EP3208247 - INTERMEDIATE FILM FOR LAMINATED GLASS AND LAMINATED GLASS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.01.2022 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.02.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.11.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.02.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 21.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.01.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.02.2022 [2022/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO., LTD. 4-4, Nishitemma 2-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530-8565 / JP | [2017/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Miyai, Jiro c/o SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO., LTD. 1259, Izumi Minakuchicho Koka-shi Shiga, 528-8585 / JP | [2017/34] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2017/34] | Application number, filing date | 17163846.3 | 11.05.2007 | [2017/34] | Priority number, date | JP20060134200 | 12.05.2006 Original published format: JP 2006134200 | [2017/34] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3208247 | Date: | 23.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3208247 | Date: | 17.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.06.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C03C27/12, B32B17/10, B60J1/00, B32B3/26, // G02B27/01, G10K11/168 | [2020/46] | CPC: |
G02B27/0101 (EP,KR,US);
C03C27/10 (KR);
B32B17/06 (US);
B32B17/10 (KR);
B32B17/10036 (EP,KR,US);
B32B17/10568 (EP,KR,US);
B32B17/10761 (EP,KR,US);
B32B17/10853 (EP,KR,US);
B32B27/06 (US);
B32B27/08 (EP,KR,US);
B32B27/30 (EP,KR,US);
B32B27/306 (EP,KR,US);
B32B27/42 (KR,US);
B32B3/263 (EP,KR,US);
B60J1/00 (KR);
E04B1/88 (KR,US);
G02B27/01 (EP,US);
G10K11/168 (KR,US);
B32B2307/102 (EP,KR,US);
B32B2307/412 (KR,US);
B32B2457/20 (KR,US);
B32B2605/08 (KR,US);
G02B2027/012 (KR,US);
G02B2027/0121 (EP,KR,US);
Y10T428/24479 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24612 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24967 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2017/34] | C03C27/12, B32B17/10, B60J1/00, // G02B27/01, G10K11/168 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2018/13] |
Former [2017/34] | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL | Title | German: | ZWISCHENFOLIE FÜR VERBUNDGLAS SOWIE VERBUNDGLAS | [2017/34] | English: | INTERMEDIATE FILM FOR LAMINATED GLASS AND LAMINATED GLASS | [2017/34] | French: | FILM INTERMÉDIAIRE POUR VERRE FEUILLETÉ ET VERRE FEUILLETÉ | [2017/34] | Examination procedure | 30.03.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.02.2018 | Examination requested [2018/13] | 21.02.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.11.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.02.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 08.02.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.02.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP07743194.8 / EP2017237 | Divisional application(s) | EP20212772.6 / EP3828150 | Opposition(s) | 20.12.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 22.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 23.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 13.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0420228 (HUGHES AIRCRAFT CO [US]) [Y] 1,3,4 * page 5, line 2 - page 6, line 50; figure -; table I *; | [Y]US2002120916 (SNIDER ALBERT MONROE [US]) [Y] 1,3,4 * paragraph [0021]; figure 1 *; | [Y]JP2002326847 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD) [Y] 1,3,4 * figures 1b,3c; examples 1,2; claim - *; | [XP]WO2006101960 (SOLUTIA INC [US], et al) [XP] 1,4 * page 5, line 15 - line 28; claim - ** page 18, line 1 - page 19, line 30; tables 3,4 *; | [XP]WO2006122305 (DU PONT [US], et al) [XP] 4 * page 19, line 7 - page 24, line 26 * * page 34, line 21 - page 35, line 7 * * page 39, line 6 - page 41, line 21 * * page 44, line 31 - page 45, line 28 * * page 51, line 12 - page 52, line 22; example 13 * * page 58, line 9 - page 61, line 13; examples 5A,6A,7A,8A,10A * * page 68, line 4 - page 73, line 13; examples 27A,27B,32A,32B * * claims 1-5 *; | [E]EP1800855 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP]) [E] 1,3,4 * page 5, column 8, line 38 - page 10, column 18, line 33; figures 1-3 * * paragraph [0104]; figure 7 * |