EP3388408 - METHOD AND PLANT FOR THE PRODUCTION OF BUTADIENE FROM ETHANOL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.08.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 14.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.10.2019 [2019/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Linde Aktiengesellschaft Klosterhofstrasse 1 80331 München / DE | [2018/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Peschel, Andreas Linde Aktiengesellschaft Badstr. 25a 82515 Wolfratshausen / DE | 02 /
Hentschel, Benjamin Linde Aktiengesellschaft Flemischweg 40 80689 München / DE | [2018/42] | Representative(s) | Frommberger, Moritz m patent group Postfach 33 04 29 80064 München / DE | [2018/42] | Application number, filing date | 17166077.2 | 11.04.2017 | [2018/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3388408 | Date: | 17.10.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.07.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C07C1/20, C07C11/167, C07C45/00, C07C1/207 | [2018/42] | CPC: |
C07C1/20 (EP);
C07C1/2072 (EP);
C07C45/002 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C07C1/2072, C07C11/167 (EP);
C07C1/20, C07C11/167 (EP);
C07C45/002, C07C47/22 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/42] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ANLAGE ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON BUTADIEN AUS ETHANOL | [2018/42] | English: | METHOD AND PLANT FOR THE PRODUCTION OF BUTADIENE FROM ETHANOL | [2018/42] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET INSTALLATION DESTINÉS À LA FABRICATION DE BUTADIÈNE À PARTIR D'ÉTHANOL | [2018/42] | Examination procedure | 18.04.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/40] | 08.05.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2019/40] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2019 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2403742 (MURRAY IRVIN L, et al) [X] 15 * claims 1-7 * * figure 1 * * column 4, line 24 - column 8, line 20 *; | [A]WO2016053201 (AGENCY SCIENCE TECH & RES [SG]) [A] 1-15 * figures 4, 9, 10 * * claim 1 *; | [A]GB331482 (SERGE VASSILIEWITSCH LEBEDEV) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]EP2918338 (LANXESS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0074] *; | [X]US2403741 (MURRAY IRVIN L, et al) [X] 15 * figure 1 * * column 4 - column 6 * | by applicant | US4882360 | US2013123377 | - BENDER, M., "An Overview of Industrial Processes for the Production of Olefins - C Hydrocarbons", CHEMBIOENG REVIEWS, (2014), vol. 1, pages 136 - 147 | - SUBRAMANI, S.K.; GANGWAL, "A Review of Recent Literature to Search for an Efficient Catalytic Process for the Conversion of Syngas to Ethanol", ENERGY & FUELS, (2008), vol. 22, pages 814 - 839 | - HU ET AL., "Conversion of Biomass-Derived Syngas to Alcohols and C Oxygenates using Supported Rh Catalysts in a Microchannel Reactor", CATALYSIS TODAY, (2007), vol. 120, doi:doi:10.1016/j.cattod.2006.07.006, pages 90 - 95, XP005847052 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cattod.2006.07.006 | - EZINKWO, G.O. ET AL., "Fundamental Issues of Catalytic Conversion of Bio-Ethanol into Butadiene", CHEMBIOENG REVIEWS, (2014), vol. 1, doi:doi:10.1002/cben.201400007, pages 194 - 203, XP055278037 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/cben.201400007 | - JONES, J.D., "Catalytic Transformation of Ethanol into 1,3-Butadiene", CHEMISTRY CENTRAL JOURNAL, (2014), vol. 8, doi:doi:10.1186/s13065-014-0053-4, page 53, XP021198793 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/s13065-014-0053-4 |