EP3223056 - MULTI-COLOUR ILLUMINATION APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.02.2021 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.09.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.02.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.03.2021 [2021/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Christie Digital Systems USA, Inc. 10550 Camden Drive Cypress, CA 90630 / US | [2017/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Guthrie, Simon 37 Wimbleton Cr. Kitchener, Ontario N2B 3K4 / CA | [2017/39] | Representative(s) | Richards, John, et al Ladas & Parry LLP Temple Chambers 3-7 Temple Avenue London EC4Y 0DA / GB | [2017/39] | Application number, filing date | 17163816.6 | 10.03.2014 | [2017/39] | Priority number, date | US201313796716 | 12.03.2013 Original published format: US201313796716 | [2017/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3223056 | Date: | 27.09.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.08.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G02B26/00, F21V9/10, G03B21/20, // H04N9/31 | [2017/39] | CPC: |
F21V9/45 (EP,US);
G02B26/008 (EP,US);
G03B21/2006 (US);
G03B21/204 (US);
H04N9/3155 (US);
H04N9/3197 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/39] | Title | German: | MEHRFARBIGE BELEUCHTUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2017/39] | English: | MULTI-COLOUR ILLUMINATION APPARATUS | [2017/39] | French: | APPAREIL D'ÉCLAIRAGE MULTICOLORE | [2017/39] | Examination procedure | 30.03.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.04.2017 | Examination requested [2017/39] | 24.10.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.09.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/10] | 23.10.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2021/10] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP14158575.2 / EP2778741 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2020 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US2011211333 (BARTLETT TERRY ALAN [US]) [Y] 1-4 * paragraphs [0022] , [0025] , [0049] * [A] 5-7; | [YA]WO2005067288 (THOMSON LICENSING SA [FR], et al) [Y] 1-4 * paragraph [0022] * [A] 5-7; | [AD]US7651243 (MCGUIRE JR JAMES P [US], et al) [AD] 1-7 * column 9, line 17 - line 30; figures 10A-10B *; | [AD]US2012201030 (YUAN XIANGLONG [US], et al) [AD] 1-7 * the whole document * | by applicant | US2416301 | US7651243 | US2012201030 | US7862182 | US7871168 | US6147720 |