EP3220429 - HIGH-PERFORMANCE LED FABRICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.10.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.12.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.03.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 18.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.11.2020 [2020/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Soraa Inc. 6500 Kaiser Drive Fremont, CA 94555 / US | [2017/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALDAZ, Rafael Soraa, Inc. 6500 Kaiser Drive Fremont, CA 94555 / US | 02 /
ANKIREDDI, Sai Soraa, Inc. 6500 Kaiser Drive Fremont, CA 94555 / US | 03 /
CICH, Michael J. Soraa, Inc. 6500 Kaiser Drive Fremont, CA 94555 / US | 04 /
DAVID, Aurelien J.F. Soraa, Inc. 6500 Kaiser Drive Fremont, CA 94555 / US | 05 /
DELILLE, Remi Soraa, Inc. 6500 Kaiser Drive Fremont, CA 94555 / US | 06 /
HURNI, Christophe Soraa, Inc. 6500 Kaiser Drive Fremont, CA 94555 / US | 07 /
KIM, Patrick Soraa, Inc. 6500 Kaiser Drive Fremont, CA 94555 / US | 08 /
KRAMES, Michael Ragan Soraa, Inc. 6500 Kaiser Drive Fremont, CA 94555 / US | 09 /
THOMSON, John Soraa, Inc. 6500 Kaiser Drive Fremont, CA 94555 / US | [2017/38] | Representative(s) | Diehl & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Erika-Mann-Straße 9 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/38] | Diehl & Partner GbR Patentanwälte Erika-Mann-Strasse 9 80636 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 17165385.0 | 05.02.2015 | [2017/38] | Priority number, date | US201461936000P | 05.02.2014 Original published format: US 201461936000 P | US201461989693P | 07.05.2014 Original published format: US 201461989693 P | US201462093855P | 18.12.2014 Original published format: US 201462093855 P | [2017/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3220429 | Date: | 20.09.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.06.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H01L33/60 | [2017/38] | CPC: |
H01L33/60 (EP);
H01L2224/14 (EP);
H01L2224/48091 (EP);
H01L33/20 (EP);
H01L33/32 (EP);
H01L33/62 (EP)
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/48091, H01L2924/00014 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/17] |
Former [2017/38] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNG VON HOCHLEISTUNGS-LED | [2017/38] | English: | HIGH-PERFORMANCE LED FABRICATION | [2017/38] | French: | FABRICATION DE DIODES ÉLECTROLUMINESCENTES DE HAUTE PERFORMANCE | [2017/38] | Examination procedure | 06.04.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.03.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.03.2018 | Examination requested [2018/17] | 12.12.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/47] | 14.07.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/47] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP15704450.4 / EP3103144 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US6573537 (STEIGERWALD DANIEL A [US], et al) [X] 1-4,13-16 * column 11, lines 11-33; figure 6 * [Y] 5-12; | [Y]US2013056776 (SU PO-JEN [TW], et al) [Y] 5-12 * paragraphs [0018] , [0029] , [0030] , [0032]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0035]; figure 2 *; | [Y]CN103178181 (MAO BANG ELECTRONIC CO LTD) [Y] 5-12 * paragraphs [0043] , [0045]; figures 7,9 *; | [Y]US2011220934 (GOTODA TORU [JP], et al) [Y] 5-12 * paragraph [0018]; figure 1 * | by applicant | US7053413 | US2013075770 | US7338828 | US7220324 | US7063741 | US2006037529 | US2011186874 | - SHEN ET AL., APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, (2007), vol. 91, page 141101 | - MICHIUE, PROCEEDINGS OF THE SPIE, (2009), vol. 7216, page 72161Z-1 | - GARDNER ET AL., APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, (2007), vol. 91, page 243506 | - TOMIYA, IEEE J. OF QUANTUM ELEC, (2004), vol. 10, no. 6 | - N. F. GARDNER ET AL., "Blue-emitting InGaN-GaN double-heterostructure light-emitting diodes reaching maximum quantum efficiency above 200 A/cm", APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, (2007), vol. 91, doi:doi:10.1063/1.2807272, page 243506, XP012104815 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.2807272 | US20080078704 | US20090497289 |