EP3264780 - CODING SYSTEMS USING SUPPLEMENTAL SEQUENCE PARAMETER SET FOR SCALABLE VIDEO CODING OR MULTI-VIEW CODING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2018/01] | CODING SYSTEMS | ||
[2019/49] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.04.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.05.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.05.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.03.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.11.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.11.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.07.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 01.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.04.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.06.2021 [2021/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dolby International AB Apollo Building, 3E Herikerbergweg 1-35 1101 CN Amsterdam Zuidoost / NL | [2018/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHU, Linhua 8 Xue Qing Road Haidan Beijing, 100085 / CN | 02 /
LUO, Jiancong 3404 Hunters Glen Dr. Plainsboro, New Jersey 08536 / US | 03 /
YIN, Peng 65 Warwick Road West Windsor, New Jersey 08550 / US | 04 /
YANG, Jiheng C117, Zhonglan Apartment Beijing University of Technology Pigle Yean 100; Chaoyang District Beijing, 100085 / CN | [2018/01] | Representative(s) | Dolby International AB Patent Group Europe 77 Sir John Rogerson's Quay Block C Grand Canal Docklands Dublin, D02 VK60 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/01] | Dolby International AB Patent Group Europe Apollo Building, 3E Herikerbergweg 1-35 1101 CN Amsterdam Zuidoost / NL | Application number, filing date | 17166196.0 | 07.04.2008 | [2018/01] | Priority number, date | US20070923993P | 18.04.2007 Original published format: US 923993 P | US20070824006 | 28.06.2007 Original published format: US 824006 | [2018/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3264780 | Date: | 03.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3264780 | Date: | 24.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.10.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04N21/434 | [2018/01] | CPC: |
H04N21/434 (EP,BR,US);
H04N21/234327 (EP,BR,US);
H04N19/70 (KR);
H04N19/30 (KR);
H04N19/50 (KR);
H04N21/234 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/32] |
Former [2018/01] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | CODIERUNGSSYSTEME MIT ZUSATZSEQUENZPARAMETERSATZ FÜR SKALIERBARE VIDEOCODIERUNG ODER MEHRFACHANSICHTSCODIERUNG | [2019/49] | English: | CODING SYSTEMS USING SUPPLEMENTAL SEQUENCE PARAMETER SET FOR SCALABLE VIDEO CODING OR MULTI-VIEW CODING | [2019/49] | French: | SYSTÈMES DE CODAGE UTILISANT UN ENSEMBLE DE PARAMÈTRES DE SÉQUENCE SUPPLÉMENTAIRE POUR CODAGE VIDÉO ÉVOLUTIF OU CODAGE MULTIVUES | [2019/49] |
Former [2018/01] | CODIERUNGSSYSTEME | ||
Former [2018/01] | CODING SYSTEMS | ||
Former [2018/01] | SYSTÈMES DE CODAGE | Examination procedure | 12.04.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.07.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.07.2018 | Examination requested [2018/32] | 05.11.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.05.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.11.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.03.2020 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 05.03.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 05.03.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.05.2020 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 18.05.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP08742644.1 / EP2147555 | EP12165846.2 / EP2528340 | Divisional application(s) | EP20162659.5 / EP3700221 | EP21214034.7 / EP4054201 | Opposition(s) | 25.03.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 29.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 05.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 24.06.2020 | PL | 24.06.2020 | RO | 24.06.2020 | GR | 25.09.2020 | PT | 26.10.2020 | [2021/10] |
Former [2021/09] | ES | 24.06.2020 | |
RO | 24.06.2020 | ||
GR | 25.09.2020 | ||
PT | 26.10.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | GR | 25.09.2020 |