EP3246137 - SENSORIZED COVERING FOR AN INDUSTRIAL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.12.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.01.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.10.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.05.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 20.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Comau S.p.A. Via Rivalta 30 10095 Grugliasco (Torino) / IT | [2017/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BORDEGNONI, Stefano Comau S.p.A. via Rivalta 30 10095 Grugliasco (Torino) / IT | 02 /
CINIELLO, Francesco Comau S.p.A. via Rivalta 30 10095 Grugliasco (Torino) / IT | 03 /
COLOMBINA, Giuseppe Comau S.p.A. via Rivalta 30 10095 Grugliasco (Torino) / IT | [2017/47] | Representative(s) | Gallarotti, Franco Buzzi, Notaro & Antonielli d'Oulx S.p.A. Corso Vittorio Emanuele ll, 6 10123 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2020/08] | Gallarotti, Franco Buzzi, Notaro & Antonielli d'Oulx Corso Vittorio Emanuele ll, 6 10123 Torino / IT | ||
Former [2017/47] | Gallarotti, Franco Buzzi, Notaro & Antonielli d'Oulx Via Maria Vittoria, 18 10123 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 17167114.2 | 19.04.2017 | [2017/47] | Priority number, date | IT2016UA03522 | 17.05.2016 Original published format: IT UA20163522 | [2017/47] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3246137 | Date: | 22.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3246137 | Date: | 19.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.10.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B25J19/06, B25J13/08, B25J19/00, B25J19/02, G01B7/02, G01B7/14 | [2019/42] | CPC: |
B25J13/084 (EP,US);
B25J19/0075 (EP,KR,US);
G01D11/00 (CN);
B25J9/1676 (US);
B25J11/00 (KR);
B25J13/086 (EP,US);
B25J19/00 (RU);
B25J19/0091 (EP,US);
B25J19/02 (KR);
B25J19/028 (EP,US);
B25J19/063 (EP,US);
B25J19/065 (EP,US);
G01B7/14 (EP,US);
G01L1/18 (US);
G05B2219/40201 (US);
G05B2219/40202 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2017/47] | B25J19/06, B25J13/08, B25J19/00, B25J19/02, G01B7/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/26] |
Former [2017/47] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SENSORISIERTE ABDECKUNG FÜR EINE INDUSTRIELLE VORRICHTUNG | [2017/47] | English: | SENSORIZED COVERING FOR AN INDUSTRIAL DEVICE | [2017/47] | French: | RECOUVREMENT MUNI DE DÉTECTEURS POUR DISPOSITIF INDUSTRIEL | [2017/47] | Examination procedure | 19.04.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.05.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.05.2018 | Examination requested [2018/26] | 15.10.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.01.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 14.01.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.01.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 20.11.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.04.2017 | AL | 19.02.2020 | AT | 19.02.2020 | CY | 19.02.2020 | CZ | 19.02.2020 | DK | 19.02.2020 | EE | 19.02.2020 | FI | 19.02.2020 | HR | 19.02.2020 | LT | 19.02.2020 | LV | 19.02.2020 | MC | 19.02.2020 | MK | 19.02.2020 | MT | 19.02.2020 | NL | 19.02.2020 | PL | 19.02.2020 | RO | 19.02.2020 | RS | 19.02.2020 | SI | 19.02.2020 | SK | 19.02.2020 | SM | 19.02.2020 | TR | 19.02.2020 | IE | 19.04.2020 | LU | 19.04.2020 | CH | 30.04.2020 | LI | 30.04.2020 | BG | 19.05.2020 | NO | 19.05.2020 | GR | 20.05.2020 | IS | 19.06.2020 | PT | 12.07.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/30] | HU | 19.04.2017 | |
AL | 19.02.2020 | ||
AT | 19.02.2020 | ||
CY | 19.02.2020 | ||
CZ | 19.02.2020 | ||
DK | 19.02.2020 | ||
EE | 19.02.2020 | ||
FI | 19.02.2020 | ||
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
LT | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
MC | 19.02.2020 | ||
MT | 19.02.2020 | ||
NL | 19.02.2020 | ||
PL | 19.02.2020 | ||
RO | 19.02.2020 | ||
RS | 19.02.2020 | ||
SI | 19.02.2020 | ||
SK | 19.02.2020 | ||
SM | 19.02.2020 | ||
TR | 19.02.2020 | ||
IE | 19.04.2020 | ||
LU | 19.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
BG | 19.05.2020 | ||
NO | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IS | 19.06.2020 | ||
PT | 12.07.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 19.04.2017 | |
AT | 19.02.2020 | ||
CY | 19.02.2020 | ||
CZ | 19.02.2020 | ||
DK | 19.02.2020 | ||
EE | 19.02.2020 | ||
FI | 19.02.2020 | ||
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
LT | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
MC | 19.02.2020 | ||
MT | 19.02.2020 | ||
NL | 19.02.2020 | ||
PL | 19.02.2020 | ||
RO | 19.02.2020 | ||
RS | 19.02.2020 | ||
SI | 19.02.2020 | ||
SK | 19.02.2020 | ||
SM | 19.02.2020 | ||
TR | 19.02.2020 | ||
IE | 19.04.2020 | ||
LU | 19.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
BG | 19.05.2020 | ||
NO | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IS | 19.06.2020 | ||
PT | 12.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AT | 19.02.2020 | |
CZ | 19.02.2020 | ||
DK | 19.02.2020 | ||
EE | 19.02.2020 | ||
FI | 19.02.2020 | ||
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
LT | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
MC | 19.02.2020 | ||
NL | 19.02.2020 | ||
PL | 19.02.2020 | ||
RO | 19.02.2020 | ||
RS | 19.02.2020 | ||
SI | 19.02.2020 | ||
SK | 19.02.2020 | ||
SM | 19.02.2020 | ||
IE | 19.04.2020 | ||
LU | 19.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
BG | 19.05.2020 | ||
NO | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IS | 19.06.2020 | ||
PT | 12.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/11] | AT | 19.02.2020 | |
CZ | 19.02.2020 | ||
DK | 19.02.2020 | ||
EE | 19.02.2020 | ||
FI | 19.02.2020 | ||
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
LT | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
MC | 19.02.2020 | ||
NL | 19.02.2020 | ||
PL | 19.02.2020 | ||
RO | 19.02.2020 | ||
RS | 19.02.2020 | ||
SI | 19.02.2020 | ||
SK | 19.02.2020 | ||
SM | 19.02.2020 | ||
LU | 19.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
BG | 19.05.2020 | ||
NO | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IS | 19.06.2020 | ||
PT | 12.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | CZ | 19.02.2020 | |
DK | 19.02.2020 | ||
EE | 19.02.2020 | ||
FI | 19.02.2020 | ||
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
LT | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
MC | 19.02.2020 | ||
NL | 19.02.2020 | ||
RO | 19.02.2020 | ||
RS | 19.02.2020 | ||
SK | 19.02.2020 | ||
SM | 19.02.2020 | ||
LU | 19.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
BG | 19.05.2020 | ||
NO | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IS | 19.06.2020 | ||
PT | 12.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/52] | CZ | 19.02.2020 | |
DK | 19.02.2020 | ||
EE | 19.02.2020 | ||
FI | 19.02.2020 | ||
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
LT | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
MC | 19.02.2020 | ||
NL | 19.02.2020 | ||
RO | 19.02.2020 | ||
RS | 19.02.2020 | ||
SK | 19.02.2020 | ||
SM | 19.02.2020 | ||
BG | 19.05.2020 | ||
NO | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IS | 19.06.2020 | ||
PT | 12.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 19.02.2020 | |
DK | 19.02.2020 | ||
EE | 19.02.2020 | ||
FI | 19.02.2020 | ||
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
LT | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
NL | 19.02.2020 | ||
RO | 19.02.2020 | ||
RS | 19.02.2020 | ||
SK | 19.02.2020 | ||
SM | 19.02.2020 | ||
BG | 19.05.2020 | ||
NO | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IS | 19.06.2020 | ||
PT | 12.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 19.02.2020 | |
DK | 19.02.2020 | ||
FI | 19.02.2020 | ||
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
LT | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
NL | 19.02.2020 | ||
RO | 19.02.2020 | ||
RS | 19.02.2020 | ||
SK | 19.02.2020 | ||
SM | 19.02.2020 | ||
BG | 19.05.2020 | ||
NO | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IS | 19.06.2020 | ||
PT | 12.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | DK | 19.02.2020 | |
FI | 19.02.2020 | ||
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
LT | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
NL | 19.02.2020 | ||
RO | 19.02.2020 | ||
RS | 19.02.2020 | ||
SM | 19.02.2020 | ||
BG | 19.05.2020 | ||
NO | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IS | 19.06.2020 | ||
PT | 12.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | DK | 19.02.2020 | |
FI | 19.02.2020 | ||
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
LT | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
NL | 19.02.2020 | ||
RS | 19.02.2020 | ||
BG | 19.05.2020 | ||
NO | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IS | 19.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/45] | FI | 19.02.2020 | |
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
NL | 19.02.2020 | ||
RS | 19.02.2020 | ||
BG | 19.05.2020 | ||
NO | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IS | 19.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | FI | 19.02.2020 | |
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
RS | 19.02.2020 | ||
BG | 19.05.2020 | ||
NO | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IS | 19.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | FI | 19.02.2020 | |
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
RS | 19.02.2020 | ||
BG | 19.05.2020 | ||
NO | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | FI | 19.02.2020 | |
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
RS | 19.02.2020 | ||
NO | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | FI | 19.02.2020 | |
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
RS | 19.02.2020 | ||
NO | 19.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | FI | 19.02.2020 | |
NO | 19.05.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS63238502 (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD) [A] 1,15* abstract *; | [A]US2003137219 (HEILIGENSETZER PETER [DE], et al) [A] 1,15 * paragraphs [0044] - [0046]; figures 1-2 *; | [Y]JP2010010116 (FUJIKURA LTD) [Y] 1,8-10,12 * paragraphs [0027] , [0045] - [0057]; figures 6-8 *; | [Y]US2011307097 (COLLEDANI FREDERIC [FR], et al) [Y] 1-7,10,11,13,14 * paragraphs [0029] - [0033]; figures 1-3 *; | [XY] - Peter Heiligensetzer, "Betriebs- und Montageanleitung_KR_5_SI_2.x_ V KR_C4", (20131112), URL: no url, manufacturer documentation, (20170130), XP055340430 [X] 15 * pages 9-12, 51-61 * [Y] 1-14 | [ ] - Barbara Asseburg, "Kollisionskraftmindernde Schaumabdeckung für Industrieroboter", (20050101), page 2, URL: no url, manufacturer documentation, (20170201), XP055341305 |