EP3239548 - SCREW CONNECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.03.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.06.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.05.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 29.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.03.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.04.2021 [2021/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Senvion GmbH Überseering 10 22297 Hamburg / DE | [2017/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Eusterbarkey, Carsten Rieke Reech 48 25813 Simonsberg / DE | [2017/44] | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Postfach 13 03 91 20103 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/44] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Postfach 13 03 91 20103 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 17166736.3 | 18.04.2017 | [2017/44] | Priority number, date | DE20161005019 | 26.04.2016 Original published format: DE102016005019 | [2017/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3239548 | Date: | 01.11.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.09.2017 | Classification | IPC: | F16D1/033, // F16B19/02 | [2017/44] | CPC: |
F16D1/033 (EP);
F16B19/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/23] |
Former [2017/44] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHRAUBVERBINDUNG | [2017/44] | English: | SCREW CONNECTION | [2017/44] | French: | LIAISON VISSÉE | [2017/44] | Examination procedure | 18.04.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.04.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.04.2018 | Examination requested [2018/23] | 25.06.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.11.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/15] | 26.11.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2021/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2019 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   25.06.2019 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IY]JP2015094394 (MITSUBISHI HITACHI POWER SYS) [I] 1-12 * figure 7 * [Y] 10-12; | [IY]US2013202440 (IVAKITCH RICHARD [CA], et al) [I] 1-12 * figure 2 * [Y] 10-12; | [IY]US3835525 (KING J) [I] 1-9 * figure 4 * [Y] 10-12; | [I]EP1103730 (BALCKE DUERR ENERGIETECH GMBH [DE]) [I] 1-9 * figure 5 *; | [I]US4244661 (DERVY ARAM J) [I] 1-9 * figures 1,2 *; | [I]DE102014203276 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [I] 1-9 * figure 1 * |