EP3220428 - LIGHT EMITTING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.12.2020 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.03.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.03.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.01.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 18.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.12.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.01.2021 [2021/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 1 Takumi-cho Sakai-ku Sakai-shi Osaka 590-8522 / JP | [2017/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HATA, Toshio c/o SHARP Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Takumi-cho Sakai-ku Sakai City Osaka, 590-8522 / JP | 02 /
AGATANI, Makoto c/o SHARP Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Takumi-cho Sakai-ku Sakai City Osaka, 590-8522 / JP | 03 /
UEMURA, Toyonori c/o SHARP Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Takumi-cho Sakai-ku Sakai City Osaka, 590-8522 / JP | 04 /
ISHIZAKI, Shinya c/o SHARP Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Takumi-cho Sakai-ku Sakai City Osaka, 590-8522 / JP | 05 /
MATSUSHITA, Hitoshi c/o SHARP Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Takumi-cho Sakai-ku Sakai City Osaka, 590-8522 / JP | [2017/38] | Representative(s) | Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB St.-Martin-Straße 58 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/38] | Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB St.-Martin-Strasse 58 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 17165018.7 | 22.03.2012 | [2017/38] | Priority number, date | JP20110119778 | 27.05.2011 Original published format: JP 2011119778 | JP20110149425 | 05.07.2011 Original published format: JP 2011149425 | [2017/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3220428 | Date: | 20.09.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.06.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H01L33/50, H01L25/075, H05K1/02, H05K1/11, F21K9/232, // F21V3/00, H05K3/28, F21Y115/10 | [2020/14] | CPC: |
H05B45/20 (EP,CN,US);
H05K1/0274 (EP,CN,US);
F21K9/232 (EP,CN,US);
F21K9/235 (US);
F21K9/237 (US);
F21K9/64 (US);
F21K9/68 (US);
F21V23/001 (US);
F21V29/77 (US);
F21V3/02 (US);
H01L25/0753 (EP,CN,US);
H05K1/11 (EP,CN,US);
F21V3/00 (EP,CN,US);
F21Y2101/00 (CN);
F21Y2115/10 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48137 (EP,CN,US);
H01L2924/3025 (EP,CN,US);
H01L33/508 (EP,CN,US);
H05B47/19 (EP,CN,US);
H05K2201/09909 (EP,CN,US);
H05K2201/10106 (EP,CN,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/3025, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2017/38] | H01L33/50, H01L25/075, H05K1/02, H05K1/11, // F21V3/00, H05K3/28 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/08] |
Former [2017/38] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | LICHTEMITTIERENDE VORRICHTUNG | [2017/38] | English: | LIGHT EMITTING DEVICE | [2017/38] | French: | DISPOSITIF ÉLECTROLUMINESCENT | [2017/38] | Examination procedure | 05.04.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.01.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.01.2018 | Examination requested [2018/08] | 13.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.07.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.11.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.03.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.04.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.07.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.10.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.12.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.03.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/01] | 21.08.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2021/01] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP12792316.7 / EP2717338 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2008055196 (IZUMIDA EIJI [JP]) [A] 3* paragraph [0006] *; | [XI]JP2008218485 (TOSHIBA LIGHTING & TECHNOLOGY) [X] 1,2,4,5 * paragraph [0050] - paragraph [0073]; figures 1-5 * [I] 3; | [XI]JP2008218486 (TOSHIBA LIGHTING & TECHNOLOGY) [X] 1,2,4,5 * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0043]; figures 1-3 * [I] 3 | by applicant | JP2002060747 | JP2003100108 | JP2004356116 | JP2006080334 | JP2011049516 |