Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10744744 | Global Dossier | 18.08.2020 | B2 | US2015174862 | 25.06.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2013JP71046 | 02.08.2013 | JP2012172165 | 02.08.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20190039612 | Global Dossier | 12.04.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2013JP71046 | 02.08.2013 | JP2012172165 | 02.08.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101968071B | Global Dossier | 10.04.2019 | B1 | KR20180131645 | 10.12.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2013JP71046 | 02.08.2013 | JP2012172165 | 02.08.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101927041B | Global Dossier | 07.12.2018 | B1 | KR20180089563 | 08.08.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2013JP71046 | 02.08.2013 | JP2012172165 | 02.08.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101886913B | Global Dossier | 08.08.2018 | B1 | KR20150054755 | 20.05.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2013JP71046 | 02.08.2013 | JP2012172165 | 02.08.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPWO2014021459 | Global Dossier | 21.07.2016 | A1 | JP5676773B | 25.02.2015 | B2 | Priority number | Date | JP2013537972 | 02.08.2013 | WO2013JP71046 | 02.08.2013 | JP2012172165 | 02.08.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6192633B | Global Dossier | 06.09.2017 | B2 | JP2015107915 | 11.06.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2014262249 | 25.12.2014 | JP2012172165 | 02.08.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2881376 | Global Dossier | 30.08.2017 | B1 | EP2881376 | 16.03.2016 | A4 | EP2881376 | 10.06.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2013JP71046 | 02.08.2013 | JP2012172165 | 02.08.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN107962837 | Global Dossier | 27.04.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | CN201380040640 | 02.08.2013 | JP2012172165 | 02.08.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN104507887 | Global Dossier | 08.04.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2013JP71046 | 02.08.2013 | JP2012172165 | 02.08.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2878938 | Global Dossier | 10.09.2019 | C | CA2878938 | 06.02.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2013JP71046 | 02.08.2013 | JP2012172165 | 02.08.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2017200859B | Global Dossier | 07.12.2017 | B2 | AU2017200859 | 02.03.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | AU2017200859 | 08.02.2017 | AU2013297368 | 02.08.2013 | WO2013JP71046 | 02.08.2013 | JP2012172165 | 02.08.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2013297368B | Global Dossier | 10.11.2016 | B2 | AU2013297368 | 12.02.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2013JP71046 | 02.08.2013 | JP2012172165 | 02.08.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3205633 | Global Dossier | 27.06.2018 | B1 | EP3205633 | 16.08.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2012172165 | 02.08.2012 | EP13825162 | 02.08.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112015002011 | 08.06.2021 | B1 | BR112015002011 | 04.07.2017 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2013JP71046 | 02.08.2013 | JP2012172165 | 02.08.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IN204KOLNP2015 | 12.06.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2013JP71046 | 02.08.2013 | JP2012172165 | 02.08.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX338543 | 20.04.2016 | B | MX2015000972 | 10.04.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2013JP71046 | 02.08.2013 | JP2012172165 | 02.08.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2691796 | 18.06.2019 | C2 | RU2015106715 | 27.09.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2013JP71046 | 02.08.2013 | JP2012172165 | 02.08.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA201500661 | 26.10.2016 | B | Priority number | Date | WO2013JP71046 | 02.08.2013 | JP2012172165 | 02.08.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2014021459 | Global Dossier | 06.02.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2012172165 | 02.08.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2018177638 | Global Dossier | 15.11.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2012172165 | 02.08.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6370451B | Global Dossier | 08.08.2018 | B2 | JP2017218376 | 14.12.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2012172165 | 02.08.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA201600672 | 29.03.2017 | B | Priority number | Date | JP2012172165 | 02.08.2012 | Type | Earlier application | EP2881376 |