EP3387908 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR ROLLING UP LAMINATED DOUGH PIECES WITH A SEPARATOR SHEET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.06.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.06.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.03.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.02.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 14.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Radie B.V. Plantijnweg 23 4104 BC Culemborg / NL | [2018/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN BLOKLAND, Johannes Josephus Antonius Naarderstraat 67 1251 BG Laren / NL | [2018/42] | Representative(s) | IP Maison Sportweg 6 2751 ER Moerkapelle / NL | [2023/32] |
Former [2018/42] | Patentwerk B.V. P.O. Box 1514 5200 BN 's-Hertogenbosch / NL | Application number, filing date | 17166359.4 | 12.04.2017 | [2018/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3387908 | Date: | 17.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3387908 | Date: | 09.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.10.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A21C3/06, A21C9/08 | [2018/42] | CPC: |
A21C3/06 (EP);
A21C9/08 (EP);
A21C9/088 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/11] |
Former [2018/42] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM AUFROLLEN VON BLÄTTERTEIGTEILEN MIT TRENNBLATT | [2018/42] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR ROLLING UP LAMINATED DOUGH PIECES WITH A SEPARATOR SHEET | [2018/42] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF POUR ENROULER DES MORCEAUX DE PÂTE FEUILLETÉE AVEC UNE FEUILLE DE SÉPARATION | [2018/42] | Examination procedure | 04.02.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.02.2019 | Examination requested [2019/11] | 04.02.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.03.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.08.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.07.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.06.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.07.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 03.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 13.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 09.08.2023 | ES | 09.08.2023 | HR | 09.08.2023 | PL | 09.08.2023 | RO | 09.08.2023 | RS | 09.08.2023 | SK | 09.08.2023 | SM | 09.08.2023 | NO | 09.11.2023 | GR | 10.11.2023 | IS | 09.12.2023 | [2024/23] |
Former [2024/20] | HR | 09.08.2023 | |
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SM | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | HR | 09.08.2023 | |
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | NO | 09.11.2023 | |
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | NO | 09.11.2023 | |
GR | 10.11.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1242885 (RIEK VAN BAKKERIJWERKTUIGEN V [NL]) [A] 1-13* figures 1-3 *; | [A]US5078585 (MORIKAWA MICHIO [JP], et al) [A] 1-13 * figure 2 *; | [XYI]WO9702750 (WEWALKA GMBH [AT]) [X] 1,2,4,11,12 * figures 1,2,4 * * pages 7-8 * [Y] 9,10 [I] 3-7,13; | [A]EP1366667 (SEEWER AG MASCHF [CH]) [A] 1-13 * figures 4a,4b *; | [YD]EP2529629 (RADEMAKER B V [NL]) [YD] 9,10 * figures 1,2 * | by applicant | EP2529629 |