Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
05.02.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.03.2021 [2021/10] |
22.10.2020 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
16.10.2020 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
28.09.2020 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
25.09.2020 | First examination report | |
16.03.2019 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
16.03.2018 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
28.10.2017 | Amendment by applicant | |
31.08.2017 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 27.09.2017 [2017/39] |
31.08.2017 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
31.08.2017 | Request for examination filed | published on 27.09.2017 [2017/39] |
28.04.2017 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
01.04.2017 | Change - representative |