EP3246859 - CUSTOMIZABLE WEATHER ANALYSIS SYSTEM FOR USER-SPECIFIED NOTIFICATION THRESHOLDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.07.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.05.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 20.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Refusal of application | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Accuweather Inc. 385 Science Park Road State College, Pennsylvania 16803 / US | [2017/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RAINEY, R. Lee 784 Tanager Drive State College, PA Pennsylvania 16803 / US | 02 /
VINCENT, Bill 10005 West Bella Vista Wichita, KS Kansas 67212 / US | 03 /
MCGEEVER, Casey 2385 Pine Hurst Drive State College, PA Pennsylvania 16803 / US | 04 /
MASSUNG, Michelle L. 105 Oakwood Drive Philipsburg, PA Pennsylvania 16866 / US | 05 /
PAVLIK, Gregg 916-7 Southgate Drive State College, PA Pennsylvania 16801 / US | [2017/47] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [2017/47] | Application number, filing date | 17164366.1 | 10.09.2014 | [2017/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3246859 | Date: | 22.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.08.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/04, G06Q50/26 | [2017/47] | CPC: |
G06Q10/0635 (EP);
G06Q50/26 (EP,CN,KR);
G06F16/2455 (EP,CN,US);
G06F16/9537 (EP,CN,US);
G01W1/06 (US);
G01W1/10 (KR);
G06F16/22 (EP,US);
G06F16/248 (EP,CN,US);
G06F16/29 (EP,CN,US);
G06Q10/04 (EP);
G06Q10/06311 (EP);
G06Q10/06313 (EP);
G16Z99/00 (CN);
H04W4/02 (EP);
H04W4/025 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/26] |
Former [2017/47] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PERSONALISIERBARES WETTERANALYSESYSTEM FÜR NUTZERSPEZIFISCHE BENACHRICHTIGUNGSSCHWELLENWERTE | [2017/47] | English: | CUSTOMIZABLE WEATHER ANALYSIS SYSTEM FOR USER-SPECIFIED NOTIFICATION THRESHOLDS | [2017/47] | French: | SYSTÈME D'ANALYSE MÉTÉOROLOGIQUE PERSONNALISABLE POUR DES VALEURS SEUILS DE NOTIFICATIONS SPÉCIFIÉES PAR UN UTILISATEUR | [2017/47] | Examination procedure | 31.03.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.05.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.05.2018 | Examination requested [2018/26] | 12.07.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.01.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.01.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 30.01.2020 | 27.01.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2020/33] | 30.01.2020 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 06.02.2020 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2020/33] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP14901611.5 / EP3191985 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2004043760 (ROSENFELD DANIEL [IL], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0001] , [0 17] - [0023] * * paragraphs [0102] - [0106] *; | [I]US2006036366 (KELLY TERENCE F [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0010] - [0016] ** paragraphs [0034] - [0040] - [0 43] - [0050] *; | [I]US7084775 (SMITH MICHAEL R [US]) [I] 1-15 * columns 2-6 * * column 10, line 9 - column 11, line 62 *; | [I]US2011128144 (BARON SR ROBERT O [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0039] - [0067] * |