EP3229115 - CONTROL DEVICE, CONTROL METHOD, AND CONTROL PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 06.11.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.07.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.04.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 08.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.11.2020 | Refusal of application | published on 09.12.2020 [2020/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2017/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ITAKURA, Kota c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 02 /
NISHIGUCHI, Naoki c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2017/41] | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Cheapside House 138 Cheapside London EC2V 6BJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/41] | Sunderland, Andrew Michael Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | Application number, filing date | 17165315.7 | 06.04.2017 | [2017/41] | Priority number, date | JP20160078350 | 08.04.2016 Original published format: JP 2016078350 | [2017/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3229115 | Date: | 11.10.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.08.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/041, G06F3/14, G06F9/44, // G06F3/038 | [2017/41] | CPC: |
G06F3/0416 (EP,US);
G06F1/1643 (US);
G06F3/0412 (US);
G06F3/045 (US);
G06F3/04886 (US);
G06F3/1454 (EP,US);
G06F9/452 (EP,US);
G09G5/14 (EP,US);
G06F2203/0383 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/19] |
Former [2017/41] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STEUERUNGSVORRICHTUNG, STEUERUNGSVERFAHREN UND STEUERUNGSPROGRAMM | [2017/41] | English: | CONTROL DEVICE, CONTROL METHOD, AND CONTROL PROGRAM | [2017/41] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE, PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE ET PROGRAMME DE COMMANDE | [2017/41] | Examination procedure | 06.04.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.03.2018 | Examination requested [2018/19] | 05.04.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.07.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.01.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.09.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.06.2020 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2020/50] | 11.06.2020 | Date of oral proceedings | 15.07.2020 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 22.07.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2020/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2014085219 (CAI YI-WEN [TW], et al) [Y] 1-8 * paragraphs [0013] - [0024]; figures 1-4B *; | [Y]US2012050177 (SIMMONS MARTIN [GB]) [Y] 1-8 * paragraphs [0021] - [0038]; figures 3A-4 *; | [A]EP2228707 (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1-8 * paragraphs [0087] - [0104]; figure 7 * | by applicant | JP2013218468 | JP2015056172 |