EP3378421 - ENDOVASCULAR DEVICE NAVIGATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.07.2019 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 24.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.08.2019 [2019/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2018/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAHLERT, Joachim c/o Philips International B.V. Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
MUELLER, Manfred c/o Philips International B.V. Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2018/39] | Representative(s) | de Haan, Poul Erik, et al Philips International B.V. Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2018/39] | Application number, filing date | 17162730.0 | 24.03.2017 | [2018/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3378421 | Date: | 26.09.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.09.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/34, A61M39/02, A61B5/02, // A61B90/98, A61B5/00 | [2018/39] | CPC: |
A61B17/3423 (EP);
A61B5/6865 (EP,US);
A61B5/0004 (EP,US);
A61B5/0015 (EP,US);
A61B5/0215 (EP);
A61B5/6876 (US);
A61M39/0247 (EP);
A61B2017/00017 (EP);
A61B2017/00022 (EP);
A61B2017/00199 (EP);
A61B2017/00221 (EP);
A61B2017/00734 (EP);
A61B2090/064 (EP);
A61B2560/045 (EP);
A61B2562/0247 (EP,US);
A61B90/98 (EP);
A61M2039/0258 (EP,US);
A61M2039/0267 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/39] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NAVIGATION VON ENDOVASKULÄREN VORRICHTUNGEN | [2018/39] | English: | ENDOVASCULAR DEVICE NAVIGATION | [2018/39] | French: | NAVIGATION DE DISPOSITIF ENDOVASCULAIRE | [2018/39] | Examination procedure | 27.03.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/35] | 10.04.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2019/35] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2019 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US5484404 (SCHULMAN JOSEPH H [US], et al) [X] 1,2,7,8,10-12 * column 3, line 29 - column 7, line 6; figures 1-7 * [I] 3-6,9; | [A]WO2016064632 (COVIDIEN LP [US]) [A] 1-12 * paragraphs [0034] , [0036] , [0039] , [0041] , [0045] , [0049]; figures 1-4 *; | [A]US2004054352 (ADAMS H CLARK [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * paragraphs [0006] , [0027] , [0032] , [0034] , [0036] , [0039] , [0049]; figures 1-13 *; | [A]WO2005086753 (TRANSOMA MEDICAL INC [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * paragraphs [0019] , [0023] , [0025] , [0027] , [0037]; figures 1-7 * | by applicant | US183793 |