608 | 17.09.2008 | WO2009IB07155 | 17.09.2009 | US14168608 | 31.12.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL211799 | ![]() | 31.05.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US16138709 | 18.03.2009 | US9771608 | 17.09.2008 | WO2009IB07155 | 17.09.2009 | US14168608 | 31.12.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3861986 | ![]() | 11.08.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US16138709 | 18.03.2009 | US9771608 | 17.09.2008 | EP09814164 | 17.09.2009 | WO2009IB07155 | 17.09.2009 | EP17161908 | 17.09.2009 | US14168608 | 31.12.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2343982 | ![]() | 22.03.2017 | B1 | EP2343982 | 15.01.2014 | A4 | EP2343982 | 20.07.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US16138709 | 18.03.2009 | US9771608 | 17.09.2008 | WO2009IB07155 | 17.09.2009 | US14168608 | 31.12.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3080587 | ![]() | 13.02.2024 | C | CA3080587 | 25.03.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US16138709 | 18.03.2009 | US9771608 | 17.09.2008 | CA2963659 | 17.09.2009 | US14168608 | 31.12.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2963659 | ![]() | 23.06.2020 | C | CA2963659 | 25.03.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US16138709 | 18.03.2009 | US9771608 | 17.09.2008 | CA2737456 | 17.09.2009 | US14168608 | 31.12.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2737456 | ![]() | 23.05.2017 | C | CA2737456 | 25.03.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US16138709 | 18.03.2009 | US9771608 | 17.09.2008 | WO2009IB07155 | 17.09.2009 | US14168608 | 31.12.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2009294320B | ![]() | 16.04.2015 | B2 | AU2009294320 | 25.03.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US16138709 | 18.03.2009 | US9771608 | 17.09.2008 | WO2009IB07155 | 17.09.2009 | US14168608 | 31.12.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3210474 | ![]() | 18.11.2020 | B1 | EP3210474 | 30.08.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US16138709 | 18.03.2009 | US9771608 | 17.09.2008 | EP09814164 | 17.09.2009 | WO2009IB07155 | 17.09.2009 | US14168608 | 31.12.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI0918652 | 19.10.2021 | B1 | BRPI0918652 | 25.08.2015 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US16138709 | 18.03.2009 | US9771608 | 17.09.2008 | WO2009IB07155 | 17.09.2009 | US14168608 | 31.12.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102176900B | 26.09.2017 | B | CN102176900 | 07.09.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | US16138709 | 18.03.2009 | US9771608 | 17.09.2008 | WO2009IB07155 | 17.09.2009 | US14168608 | 31.12.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN106974888B | 02.08.2019 | B | CN106974888 | 25.07.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US16138709 | 18.03.2009 | US9771608 | 17.09.2008 | CN200980140593 | 17.09.2009 | US14168608 | 31.12.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CY1119148T | 04.04.2018 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US16138709 | 18.03.2009 | US9771608 | 17.09.2008 | WO2009IB07155 | 17.09.2009 | US14168608 | 31.12.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK2343982T | 10.07.2017 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US16138709 | 18.03.2009 | US9771608 | 17.09.2008 | WO2009IB07155 | 17.09.2009 | US14168608 | 31.12.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2629131T | 07.08.2017 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US16138709 | 18.03.2009 | US9771608 | 17.09.2008 | WO2009IB07155 | 17.09.2009 | US14168608 | 31.12.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB2482810 | 15.02.2012 | A | GB201119686D0 | 28.12.2011 | D0 | Priority number | Date | US16138709 | 18.03.2009 | US9771608 | 17.09.2008 | GB0916349 | 17.09.2009 | US14168608 | 31.12.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HRP20170929T | 22.09.2017 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US16138709 | 18.03.2009 | US9771608 | 17.09.2008 | EP09814164 | 17.09.2009 | WO2009IB07155 | 17.09.2009 | US14168608 | 31.12.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | LT2343982T | 25.07.2017 | T | Priority number | Date | US16138709 | 18.03.2009 | US9771608 | 17.09.2008 | WO2009IB07155 | 17.09.2009 | US14168608 | 31.12.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2011002836 | 28.04.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | US16138709 | 18.03.2009 | US9771608 | 17.09.2008 | WO2009IB07155 | 17.09.2009 | US14168608 | 31.12.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX348705 | 26.06.2017 | B | Priority number | Date | US16138709 | 18.03.2009 | US9771608 | 17.09.2008 | WO2009IB07155 | 17.09.2009 | US14168608 | 31.12.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX395136 | 25.03.2025 | B | Priority number | Date | US16138709 | 18.03.2009 | US9771608 | 17.09.2008 | WO2009IB07155 | 17.09.2009 | US14168608 | 31.12.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ591810 | 21.12.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | US16138709 | 18.03.2009 | US9771608 | 17.09.2008 | WO2009IB07155 | 17.09.2009 | US14168608 | 31.12.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL2343982T | 31.10.2017 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US16138709 | 18.03.2009 | US9771608 | 17.09.2008 | EP09814164 | 17.09.2009 | WO2009IB07155 | 17.09.2009 | US14168608 | 31.12.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2552324 | 10.06.2015 | C2 | RU2011115060 | 27.10.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | US16138709 | 18.03.2009 | US9771608 | 17.09.2008 | WO2009IB07155 | 17.09.2009 | US14168608 | 31.12.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | SI2343982T | 31.08.2017 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US16138709 | 18.03.2009 | US9771608 | 17.09.2008 | EP09814164 | 17.09.2009 | WO2009IB07155 | 17.09.2009 | US14168608 | 31.12.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | SMT201700304T | 07.09.2017 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US16138709 | 18.03.2009 | US9771608 | 17.09.2008 | EP09814164 | 17.09.2009 | WO2009IB07155 | 17.09.2009 | US14168608 | 31.12.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA201101657 | 29.05.2013 | B | Priority number | Date | US16138709 | 18.03.2009 | US9771608 | 17.09.2008 | WO2009IB07155 | 17.09.2009 | US14168608 | 31.12.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2010032140 | ![]() | 14.05.2010 | A3 | WO2010032140 | 25.03.2010 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US16138709 | 18.03.2009 | US9771608 | 17.09.2008 | US14168608 | 31.12.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7252934B | ![]() | 05.04.2023 | B2 | JP2021050240 | 01.04.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | US16138709 | 18.03.2009 | US9771608 | 17.09.2008 | US14168608 | 31.12.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2019048872 | ![]() | 28.03.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US16138709 | 18.03.2009 | US9771608 | 17.09.2008 | US14168608 | 31.12.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6771528B | ![]() | 21.10.2020 | B2 | JP2019048871 | 28.03.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US16138709 | 18.03.2009 | US9771608 | 17.09.2008 | US14168608 | 31.12.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2017088625 | ![]() | 25.05.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US16138709 | 18.03.2009 | US9771608 | 17.09.2008 | US14168608 | 31.12.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6258368B | ![]() | 10.01.2018 | B2 | JP2016074733 | 12.05.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US16138709 | 18.03.2009 | US9771608 | 17.09.2008 | US14168608 | 31.12.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2014074069 | ![]() | 24.04.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US16138709 | 18.03.2009 | US9771608 | 17.09.2008 | US14168608 | 31.12.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB2463978 | 29.02.2012 | B8 | GB2463978 | 22.02.2012 | B | GB2463978 | 07.04.2010 | A | GB0916349D0 | 28.10.2009 | D0 | Priority number | Date | US16138709 | 18.03.2009 | US9771608 | 17.09.2008 | US14168608 | 31.12.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1143072 | 24.12.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US16138709 | 18.03.2009 | US9771608 | 17.09.2008 | US14168608 | 31.12.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1243597 | 20.07.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US16138709 | 18.03.2009 | US9771608 | 17.09.2008 | US14168608 | 31.12.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HUE033611T | 28.12.2017 | T2 | Priority number | Date | US16138709 | 18.03.2009 | US9771608 | 17.09.2008 | US14168608 | 31.12.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT2343982T | 04.07.2017 | T | Priority number | Date | US16138709 | 18.03.2009 | US9771608 | 17.09.2008 | US14168608 | 31.12.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2678833 | 04.02.2019 | C2 | RU2015112963 | 20.12.2018 | A3 | RU2015112963 | 20.12.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | US16138709 | 18.03.2009 | US9771608 | 17.09.2008 | US14168608 | 31.12.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2019102221 | 28.07.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | US16138709 | 18.03.2009 | US9771608 | 17.09.2008 | US14168608 | 31.12.2008 | Type | ![]() | EP3861986 | Type | ![]() | EP2343982 |