Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
12.03.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.04.2021 [2021/15] |
25.11.2020 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
24.06.2020 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
24.03.2020 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
28.06.2019 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee | |
28.06.2019 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
05.06.2019 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
04.05.2018 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
04.05.2018 | Request for examination filed | published on 06.06.2018 [2018/23] |
04.05.2018 | Change - designated states | published on 06.06.2018 [2018/23] |
28.04.2018 | Amendment by applicant | |
29.09.2017 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 01.11.2017 [2017/44] |
18.04.2017 | Change - representative |