EP3229566 - CONNECTION ELEMENT FOR AN ELECTRONIC COMPONENT ARRANGEMENT AND PROCESS TO PRODUCE THE SAME, ELECTRONIC COMPONENT ARRANGEMENT AND PROCESS TO PRODUCE THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.02.2023 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.07.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.04.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 08.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.02.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.03.2023 [2023/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BIOTRONIK SE & Co. KG Woermannkehre 1 12359 Berlin / DE | [2017/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Henschel, Martin Drei-Linien-Weg 58A 13125 Berlin / DE | [2017/41] | Representative(s) | Biotronik Corporate Services SE Corporate Intellectual Property Sieversufer 7-9 12359 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/41] | Keck, Hans-Georg BIOTRONIK SE & Co. KG Corporate Intellectual Properties Woermannkehre 1 12359 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 17165000.5 | 05.04.2017 | [2017/41] | Priority number, date | DE201610106482 | 08.04.2016 Original published format: DE102016106482 | [2017/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3229566 | Date: | 11.10.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.09.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H05K3/34, H05K3/40, // H05K1/02, H05K1/11, H05K3/32 | [2017/41] | CPC: |
H05K3/3405 (EP,US);
H01R12/592 (US);
H01R4/029 (US);
H01R43/0221 (US);
H01R43/0256 (US);
H01R43/16 (US);
H05K3/328 (EP,US);
H05K3/4015 (EP,US);
H01R2201/12 (US);
H05K1/028 (EP,US);
H05K1/117 (EP,US);
H05K1/118 (EP,US);
H05K2201/0311 (EP,US);
H05K2201/053 (EP,US);
H05K2201/09063 (EP,US);
H05K2201/09081 (EP,US);
H05K2201/09172 (EP,US);
H05K2201/0949 (EP,US);
H05K2201/1028 (EP,US);
H05K2201/1034 (EP,US);
H05K2201/10757 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/21] |
Former [2017/41] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBINDUNGSELEMENT FÜR EINE ELEKTRONISCHE BAUELEMENTANORDNUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN DESSELBEN, ELEKTRONISCHE BAUELEMENTANORDNUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN DESSELBEN | [2017/41] | English: | CONNECTION ELEMENT FOR AN ELECTRONIC COMPONENT ARRANGEMENT AND PROCESS TO PRODUCE THE SAME, ELECTRONIC COMPONENT ARRANGEMENT AND PROCESS TO PRODUCE THE SAME | [2017/41] | French: | ÉLÉMENT DE LIAISON POUR UNE SYSTÈME DE COMPOSANT ÉLECTRONIQUE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION ET SYSTÈME DE COMPOSANT ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION | [2017/41] | Examination procedure | 05.04.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.04.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.04.2018 | Examination requested [2018/21] | 23.07.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.01.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.11.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/13] | 22.11.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2023/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2022 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3440925 (BBC BROWN BOVERI & CIE [DE]) [A] 6,15 * the whole document *; | [XI]EP0893945 (ROHM CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-5,9,11-14 * the whole document * [I] 6-8,10,15; | [XI]EP0907308 (ROHM CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-5,7,9-14 * paragraph [0020] - paragraphs [0025] , [0040]; figures 3-7 * [I] 6,8,15; | [A]WO2011030214 (MEDIZINISHE UNI WIEN [AT], et al) [A] 7* the whole document *; | [A]EP2334157 (HOSIDEN CORP [JP]) [A] 7 * the whole document *; | [A]EP2339903 (SAMSUNG SDI CO LTD [KR]) [A] 6,15 * paragraphs [0060] , [0061]; figure 6 * |