Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3225434 | Global Dossier | 08.05.2019 | B1 | EP3225434 | 04.10.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR1652668 | 29.03.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR3049503 | 14.06.2019 | B1 | FR3049503 | 06.10.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR1652668 | 29.03.2016 |