EP3253040 - IMAGE FORMING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.10.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.11.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.06.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.02.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.05.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 03.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oki Data Corporation 11-22, Shibaura 4-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8551 / JP | [2017/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fukuda, Takafumi c/o Oki Data Corporation 11-22, Shibaura 4-chome Minato-ku Tokyo, 108-8551 / JP | 02 /
Rabel, Patrick c/o Oki Systèmes (France) S.A. Immeuble OSAKA 21 rue du Jura CP 30527 94633 Rungis / FR | [2017/49] | Representative(s) | Piotrowicz, Pawel Jan Andrzej, et al Venner Shipley LLP 406 Science Park Milton Road Cambridge CB4 0WW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/49] | Piotrowicz, Pawel Jan Andrzej, et al Venner Shipley LLP Byron House Cambridge Business Park Cowley Road Cambridge CB4 0WZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 17167121.7 | 19.04.2017 | [2017/49] | Priority number, date | JP20160099244 | 18.05.2016 Original published format: JP 2016099244 | [2017/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3253040 | Date: | 06.12.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3253040 | Date: | 09.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/00, A61B5/00, H04N1/21, H04N1/23 | [2017/49] | CPC: |
G16H30/20 (EP,US);
A61B5/00 (EP,US);
G06F3/1236 (US);
G06F3/1268 (US);
H04N1/00 (EP,US);
H04N1/00127 (EP,US);
H04N1/00244 (EP,US);
H04N1/00249 (EP,US);
H04N1/00408 (EP,US);
H04N1/00525 (EP,US);
H04N1/21 (EP,US);
H04N1/2338 (EP,US);
G01R33/543 (EP,US);
H04N2201/0079 (EP,US);
H04N2201/0081 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/23] |
Former [2017/49] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | BILDERZEUGUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2017/49] | English: | IMAGE FORMING APPARATUS | [2017/49] | French: | APPAREIL DE FORMATION D'IMAGES | [2017/49] | Examination procedure | 19.04.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.04.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.04.2018 | Examination requested [2018/23] | 18.02.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.03.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.06.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.09.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 10.09.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.09.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 10.09.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.04.2017 | AL | 09.12.2020 | AT | 09.12.2020 | CY | 09.12.2020 | CZ | 09.12.2020 | DK | 09.12.2020 | EE | 09.12.2020 | ES | 09.12.2020 | FI | 09.12.2020 | HR | 09.12.2020 | IT | 09.12.2020 | LT | 09.12.2020 | LV | 09.12.2020 | MC | 09.12.2020 | MK | 09.12.2020 | MT | 09.12.2020 | PL | 09.12.2020 | RO | 09.12.2020 | RS | 09.12.2020 | SE | 09.12.2020 | SI | 09.12.2020 | SK | 09.12.2020 | SM | 09.12.2020 | BG | 09.03.2021 | NO | 09.03.2021 | GR | 10.03.2021 | IS | 09.04.2021 | PT | 09.04.2021 | IE | 19.04.2021 | LU | 19.04.2021 | BE | 30.04.2021 | CH | 30.04.2021 | LI | 30.04.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 19.04.2017 | |
AL | 09.12.2020 | ||
AT | 09.12.2020 | ||
CY | 09.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2020 | ||
DK | 09.12.2020 | ||
EE | 09.12.2020 | ||
ES | 09.12.2020 | ||
FI | 09.12.2020 | ||
HR | 09.12.2020 | ||
IT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LV | 09.12.2020 | ||
MC | 09.12.2020 | ||
MK | 09.12.2020 | ||
PL | 09.12.2020 | ||
RO | 09.12.2020 | ||
RS | 09.12.2020 | ||
SE | 09.12.2020 | ||
SI | 09.12.2020 | ||
SK | 09.12.2020 | ||
SM | 09.12.2020 | ||
BG | 09.03.2021 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
GR | 10.03.2021 | ||
IS | 09.04.2021 | ||
PT | 09.04.2021 | ||
IE | 19.04.2021 | ||
LU | 19.04.2021 | ||
BE | 30.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 19.04.2017 | |
AL | 09.12.2020 | ||
AT | 09.12.2020 | ||
CY | 09.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2020 | ||
DK | 09.12.2020 | ||
EE | 09.12.2020 | ||
ES | 09.12.2020 | ||
FI | 09.12.2020 | ||
HR | 09.12.2020 | ||
IT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LV | 09.12.2020 | ||
MC | 09.12.2020 | ||
PL | 09.12.2020 | ||
RO | 09.12.2020 | ||
RS | 09.12.2020 | ||
SE | 09.12.2020 | ||
SI | 09.12.2020 | ||
SK | 09.12.2020 | ||
SM | 09.12.2020 | ||
BG | 09.03.2021 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
GR | 10.03.2021 | ||
IS | 09.04.2021 | ||
PT | 09.04.2021 | ||
IE | 19.04.2021 | ||
LU | 19.04.2021 | ||
BE | 30.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2023/29] | HU | 19.04.2017 | |
AL | 09.12.2020 | ||
AT | 09.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2020 | ||
DK | 09.12.2020 | ||
EE | 09.12.2020 | ||
ES | 09.12.2020 | ||
FI | 09.12.2020 | ||
HR | 09.12.2020 | ||
IT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LV | 09.12.2020 | ||
MC | 09.12.2020 | ||
PL | 09.12.2020 | ||
RO | 09.12.2020 | ||
RS | 09.12.2020 | ||
SE | 09.12.2020 | ||
SI | 09.12.2020 | ||
SK | 09.12.2020 | ||
SM | 09.12.2020 | ||
BG | 09.03.2021 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
GR | 10.03.2021 | ||
IS | 09.04.2021 | ||
PT | 09.04.2021 | ||
IE | 19.04.2021 | ||
LU | 19.04.2021 | ||
BE | 30.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 09.12.2020 | |
AT | 09.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2020 | ||
DK | 09.12.2020 | ||
EE | 09.12.2020 | ||
ES | 09.12.2020 | ||
FI | 09.12.2020 | ||
HR | 09.12.2020 | ||
IT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LV | 09.12.2020 | ||
MC | 09.12.2020 | ||
PL | 09.12.2020 | ||
RO | 09.12.2020 | ||
RS | 09.12.2020 | ||
SE | 09.12.2020 | ||
SI | 09.12.2020 | ||
SK | 09.12.2020 | ||
SM | 09.12.2020 | ||
BG | 09.03.2021 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
GR | 10.03.2021 | ||
IS | 09.04.2021 | ||
PT | 09.04.2021 | ||
IE | 19.04.2021 | ||
LU | 19.04.2021 | ||
BE | 30.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 09.12.2020 | |
AT | 09.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2020 | ||
DK | 09.12.2020 | ||
EE | 09.12.2020 | ||
ES | 09.12.2020 | ||
FI | 09.12.2020 | ||
HR | 09.12.2020 | ||
IT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LV | 09.12.2020 | ||
MC | 09.12.2020 | ||
PL | 09.12.2020 | ||
RO | 09.12.2020 | ||
RS | 09.12.2020 | ||
SE | 09.12.2020 | ||
SI | 09.12.2020 | ||
SK | 09.12.2020 | ||
SM | 09.12.2020 | ||
BG | 09.03.2021 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
GR | 10.03.2021 | ||
IS | 09.04.2021 | ||
PT | 09.04.2021 | ||
IE | 19.04.2021 | ||
LU | 19.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AL | 09.12.2020 | |
AT | 09.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2020 | ||
DK | 09.12.2020 | ||
EE | 09.12.2020 | ||
ES | 09.12.2020 | ||
FI | 09.12.2020 | ||
HR | 09.12.2020 | ||
IT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LV | 09.12.2020 | ||
MC | 09.12.2020 | ||
PL | 09.12.2020 | ||
RO | 09.12.2020 | ||
RS | 09.12.2020 | ||
SE | 09.12.2020 | ||
SI | 09.12.2020 | ||
SK | 09.12.2020 | ||
SM | 09.12.2020 | ||
BG | 09.03.2021 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
GR | 10.03.2021 | ||
PT | 09.04.2021 | ||
IE | 19.04.2021 | ||
LU | 19.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 09.12.2020 | |
AT | 09.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2020 | ||
DK | 09.12.2020 | ||
EE | 09.12.2020 | ||
ES | 09.12.2020 | ||
FI | 09.12.2020 | ||
HR | 09.12.2020 | ||
IT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LV | 09.12.2020 | ||
MC | 09.12.2020 | ||
PL | 09.12.2020 | ||
RO | 09.12.2020 | ||
RS | 09.12.2020 | ||
SE | 09.12.2020 | ||
SI | 09.12.2020 | ||
SK | 09.12.2020 | ||
SM | 09.12.2020 | ||
BG | 09.03.2021 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
GR | 10.03.2021 | ||
PT | 09.04.2021 | ||
LU | 19.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AL | 09.12.2020 | |
AT | 09.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2020 | ||
DK | 09.12.2020 | ||
EE | 09.12.2020 | ||
ES | 09.12.2020 | ||
FI | 09.12.2020 | ||
HR | 09.12.2020 | ||
IT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LV | 09.12.2020 | ||
MC | 09.12.2020 | ||
PL | 09.12.2020 | ||
RO | 09.12.2020 | ||
RS | 09.12.2020 | ||
SE | 09.12.2020 | ||
SI | 09.12.2020 | ||
SK | 09.12.2020 | ||
SM | 09.12.2020 | ||
BG | 09.03.2021 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
GR | 10.03.2021 | ||
IS | 09.04.2021 | ||
PT | 09.04.2021 | ||
LU | 19.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/04] | AL | 09.12.2020 | |
AT | 09.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2020 | ||
DK | 09.12.2020 | ||
EE | 09.12.2020 | ||
FI | 09.12.2020 | ||
HR | 09.12.2020 | ||
IT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LV | 09.12.2020 | ||
MC | 09.12.2020 | ||
PL | 09.12.2020 | ||
RO | 09.12.2020 | ||
RS | 09.12.2020 | ||
SE | 09.12.2020 | ||
SI | 09.12.2020 | ||
SK | 09.12.2020 | ||
SM | 09.12.2020 | ||
BG | 09.03.2021 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
GR | 10.03.2021 | ||
IS | 09.04.2021 | ||
PT | 09.04.2021 | ||
LU | 19.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AL | 09.12.2020 | |
AT | 09.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2020 | ||
DK | 09.12.2020 | ||
EE | 09.12.2020 | ||
FI | 09.12.2020 | ||
HR | 09.12.2020 | ||
IT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LV | 09.12.2020 | ||
MC | 09.12.2020 | ||
PL | 09.12.2020 | ||
RO | 09.12.2020 | ||
RS | 09.12.2020 | ||
SE | 09.12.2020 | ||
SI | 09.12.2020 | ||
SK | 09.12.2020 | ||
SM | 09.12.2020 | ||
BG | 09.03.2021 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
GR | 10.03.2021 | ||
IS | 09.04.2021 | ||
PT | 09.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AL | 09.12.2020 | |
AT | 09.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2020 | ||
DK | 09.12.2020 | ||
EE | 09.12.2020 | ||
FI | 09.12.2020 | ||
HR | 09.12.2020 | ||
IT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LV | 09.12.2020 | ||
PL | 09.12.2020 | ||
RO | 09.12.2020 | ||
RS | 09.12.2020 | ||
SE | 09.12.2020 | ||
SI | 09.12.2020 | ||
SK | 09.12.2020 | ||
SM | 09.12.2020 | ||
BG | 09.03.2021 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
GR | 10.03.2021 | ||
IS | 09.04.2021 | ||
PT | 09.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AL | 09.12.2020 | |
AT | 09.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2020 | ||
EE | 09.12.2020 | ||
FI | 09.12.2020 | ||
HR | 09.12.2020 | ||
IT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LV | 09.12.2020 | ||
PL | 09.12.2020 | ||
RO | 09.12.2020 | ||
RS | 09.12.2020 | ||
SE | 09.12.2020 | ||
SK | 09.12.2020 | ||
SM | 09.12.2020 | ||
BG | 09.03.2021 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
GR | 10.03.2021 | ||
IS | 09.04.2021 | ||
PT | 09.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AL | 09.12.2020 | |
AT | 09.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2020 | ||
EE | 09.12.2020 | ||
FI | 09.12.2020 | ||
HR | 09.12.2020 | ||
LT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LV | 09.12.2020 | ||
PL | 09.12.2020 | ||
RO | 09.12.2020 | ||
RS | 09.12.2020 | ||
SE | 09.12.2020 | ||
SK | 09.12.2020 | ||
SM | 09.12.2020 | ||
BG | 09.03.2021 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
GR | 10.03.2021 | ||
IS | 09.04.2021 | ||
PT | 09.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/42] | AT | 09.12.2020 | |
CZ | 09.12.2020 | ||
EE | 09.12.2020 | ||
FI | 09.12.2020 | ||
HR | 09.12.2020 | ||
LT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LV | 09.12.2020 | ||
PL | 09.12.2020 | ||
RO | 09.12.2020 | ||
RS | 09.12.2020 | ||
SE | 09.12.2020 | ||
SK | 09.12.2020 | ||
SM | 09.12.2020 | ||
BG | 09.03.2021 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
GR | 10.03.2021 | ||
IS | 09.04.2021 | ||
PT | 09.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/39] | AT | 09.12.2020 | |
CZ | 09.12.2020 | ||
EE | 09.12.2020 | ||
FI | 09.12.2020 | ||
HR | 09.12.2020 | ||
LT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LV | 09.12.2020 | ||
PL | 09.12.2020 | ||
RO | 09.12.2020 | ||
RS | 09.12.2020 | ||
SE | 09.12.2020 | ||
SK | 09.12.2020 | ||
SM | 09.12.2020 | ||
BG | 09.03.2021 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
GR | 10.03.2021 | ||
PT | 09.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 09.12.2020 | |
CZ | 09.12.2020 | ||
EE | 09.12.2020 | ||
FI | 09.12.2020 | ||
HR | 09.12.2020 | ||
LT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LV | 09.12.2020 | ||
RO | 09.12.2020 | ||
RS | 09.12.2020 | ||
SE | 09.12.2020 | ||
SK | 09.12.2020 | ||
SM | 09.12.2020 | ||
BG | 09.03.2021 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
GR | 10.03.2021 | ||
PT | 09.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | CZ | 09.12.2020 | |
EE | 09.12.2020 | ||
FI | 09.12.2020 | ||
HR | 09.12.2020 | ||
LT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LV | 09.12.2020 | ||
RO | 09.12.2020 | ||
RS | 09.12.2020 | ||
SE | 09.12.2020 | ||
SK | 09.12.2020 | ||
SM | 09.12.2020 | ||
BG | 09.03.2021 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
GR | 10.03.2021 | ||
PT | 09.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | CZ | 09.12.2020 | |
FI | 09.12.2020 | ||
HR | 09.12.2020 | ||
LT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LV | 09.12.2020 | ||
RO | 09.12.2020 | ||
RS | 09.12.2020 | ||
SE | 09.12.2020 | ||
SK | 09.12.2020 | ||
SM | 09.12.2020 | ||
BG | 09.03.2021 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
GR | 10.03.2021 | ||
PT | 09.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/34] | CZ | 09.12.2020 | |
FI | 09.12.2020 | ||
HR | 09.12.2020 | ||
LT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LV | 09.12.2020 | ||
RS | 09.12.2020 | ||
SE | 09.12.2020 | ||
SM | 09.12.2020 | ||
BG | 09.03.2021 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
GR | 10.03.2021 | ||
PT | 09.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 09.12.2020 | |
HR | 09.12.2020 | ||
LT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LV | 09.12.2020 | ||
RS | 09.12.2020 | ||
SE | 09.12.2020 | ||
SM | 09.12.2020 | ||
BG | 09.03.2021 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
GR | 10.03.2021 | ||
PT | 09.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/32] | FI | 09.12.2020 | |
HR | 09.12.2020 | ||
LV | 09.12.2020 | ||
RS | 09.12.2020 | ||
SE | 09.12.2020 | ||
SM | 09.12.2020 | ||
BG | 09.03.2021 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
GR | 10.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | FI | 09.12.2020 | |
HR | 09.12.2020 | ||
LV | 09.12.2020 | ||
RS | 09.12.2020 | ||
SE | 09.12.2020 | ||
BG | 09.03.2021 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
GR | 10.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | FI | 09.12.2020 | |
LV | 09.12.2020 | ||
RS | 09.12.2020 | ||
SE | 09.12.2020 | ||
BG | 09.03.2021 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
GR | 10.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | FI | 09.12.2020 | |
RS | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/20] | FI | 09.12.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [XDA]JP2001094744 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD) [XD] 1-13 * abstract * [A] 14; | [A]CN1315714 (HONGGUANG FINE INDUSTRY CO LTD [CN]) [A] 1-13* abstract *; | [A]EP1217819 (XEROX CORP [US]) [A] 1-14 * abstract *; | [XA]US2009316013 (LARGENT JANA C [US], et al) [X] 1-8 * abstract * * figures 1,2 * * claim 7 * [A] 9-14 | by applicant | JP2001094744 |