EP3225714 - TREATED ARTICLE AND SYSTEMS HAVING THE TREATED ARTICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2017/40] | TREATED ARTICLE, SYSTEM HAVING TREATED ARTICLE, AND PROCESS INCORPORATING TREATED ARTICLE | ||
[2023/22] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.08.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.09.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.05.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.10.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.05.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 01.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.09.2024 [2024/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Silcotek Corp. 225 Penn Tech Drive Bellefonte, Pennsylvania 16823 / US | [2017/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SMITH, David A. 181 Willow Bend Drive Bellefonte, PA Pennsylvania 16823 / US | [2017/40] | Representative(s) | Wallin, Nicholas James Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [2023/42] |
Former [2017/40] | Kutzenberger Wolff & Partner Theodor-Heuss-Ring 23 50668 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 17163632.7 | 29.03.2017 | [2017/40] | Priority number, date | US201662314488P | 29.03.2016 Original published format: US 201662314488 P | [2017/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3225714 | Date: | 04.10.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3225714 | Date: | 22.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3225714 | Date: | 18.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.10.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C23C8/02, C23C8/06, C23C8/08, C23C26/00, B05D5/08, B05D7/14, C23C16/46, C23C16/54, B32B15/04, B32B15/18, B32B15/20, C23C16/30, C22C19/05, C22C21/08, C22C38/00, C22C38/42, C22C38/44, C22C38/46, C22C38/58 | [2017/47] | CPC: |
B05D1/60 (EP,US);
C23C30/00 (KR);
C22C38/58 (EP,CN,US);
C23C16/30 (CN,KR,US);
B32B15/04 (US);
B32B15/18 (US);
B32B15/20 (US);
C22C19/053 (CN);
C22C19/055 (CN);
C22C19/056 (EP,CN,US);
C22C19/058 (CN);
C22C21/00 (CN);
C22C21/08 (EP,US);
C22C38/001 (EP,CN,US);
C22C38/002 (EP,CN,US);
C22C38/02 (EP,CN,US);
C22C38/04 (EP,US);
C22C38/06 (EP,US);
C22C38/42 (EP,US);
C22C38/44 (EP,CN,US);
C22C38/46 (EP,US);
C22C38/50 (EP,US);
C23C12/00 (US);
C23C12/02 (US);
F28F19/02 (KR);
B05D2202/00 (EP,US);
B05D2506/10 (EP,US);
B05D2518/10 (EP,US);
B05D3/044 (EP,US);
B05D5/083 (EP,US);
B05D7/146 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2017/40] | C23C8/02, C23C8/06, C23C8/08, C23C26/00, B05D5/08, B05D7/14, C23C16/46, C23C16/54 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/26] |
Former [2017/40] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | BEHANDELTER ARTIKEL UND SYSTEME MIT DEM BEHANDELTEN ARTIKEL | [2023/22] | English: | TREATED ARTICLE AND SYSTEMS HAVING THE TREATED ARTICLE | [2023/22] | French: | ARTICLE TRAITÉ ET SYSTÈMES AYANT CET ARTICLE TRAITÉ | [2023/22] |
Former [2017/40] | BEHANDELTER ARTIKEL, SYSTEM MIT BEHANDELTEM ARTIKEL UND VERFAHREN MIT VERWENDUNG DES BEHANDELTEN ARTIKELS | ||
Former [2017/40] | TREATED ARTICLE, SYSTEM HAVING TREATED ARTICLE, AND PROCESS INCORPORATING TREATED ARTICLE | ||
Former [2017/40] | ARTICLE TRAITÉ, SYSTÈME AYANT UN ARTICLE TRAITÉ ET PROCÉDÉ COMPRENANT UN ARTICLE TRAITÉ | Examination procedure | 29.03.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.05.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.05.2018 | Examination requested [2018/26] | 29.10.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.04.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 12.06.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.09.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.09.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 08.09.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.09.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 19.07.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/39] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 12.06.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 12.06.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 08.07.2020 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 18.10.2023 | ES | 18.10.2023 | HR | 18.10.2023 | PL | 18.10.2023 | RO | 18.10.2023 | RS | 18.10.2023 | SK | 18.10.2023 | SM | 18.10.2023 | NO | 18.01.2024 | GR | 19.01.2024 | IS | 18.02.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | CZ | 18.10.2023 | |
ES | 18.10.2023 | ||
HR | 18.10.2023 | ||
PL | 18.10.2023 | ||
RO | 18.10.2023 | ||
RS | 18.10.2023 | ||
SM | 18.10.2023 | ||
NO | 18.01.2024 | ||
GR | 19.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | ES | 18.10.2023 | |
HR | 18.10.2023 | ||
PL | 18.10.2023 | ||
RS | 18.10.2023 | ||
SM | 18.10.2023 | ||
NO | 18.01.2024 | ||
GR | 19.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | ES | 18.10.2023 | |
HR | 18.10.2023 | ||
PL | 18.10.2023 | ||
RS | 18.10.2023 | ||
NO | 18.01.2024 | ||
GR | 19.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | ES | 18.10.2023 | |
HR | 18.10.2023 | ||
RS | 18.10.2023 | ||
NO | 18.01.2024 | ||
GR | 19.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 19.01.2024 | |
IS | 18.02.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP1150345 (ASM JAPAN [JP]) [X] 1,5 * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0035] * * paragraph [0055] - paragraph [0057] * * claims 1-47 * [I] 2,3,10-12; | [XI]WO2010125926 (KONICA MINOLTA HOLDINGS INC [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,5 * the whole document * [I] 9-12; | [A]JP2013227628 (KOJIMA PRESS KOGYO KK) [A] 1-3,5,9 * paragraph [0054] - paragraph [0059] * * figure 2; claims 2-3 *; | [X]WO2014011251 (SILCOTEK CORP [US]) [X] 1-3,5,9-12 * claims 1,6,7-10, 15 * * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0011] ** paragraph [0062] - paragraph [0063] *; | [X]US2014370300 (SMITH DAVID A [US]) [X] 1-3,9-12 * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0044] * * paragraph [0055] - paragraph [0061] * * examples 10-11; claims 15-25,28-30 * | by applicant | EP0352061 | US5141567 | US6337459 | US6444268 | US6592993 | US2016049309 |