EP3200246 - MANUFACTURING METHOD OF LIGHT EMITTING DIODE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 31.01.2020 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.04.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.02.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 04.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.01.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 04.03.2020 [2020/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seoul Semiconductor Co., Ltd. 59, Siheung-daero 153-gil Geumcheon-gu Seoul 153-801 / KR | [2017/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Choi, Hyuck Jung 406-1401 Daerim 1cha Apt. Sindorim-dong, Guro-gu 152-774 Seoul / KR | 02 /
Kim, Won Il 120-201, Hanmaeul Apt., Gaebongbon-dong Guro-gu 152-752 Seoul / KR | 03 /
Lee, Sang Min 301-406, Daewoo Apt. Eunhaeng-dong 429-060 Siheung-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2017/31] | Representative(s) | Stolmár & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Blumenstraße 17 80331 München / DE | [2017/31] | Application number, filing date | 17162555.1 | 17.08.2006 | [2017/31] | Priority number, date | KR20050078784 | 26.08.2005 Original published format: KR 20050078784 | [2017/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3200246 | Date: | 02.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.06.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H01L33/00, B29C45/14, B29C45/16, B29C45/27 | [2017/31] | CPC: |
B29C45/27 (EP,US);
B29C45/14655 (EP,US);
B29C45/1671 (EP,US);
H01L24/97 (EP,US);
B29C2045/0058 (EP,US);
B29C2045/2712 (EP,US);
B29C45/0055 (EP,US);
B29C45/02 (EP,US);
B29K2995/0025 (EP,US);
B29K2995/0026 (EP,US);
H01L2224/32257 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48091 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48227 (EP,US);
H01L2924/12041 (EP,US);
H01L2924/12042 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/48091, H01L2924/00014 (EP,US);
H01L2924/12041, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2924/12042, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2924/181, H01L2924/00012 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/11] |
Former [2017/31] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER LICHTEMITTIERENDEN DIODE | [2017/31] | English: | MANUFACTURING METHOD OF LIGHT EMITTING DIODE | [2017/31] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE DIODE ÉLECTROLUMINESCENTE | [2017/31] | Examination procedure | 23.03.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.02.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.02.2018 | Examination requested [2018/11] | 20.04.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.07.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.01.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.01.2020 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2020/10] | 27.01.2020 | Date of oral proceedings | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06783634.6 / EP1922762 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 23.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 31.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 31.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 31.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2001009863 (RHYTHM WATCH CO) [A] 1,8 * abstract *; | [A]JP2002344030 (STANLEY ELECTRIC CO LTD) [A] 1,8 * abstract *; | [A]JP2003031854 (STANLEY ELECTRIC CO LTD) [A] 1,8 * abstract *; | [A]JP2003218399 (ROHM CO LTD) [A] 1,8 * abstract * * figure 2 *; | [A]US6608334 (ISHINAGA HIROKI [JP]) [A] 1,8 * column 3, line 10 - line 11 ** column 4, line 5 - line 47 *; | [L]WO2007024069 (SEOUL SEMICONDUCTOR CO LTD [KR], et al) [L] 1,3,4,8,10,12 * paragraphs [0020] , [0 21] , [0 47] - [0053] * * figures 10-12 *; | [A] - "DOUBLE-SHOT MOLD AND GRIND METHOD FOR PRODUCING KEYBUTTON NOMENCLATURE", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, INTERNATIONAL BUSINESS MACHINES CORP. (THORNWOOD), US, (19791101), vol. 22, no. 6, ISSN 0018-8689, XP001173693 [A] 1,8 * figure 3 * |