Designated contracting states | AT | | BE | | BG | | CH | | CY | | CZ | | DE | | DK | | EE | | ES | Lapse: 24.06.2020 | FI | | FR | | GB | | GR | Lapse: 25.09.2020 | HR | | HU | | IE | | IS | | IT | | LI | | LT | | LU | | LV | | MC | | MT | | NL | | NO | | PL | Lapse: 24.06.2020 | PT | Lapse: 26.10.2020 | RO | Lapse: 24.06.2020 | SE | | SI | | SK | | TR | | Examination procedure | 18.05.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 29.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 05.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | European patent granted | 24.06.2020 | Opposition procedure | 25.03.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.05.2021 | INPADOC data Tooltip | The EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority. | Event date: | 03.01.2018 | | Event description: | DIVISIONAL APPLICATION: REFERENCE TO EARLIER APPLICATION | Ref Document Number: | 2147555 | Country of Ref Document: | EP | Kind Code of Ref Document: | P | | Event date: | 03.01.2018 | | Event description: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | A1 | Designated State(s): | AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR | | Event date: | 03.01.2018 | | Event description: | DIVISIONAL APPLICATION: REFERENCE TO EARLIER APPLICATION | Ref Document Number: | 2528340 | Country of Ref Document: | EP | Kind Code of Ref Document: | P | | Event date: | 06.07.2018 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG HK DE 1243253 HK | Code Expl.: | REQUESTS TO DESIGNATE PATENT IN HONG KONG | | Event date: | 08.08.2018 | | Event description: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTED) | Designated State(s): | AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR | | Event date: | 08.08.2018 | | Event description: | REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED | Effective DATE: | 20180703 | | Event date: | 05.12.2018 | | Event description: | FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED | Effective DATE: | 20181105 | | Event date: | 18.12.2019 | | Event description: | INTENTION TO GRANT ANNOUNCED | Effective DATE: | 20191119 | | Event date: | 15.04.2020 | | Event description: | INTENTION TO GRANT ANNOUNCED (DELETED) | | Event date: | 24.06.2020 | | Event description: | INTENTION TO GRANT ANNOUNCED | Effective DATE: | 20200518 | | Event date: | 24.06.2020 | | Event description: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | B1 | Designated State(s): | AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR | | Event date: | 24.06.2020 | | Event description: | DIVISIONAL APPLICATION: REFERENCE TO EARLIER APPLICATION | Ref Document Number: | 2528340 | Country of Ref Document: | EP | Kind Code of Ref Document: | P | | Event date: | 24.06.2020 | | Event description: | DIVISIONAL APPLICATION: REFERENCE TO EARLIER APPLICATION | Ref Document Number: | 2147555 | Country of Ref Document: | EP | Kind Code of Ref Document: | P | | Event date: | 24.06.2020 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GB FG4D | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED | | Event date: | 30.06.2020 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH EP | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENT TAKES EFFECT AS A NATIONAL PATENT IN CH/LI | | Event date: | 15.07.2020 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG AT REF 1285094 AT T | Code Expl.: | +REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT VALIDATED IN AUSTRIA) | Effective DATE: | 20200715 | | Event date: | 15.07.2020 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH NV | Code Expl.: | NEW AGENT | REPRESENTATIVE: | VALIPAT S.A. C/O BOVARD SA NEUCHATEL, CH | | Event date: | 16.07.2020 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R096 602008062900 DE | Code Expl.: | +DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT | | Event date: | 22.07.2020 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG IE FG4D | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND | | Event date: | 27.07.2020 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DK T3 | Code Expl.: | +EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS | Effective DATE: | 20200722 | | Event date: | 11.08.2020 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG SE TRGR | Code Expl.: | +TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT | | Event date: | 05.08.2020 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG NL FP | Code Expl.: | TRANSLATION FOR EP FILED (ENTRY OF EP INTO COUNTRY) | | Event date: | 21.09.2020 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG NO T2 | Code Expl.: | +ENTRY OF EP PATENT INTO NATIONAL PHASE OF NORWAY [PUBL. OF TRANSLATION] | Effective DATE: | 20200624 | | Event date: | 02.10.2020 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG SK T3 E 34852 SK | Code Expl.: | +TRANSLATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT SPECIFICATION INTO SLOVAK | | Event date: | 15.10.2020 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG EE FG4A E019659 EE | Code Expl.: | +TRANSLATION OF THE SPECIFICATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT VALID IN ESTONIA | Effective DATE: | 20200722 | | Event date: | 14.07.2020 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG HR TUEP P20201105T HR | Code Expl.: | REQUEST FOR EP VALIDATION RECEIVED | | Event date: | 30.10.2020 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GR | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20200925 | | Event date: | 15.05.2020 | | Event description: | DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT A PATENT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR1 | | Event date: | 18.11.2019 | | Event description: | DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT A PATENT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR1 | | Event date: | 22.05.2020 | | Event description: | (EXPECTED) GRANT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009210 | | Event date: | 18.05.2020 | | Event description: | INFORMATION RELATED TO INTENTION TO GRANT A PATENT RECORDED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR71 | | Event date: | 07.03.2020 | | Event description: | GRANT FEE PAID | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR3 | | Event date: | 09.03.2020 | | Event description: | INFORMATION RELATED TO PAYMENT OF FEE FOR PUBLISHING/PRINTING DELETED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSDIGR3 | | Event date: | 09.03.2020 | | Event description: | INFORMATION RELATED TO DISAPPROVAL OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT BY THE APPLICANT OR RESUMPTION OF EXAMINATION PROCEEDINGS BY THE EPO DELETED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSDIGR1 | | Event date: | 15.05.2020 | | Event description: | INFORMATION RELATED TO DISAPPROVAL OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT BY THE APPLICANT OR RESUMPTION OF EXAMINATION PROCEEDINGS BY THE EPO DELETED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSDIGR1 | | Event date: | 03.08.2020 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FI FGE | Code Expl.: | +EP PATENT VALIDATED IN FINLAND | | Event date: | 30.11.2020 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG HU AG4A E050251 HU | Code Expl.: | +FILING OF THE TRANSLATION OF THE TEXT OF EUROPEAN PATENTS | | Event date: | 29.01.2021 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | PT | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20201026 | | Event date: | 29.01.2021 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | ES | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20200624 | | Event date: | 29.01.2021 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | RO | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20200624 | | Event date: | 22.01.2021 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG HR T1PR P20201105 HR | Code Expl.: | +EP PATENT VALIDATED IN CROATIA | | Event date: | 26.02.2021 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | PL | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20200624 | | Event date: | 01.12.2017 | | Event description: | PUBLIC REFERENCE MADE UNDER ARTICLE 153(3) EPC TO A PUBLISHED INTERNATIONAL APPLICATION THAT HAS ENTERED THE EUROPEAN PHASE | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009012 | | Event date: | 30.04.2021 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT | | Event date: | 22.05.2020 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: THE PATENT HAS BEEN GRANTED | | Event date: | 18.05.2020 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: GRANT OF PATENT IS INTENDED | | Event date: | 09.03.2020 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: EXAMINATION IS IN PROGRESS | | Event date: | 18.11.2019 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: GRANT OF PATENT IS INTENDED | | Event date: | 02.11.2018 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: EXAMINATION IS IN PROGRESS | | Event date: | 06.07.2018 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION WAS MADE | | Event date: | 01.12.2017 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: THE APPLICATION HAS BEEN PUBLISHED | | Event date: | 16.04.2021 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG HR ODRP P20201105 HR | Code Expl.: | +RENEWAL FEE FOR THE MAINTENANCE OF A PATENT | Payment DATE: | 20210406 | Year of Fee Payment: | 14 | | Event date: | 25.03.2021 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R097 602008062900 DE | Code Expl.: | +NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION | | Event date: | 02.06.2021 | | Event description: | NO OPPOSITION FILED | Effective DATE: | 20210325 | | Event date: | 30.04.2021 | | Event description: | NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009261 | | Event date: | 29.04.2022 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG HR ODRP P20201105 HR | Code Expl.: | +RENEWAL FEE FOR THE MAINTENANCE OF A PATENT | Payment DATE: | 20220404 | Year of Fee Payment: | 15 | | Event date: | 16.11.2022 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R081 602008062900 DE | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE | OWNER: | DOLBY INTERNATIONAL AB, NL | Free Format Text: | FORMER OWNER: DOLBY INTERNATIONAL AB, AMSTERDAM, NL | | Event date: | 23.01.2023 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG NO CHAD | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF THE OWNER'S NAME OR ADDRESS (PAR. 44 PATENT LAW, PAR. PATENTFORSKRIFTEN) | OWNER: | DOLBY INTERNATIONAL AB, IE | | Event date: | 24.01.2023 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG BE PD | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF OWNERSHIP | OWNER: | DOLBY INTERNATIONAL AB; IE | Free Format Text: | DETAILS ASSIGNMENT: CHANGE OF OWNER(S), OTHER; FORMER OWNER NAME: DOLBY INTERNATIONAL AB | Effective DATE: | 20221207 | | Event date: | 16.11.2022 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R081 602008062900 DE | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE | OWNER: | DOLBY INTERNATIONAL AB, IE | Free Format Text: | FORMER OWNER: DOLBY INTERNATIONAL AB, AMSTERDAM, NL | | Event date: | 14.04.2023 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG HR ODRP P20201105 HR | Code Expl.: | +RENEWAL FEE FOR THE MAINTENANCE OF A PATENT | Payment DATE: | 20230323 | Year of Fee Payment: | 16 | | Event date: | 21.03.2023 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR PLFP | Code Expl.: | +FEE PAYMENT | Year of Fee Payment: | 16 | | Event date: | 28.03.2023 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R081 602008062900 DE | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE | OWNER: | DOLBY INTERNATIONAL AB, IE | Free Format Text: | FORMER OWNER: DOLBY INTERNATIONAL AB, DP AMSTERDAM, NL | | Event date: | 15.05.2023 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG EE HE1A E019659 EE | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF ADDRESS | | Event date: | 17.05.2023 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG SK TC4A E 34852 SK | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF OWNER'S NAME | OWNER: | DOLBY INTERNATIONAL AB, DUBLIN, IE | Effective DATE: | 20230427 | | Event date: | 28.05.2023 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG HU HC9C | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF NAME, ADDRESS | OWNER: | DOLBY INTERNATIONAL AB, IE | Free Format Text: | FORMER OWNER(S): DOLBY INTERNATIONAL AB, NL; DOLBY INTERNATIONAL AB, NL | | Event date: | 15.06.2023 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG AT UEP 1285094 AT T | Code Expl.: | +PUBLICATION OF TRANSLATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT SPECIFICATION | Effective DATE: | 20200624 | | Event date: | 21.06.2023 | | Event description: | OPT-OUT OF THE COMPETENCE OF THE UNIFIED PATENT COURT (UPC) REGISTERED | Effective DATE: | 20230512 | | Event date: | 30.06.2023 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG SI SP73 | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF DATA ON OWNER | OWNER: | DOLBY INTERNATIONAL AB; IE | Effective DATE: | 20230517 | | Event date: | 29.06.2023 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG HR PNAN P20201105 HR | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF THE APPLICANT NAME, ADDRESS/RESIDENCE | OWNER: | DOLBY INTERNATIONAL AB, IE | | Event date: | 09.04.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IS | Payment DATE: | 20240320 | Year of Fee Payment: | 17 | | Event date: | 15.04.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | LT | Payment DATE: | 20240321 | Year of Fee Payment: | 17 | | Event date: | 16.04.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IE | Payment DATE: | 20240322 | Year of Fee Payment: | 17 | | Event date: | 16.04.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | LU | Payment DATE: | 20240320 | Year of Fee Payment: | 17 | | Event date: | 16.04.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | NL | Payment DATE: | 20240320 | Year of Fee Payment: | 17 | | Event date: | 24.04.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | MC | Payment DATE: | 20240325 | Year of Fee Payment: | 17 | | Event date: | 12.04.2024 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG HR ODRP P20201105 HR | Code Expl.: | +RENEWAL FEE FOR THE MAINTENANCE OF A PATENT | Payment DATE: | 20240326 | Year of Fee Payment: | 17 | | Event date: | 30.04.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SK | Payment DATE: | 20240326 | Year of Fee Payment: | 17 | | Event date: | 30.04.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GB | Payment DATE: | 20240320 | Year of Fee Payment: | 17 | | Event date: | 30.04.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | BG | Payment DATE: | 20240326 | Year of Fee Payment: | 17 | | Event date: | 30.04.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CZ | Payment DATE: | 20240326 | Year of Fee Payment: | 17 | | Event date: | 30.04.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | EE | Payment DATE: | 20240321 | Year of Fee Payment: | 17 | | Event date: | 30.04.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FI | Payment DATE: | 20240320 | Year of Fee Payment: | 17 | | Event date: | 31.05.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | BE | Payment DATE: | 20240320 | Year of Fee Payment: | 17 | | Event date: | 31.05.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DK | Payment DATE: | 20240320 | Year of Fee Payment: | 17 | | Event date: | 31.05.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FR | Payment DATE: | 20240320 | Year of Fee Payment: | 17 | | Event date: | 31.05.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | HR | Payment DATE: | 20240326 | Year of Fee Payment: | 17 | | Event date: | 31.05.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IT | Payment DATE: | 20240320 | Year of Fee Payment: | 17 | | Event date: | 31.05.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | LV | Payment DATE: | 20240320 | Year of Fee Payment: | 17 | | Event date: | 31.05.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | MT | Payment DATE: | 20240327 | Year of Fee Payment: | 17 | | Event date: | 31.05.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | NO | Payment DATE: | 20240322 | Year of Fee Payment: | 17 | | Event date: | 31.05.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SE | Payment DATE: | 20240320 | Year of Fee Payment: | 17 | | Event date: | 10.07.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DE | Payment DATE: | 20240320 | Year of Fee Payment: | 17 | | Event date: | 18.07.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CH | Payment DATE: | 20240501 | Year of Fee Payment: | 17 | | Event date: | 23.07.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | AT | Payment DATE: | 20240322 | Year of Fee Payment: | 17 | | Event date: | 31.07.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SI | Payment DATE: | 20240328 | Year of Fee Payment: | 17 | | Event date: | 31.07.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CY | Payment DATE: | 20240321 | Year of Fee Payment: | 17 | | Event date: | 30.08.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | HU | Payment DATE: | 20240327 | Year of Fee Payment: | 17 | |