Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2009005627 | Global Dossier | 08.01.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US82400607 | 28.06.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2008128388 | Global Dossier | 30.10.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US92399307 | 18.04.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2015131743 | Global Dossier | 14.05.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US92399307 | 18.04.2007 | US201514602631 | 22.01.2015 | US201314075528 | 08.11.2013 | US45086810 | 05.03.2010 | WO2008US04530 | 07.04.2008 | US82400607 | 28.06.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2014072058 | Global Dossier | 13.03.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201314075528 | 08.11.2013 | US45086810 | 05.03.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8619871 | Global Dossier | 31.12.2013 | B2 | US2010195738 | 05.08.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US92399307 | 18.04.2007 | US45086808 | 07.04.2008 | WO2008US04530 | 07.04.2008 | US82400607 | 28.06.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2010142613 | Global Dossier | 10.06.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US92399307 | 18.04.2007 | US45087007 | 20.06.2007 | WO2007CN02031 | 29.06.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2009003431 | Global Dossier | 01.01.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US82400607 | 28.06.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11412265 | Global Dossier | 09.08.2022 | B2 | US2021120273 | 22.04.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US92399307 | 18.04.2007 | US202017087763 | 03.11.2020 | US201514602631 | 22.01.2015 | US201314075528 | 08.11.2013 | US201916394987 | 25.04.2019 | US45086810 | 05.03.2010 | US82400607 | 28.06.2007 | WO2008US04530 | 07.04.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10863203 | Global Dossier | 08.12.2020 | B2 | US2019320207 | 17.10.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US92399307 | 18.04.2007 | US201514602631 | 22.01.2015 | US201314075528 | 08.11.2013 | US201916394987 | 25.04.2019 | US45086810 | 05.03.2010 | US82400607 | 28.06.2007 | WO2008US04530 | 07.04.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20100015642 | Global Dossier | 12.02.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | US92399307 | 18.04.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101813848B | Global Dossier | 29.12.2017 | B1 | KR20170117104 | 20.10.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US92399307 | 18.04.2007 | US82400607 | 28.06.2007 | WO2008US04530 | 07.04.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101777706B | Global Dossier | 25.09.2017 | B1 | KR20160116059 | 06.10.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US92399307 | 18.04.2007 | US82400607 | 28.06.2007 | WO2008US04530 | 07.04.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101663917B | Global Dossier | 07.10.2016 | B1 | KR20150061009 | 03.06.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US92399307 | 18.04.2007 | US82400607 | 28.06.2007 | WO2008US04530 | 07.04.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101663438B | Global Dossier | 06.10.2016 | B1 | KR20150068481 | 19.06.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US92399307 | 18.04.2007 | US82400607 | 28.06.2007 | WO2008US04530 | 07.04.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101429372B | Global Dossier | 13.08.2014 | B1 | KR20120071411 | 02.07.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | US92399307 | 18.04.2007 | US82400607 | 28.06.2007 | WO2008US04530 | 07.04.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2010531554 | Global Dossier | 24.09.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | US92399307 | 18.04.2007 | WO2007CN02031 | 29.06.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5026584B | Global Dossier | 12.09.2012 | B2 | JP2010525661 | 22.07.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | US92399307 | 18.04.2007 | US82400607 | 28.06.2007 | WO2008US04530 | 07.04.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4054201 | Global Dossier | 05.06.2024 | B1 | EP4054201 | 07.09.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP12165846 | 07.04.2008 | US92399307 | 18.04.2007 | EP20162659 | 07.04.2008 | EP08742644 | 07.04.2008 | EP17166196 | 07.04.2008 | US82400607 | 28.06.2007 | WO2008US04530 | 07.04.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3700221 | Global Dossier | 15.12.2021 | B1 | EP3700221 | 26.08.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP12165846 | 07.04.2008 | US92399307 | 18.04.2007 | EP08742644 | 07.04.2008 | EP17166196 | 07.04.2008 | WO2008US04530 | 07.04.2008 | US82400607 | 28.06.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2533545 | Global Dossier | 03.05.2017 | B1 | EP2533545 | 12.12.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US92399307 | 18.04.2007 | EP08742644 | 07.04.2008 | US82400607 | 28.06.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2528345 | Global Dossier | 28.11.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US92399307 | 18.04.2007 | EP08742644 | 07.04.2008 | US82400607 | 28.06.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2528344 | Global Dossier | 28.11.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US92399307 | 18.04.2007 | EP08742644 | 07.04.2008 | US82400607 | 28.06.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2528343 | Global Dossier | 28.11.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US92399307 | 18.04.2007 | EP08742644 | 07.04.2008 | US82400607 | 28.06.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2528342 | Global Dossier | 28.11.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US92399307 | 18.04.2007 | EP08742644 | 07.04.2008 | US82400607 | 28.06.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2528341 | Global Dossier | 07.06.2017 | B1 | EP2528341 | 28.11.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US92399307 | 18.04.2007 | EP08742644 | 07.04.2008 | US82400607 | 28.06.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2528340 | Global Dossier | 07.06.2017 | B1 | EP2528340 | 28.11.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US92399307 | 18.04.2007 | EP08742644 | 07.04.2008 | US82400607 | 28.06.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2160902 | Global Dossier | 03.11.2010 | A4 | EP2160902 | 10.03.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US92399307 | 18.04.2007 | WO2007CN02031 | 29.06.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2147555 | Global Dossier | 25.07.2012 | B1 | EP2147555 | 27.01.2010 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US92399307 | 18.04.2007 | US82400607 | 28.06.2007 | WO2008US04530 | 07.04.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2008241568 | Global Dossier | 30.10.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US92399307 | 18.04.2007 | US82400607 | 28.06.2007 | WO2008US04530 | 07.04.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3264780 | Global Dossier | 24.06.2020 | B1 | EP3264780 | 03.01.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP12165846 | 07.04.2008 | US92399307 | 18.04.2007 | EP08742644 | 07.04.2008 | WO2008US04530 | 07.04.2008 | US82400607 | 28.06.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR122012013058 | 14.07.2015 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US92399307 | 18.04.2007 | US82400607 | 28.06.2007 | BRPI0810366 | 07.04.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR122012013059 | 15.09.2020 | B1 | BR122012013059 | 14.07.2015 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US92399307 | 18.04.2007 | WO2008US04530 | 07.04.2008 | US82400607 | 28.06.2007 | BRPI0810366 | 07.04.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR122012013066 | 04.08.2015 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US92399307 | 18.04.2007 | US82400607 | 28.06.2007 | BRPI0810366 | 07.04.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR122012013072 | 14.07.2015 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US92399307 | 18.04.2007 | US82400607 | 28.06.2007 | BRPI0810366 | 07.04.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR122012013077 | 14.07.2015 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US92399307 | 18.04.2007 | US82400607 | 28.06.2007 | BRPI0810366 | 07.04.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR122012013078 | 15.09.2020 | B1 | BR122012013078 | 14.07.2015 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US92399307 | 18.04.2007 | WO2008US04530 | 07.04.2008 | US82400607 | 28.06.2007 | BRPI0810366 | 07.04.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR122012013614 | 14.07.2015 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US92399307 | 18.04.2007 | US82400607 | 28.06.2007 | BRPI0810366 | 07.04.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI0721501 | 26.02.2013 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US92399307 | 18.04.2007 | WO2007CN02031 | 29.06.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI0810366 | 15.09.2020 | B1 | BRPI0810366 | 26.05.2015 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US92399307 | 18.04.2007 | US82400607 | 28.06.2007 | WO2008US04530 | 07.04.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101653002 | 17.02.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | US92399307 | 18.04.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101663893B | 08.05.2013 | B | CN101663893 | 03.03.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | US92399307 | 18.04.2007 | US82400607 | 28.06.2007 | WO2008US04530 | 07.04.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102685556B | 15.07.2015 | B | CN102685556 | 19.09.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | US92399307 | 18.04.2007 | US82400607 | 28.06.2007 | CN200880012349 | 07.04.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102685557B | 16.09.2015 | B | CN102685557 | 19.09.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | US92399307 | 18.04.2007 | US82400607 | 28.06.2007 | CN200880012349 | 07.04.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102724556B | 22.07.2015 | B | CN102724556 | 10.10.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | US92399307 | 18.04.2007 | US82400607 | 28.06.2007 | CN200880012349 | 07.04.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN103281563B | 07.09.2016 | B | CN103281563 | 04.09.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US92399307 | 18.04.2007 | US82400607 | 28.06.2007 | CN200880012349 | 07.04.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN103338367B | 29.08.2017 | B | CN103338367 | 02.10.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US92399307 | 18.04.2007 | US82400607 | 28.06.2007 | CN200880012349 | 07.04.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CY1123148T | 29.10.2021 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP12165846 | 07.04.2008 | US92399307 | 18.04.2007 | EP08742644 | 07.04.2008 | WO2008US04530 | 07.04.2008 | US82400607 | 28.06.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK3264780T | 27.07.2020 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP12165846 | 07.04.2008 | US92399307 | 18.04.2007 | US82400607 | 28.06.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2388799T | 18.10.2012 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US92399307 | 18.04.2007 | US82400607 | 28.06.2007 | WO2008US04530 | 07.04.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HRP20201105T | 22.01.2021 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US92399307 | 18.04.2007 | EP17166196 | 07.04.2008 | US82400607 | 28.06.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2009011217 | 07.12.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US92399307 | 18.04.2007 | US82400607 | 28.06.2007 | WO2008US04530 | 07.04.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX348825 | 30.06.2017 | B | Priority number | Date | US92399307 | 18.04.2007 | US82400607 | 28.06.2007 | WO2008US04530 | 07.04.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL2147555T | 31.10.2012 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US92399307 | 18.04.2007 | EP08742644 | 07.04.2008 | WO2008US04530 | 07.04.2008 | US82400607 | 28.06.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL2528341T | 31.10.2017 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US92399307 | 18.04.2007 | EP12165855 | 07.04.2008 | EP08742644 | 07.04.2008 | US82400607 | 28.06.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2501179 | 10.12.2013 | C2 | RU2009142429 | 27.05.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | US92399307 | 18.04.2007 | US82400607 | 28.06.2007 | WO2008US04530 | 07.04.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SI3264780T | 31.08.2020 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US92399307 | 18.04.2007 | EP17166196 | 07.04.2008 | US82400607 | 28.06.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI543628B | 21.07.2016 | B | TW200913716 | 16.03.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US92399307 | 18.04.2007 | US82400607 | 28.06.2007 | WO2008US04530 | 07.04.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI530196B | 11.04.2016 | B | TW201306589 | 01.02.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US92399307 | 18.04.2007 | US82400607 | 28.06.2007 | WO2008US04530 | 07.04.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI445407B | 11.07.2014 | B | TW201306590 | 01.02.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US92399307 | 18.04.2007 | US82400607 | 28.06.2007 | WO2008US04530 | 07.04.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI502976B | 01.10.2015 | B | TW201308989 | 16.02.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US92399307 | 18.04.2007 | US82400607 | 28.06.2007 | WO2008US04530 | 07.04.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI415450B | 11.11.2013 | B | TW201308990 | 16.02.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US92399307 | 18.04.2007 | US82400607 | 28.06.2007 | WO2008US04530 | 07.04.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI488492B | 11.06.2015 | B | TW201308991 | 16.02.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US92399307 | 18.04.2007 | US82400607 | 28.06.2007 | WO2008US04530 | 07.04.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI445393B | 11.07.2014 | B | TW201308992 | 16.02.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US92399307 | 18.04.2007 | US82400607 | 28.06.2007 | WO2008US04530 | 07.04.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI599228B | 11.09.2017 | B | TW201618542 | 16.05.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US92399307 | 18.04.2007 | US82400607 | 28.06.2007 | WO2008US04530 | 07.04.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI775758B | 01.09.2022 | B | TW201804789 | 01.02.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | US92399307 | 18.04.2007 | US82400607 | 28.06.2007 | WO2008US04530 | 07.04.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2008130500 | Global Dossier | 11.12.2008 | A3 | WO2008130500 | 30.10.2008 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US92399307 | 18.04.2007 | US82400607 | 28.06.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20120079177 | Global Dossier | 11.07.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | US92399307 | 18.04.2007 | US82400607 | 28.06.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101547008B | Global Dossier | 28.08.2015 | B1 | KR20120071410 | 02.07.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | US92399307 | 18.04.2007 | US82400607 | 28.06.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101393169B | Global Dossier | 09.05.2014 | B1 | KR20100015737 | 12.02.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | US92399307 | 18.04.2007 | US82400607 | 28.06.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6180495B | Global Dossier | 16.08.2017 | B2 | JP2016096563 | 26.05.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US92399307 | 18.04.2007 | US82400607 | 28.06.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2014225919 | Global Dossier | 04.12.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US92399307 | 18.04.2007 | US82400607 | 28.06.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5597269B | Global Dossier | 01.10.2014 | B2 | JP2013146087 | 25.07.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US92399307 | 18.04.2007 | US82400607 | 28.06.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5317247B | Global Dossier | 16.10.2013 | B2 | JP2013081234 | 02.05.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US92399307 | 18.04.2007 | US82400607 | 28.06.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5213085B | Global Dossier | 19.06.2013 | B2 | JP2013062866 | 04.04.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US92399307 | 18.04.2007 | US82400607 | 28.06.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5213084B | Global Dossier | 19.06.2013 | B2 | JP2013062865 | 04.04.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US92399307 | 18.04.2007 | US82400607 | 28.06.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5150781B | Global Dossier | 27.02.2013 | B2 | JP2013013113 | 17.01.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US92399307 | 18.04.2007 | US82400607 | 28.06.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5069811B | Global Dossier | 07.11.2012 | B2 | JP2012199999 | 18.10.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | US92399307 | 18.04.2007 | US82400607 | 28.06.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2633148T | 19.09.2017 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US92399307 | 18.04.2007 | US82400607 | 28.06.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2905052T | 06.04.2022 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US92399307 | 18.04.2007 | US82400607 | 28.06.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1174462 | 07.06.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US92399307 | 18.04.2007 | US82400607 | 28.06.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1174463 | 07.06.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US92399307 | 18.04.2007 | US82400607 | 28.06.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1174464 | 07.06.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US92399307 | 18.04.2007 | US82400607 | 28.06.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | HUE050251T | 30.11.2020 | T2 | Priority number | Date | US92399307 | 18.04.2007 | US82400607 | 28.06.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | LT3264780T | 10.08.2020 | T | Priority number | Date | US92399307 | 18.04.2007 | US82400607 | 28.06.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2021009153 | 08.06.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | US92399307 | 18.04.2007 | US82400607 | 28.06.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX337525 | 09.03.2016 | B | Priority number | Date | US92399307 | 18.04.2007 | US82400607 | 28.06.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL4054201T | 12.08.2024 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US92399307 | 18.04.2007 | US82400607 | 28.06.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT2147555E | 22.04.2013 | E | Priority number | Date | US92399307 | 18.04.2007 | US82400607 | 28.06.2007 | Type | Divisional application | EP3700221 | EP4054201 | Type | Earlier application | EP2147555 | EP2528340 |