EP3235956 - DEVICE FOR MOUNTING AND FASTENING OF WORKING TOOLS ON CONSTRUCTION MACHINES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.09.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 22.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.10.2018 [2018/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nagler, Jürgen Kirchender Dorfweg 5 58313 Herdecke / DE | [2017/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2017/43] | Representative(s) | Meinke, Jochen Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Meinke, Dabringhaus und Partner Rosa-Luxemburg-Strasse 18 44141 Dortmund / DE | [2017/43] | Application number, filing date | 17167325.4 | 20.04.2017 | [2017/43] | Priority number, date | DE201620102096U | 21.04.2016 Original published format: DE 202016102096 U | [2017/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3235956 | Date: | 25.10.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.09.2017 | Classification | IPC: | E02F3/36 | [2017/43] | CPC: |
E02F3/3622 (EP);
E02F3/365 (EP);
E02F3/3663 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/43] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR AUFNAHME UND BEFESTIGUNG VON ARBEITSWERKZEUGEN AN BAUMASCHINEN | [2017/43] | English: | DEVICE FOR MOUNTING AND FASTENING OF WORKING TOOLS ON CONSTRUCTION MACHINES | [2017/43] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE RÉCEPTION ET DE FIXATION D'OUTILS DE TRAVAIL SUR DES ENGINS DE CONSTRUCTION | [2017/43] | Examination procedure | 26.04.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/42] | 04.06.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2018/42] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]AU2008202616B (INMAN BRADLEY THOMAS [AU]) [X] 1-15 * page 10, line 23 - page 12, line 17; figure - *; | [I]WO2010063053 (WACKER NEUSON LINZ GMBH [AT], et al) [I] 1-7,9-15 * page 3, line 6 - page 4, line 16; figure - * | by applicant | DE20119092U |