EP3219884 - KEY, CORRESPONDING LOCK AND SYSTEM COMPRISING KEY AND LOCKS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.07.2020 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.06.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.02.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.01.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 18.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2020 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: RO | published on 26.08.2020 [2020/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EVVA Sicherheitstechnologie GmbH Wienerbergstrasse 59-65 1120 Wien / AT | [2017/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Baumhauer, Walter Gablenzgasse 32/24-26 1160 Wien / AT | [2017/38] | Representative(s) | Puchberger & Partner Patentanwälte Reichsratsstraße 13 1010 Wien / AT | [2017/38] | Application number, filing date | 17165193.8 | 31.08.2015 | [2017/38] | Priority number, date | AT20140000692 | 11.09.2014 Original published format: AT 6922014 | [2017/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3219884 | Date: | 20.09.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3219884 | Date: | 17.07.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.08.2017 | Classification | IPC: | E05B27/00, E05B29/00 | [2017/38] | CPC: |
E05B27/0082 (EP,AT,IL,RU,US);
E05B19/0017 (AT);
E05B29/0066 (EP,IL,US);
E05B27/0078 (RU,US);
E05B19/0052 (AT);
E05B19/0058 (RU,US);
E05B19/0064 (RU,US);
E05B27/00 (AT);
E05B27/0017 (RU,US);
E05B27/0096 (US);
E05B29/00 (AT);
E05B27/0053 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/07] |
Former [2017/38] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | 02.01.2018 | ME | 02.01.2018 | Title | German: | SCHLÜSSEL SOWIE ZUGEHÖRIGES SCHLOSS UND SYSTEM AUS SCHLÜSSEL UND SCHLÖSSERN | [2017/38] | English: | KEY, CORRESPONDING LOCK AND SYSTEM COMPRISING KEY AND LOCKS | [2017/38] | French: | CLÉ, SERRURE ASSOCIÉE ET SYSTÈME COMPRENNANT CLÉ ET SERRURES | [2018/50] |
Former [2017/38] | CLÉ, SERRURE ASSOCIÉE ET SYSTÈME COMPRENNANT CLÉ ET SERRURES | Examination procedure | 06.04.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.01.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.01.2018 | Examination requested [2018/07] | 05.02.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.06.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 03.06.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.06.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP15756656.3 / EP3191663 | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 17.07.2019 | [2020/35] |
Former [2020/23] | AL | 17.07.2019 | |
RO | 17.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AL | 17.07.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0335069 (EVVA WERKE [AT]) [A] 1,2,4-6,9-11,13-16 * column 1, lines 22-46; figure 1 * * column 2, line 30 - column 3, line 48 *; | [A]WO9110795 (KELLER ERNST [CH]) [A] 1-10,14,16,17 * page 2, paragraph 1 ** page 4, paragraph 1 - page 6, paragraph 1; figures 1-3 *; | [A]EP0613987 (EVVA WERKE [AT]) [A] 1-6,9,13-16 * column 1, lines 1-54 * * column 2, line 55 - column 5, line 30; figures 3-6 *; | [A]EP1712714 (EVVA WERKE [AT]) [A] 1,3-6,12,14-16 * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0007]; figures 1-5 * * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0024] *; | [A]DE102010052473 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [A] 1,2,4-8,12,14,15,17 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0210] - paragraph [0217]; figures 4-8 *; | [A]DE102010001790 (HUF HUELSBECK & FUERST GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-8,14 * paragraphs [0005] - [0014]; figures 1-9 * * paragraphs [0040] - [0048] * |