30.04.2021 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 02.06.2021 [2021/22] |
05.03.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.04.2021 [2021/14] |
05.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.03.2021 [2021/10] |
29.01.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.03.2021 [2021/09] |
06.11.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.12.2020 [2020/50] |
22.05.2020 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 24.06.2020 [2020/26] |
18.05.2020 |
New entry: Information about intention to grant a patent |
|
18.05.2020 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
15.05.2020 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
15.05.2020 |
Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO |
|
13.03.2020 |
Change - divisional application(s) |
published on 15.04.2020 [2020/16] |
09.03.2020 |
Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO |
|
09.03.2020 |
Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO |
|
09.03.2020 |
Deletion: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
07.03.2020 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
07.03.2020 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
07.03.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.11.2019 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
01.11.2019 |
Change - German title |
published on 04.12.2019 [2019/49] |
01.11.2019 |
Change - English title |
published on 04.12.2019 [2019/49] |
01.11.2019 |
Change - French title |
published on 04.12.2019 [2019/49] |
06.05.2019 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
04.05.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.03.2019 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
13.11.2018 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
02.11.2018 |
First examination report |
|
09.07.2018 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
06.07.2018 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
06.07.2018 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 08.08.2018 [2018/32] |
06.07.2018 |
Change - designated states |
published on 08.08.2018 [2018/32] |
02.05.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.12.2017 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 03.01.2018 [2018/01] |
18.08.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.04.2017 |
Change - representative |
|