EP3297401 - INDUCTION COOKING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.01.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.02.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.01.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.09.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 16.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2018/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKAHASHI, Tomoya c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka, 540-6207 / JP | 02 /
ISAGO, Hiroshi c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka, 540-6207 / JP | [2018/12] | Representative(s) | SSM Sandmair Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt Partnerschaft mbB Joseph-Wild-Straße 20 81829 München / DE | [2019/12] |
Former [2018/12] | Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt Partnerschaft mbB Joseph-Wild-Straße 20 81829 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 17167449.2 | 21.04.2017 | [2018/12] | Priority number, date | JP20160180817 | 15.09.2016 Original published format: JP 2016180817 | [2018/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3297401 | Date: | 21.03.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3297401 | Date: | 20.03.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.11.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H05B6/12 | [2018/12] | CPC: |
H05B6/1263 (EP,US);
H05B6/42 (US);
A47J36/2483 (US);
H05B6/1209 (US);
H05B6/1281 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/43] |
Former [2018/12] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | INDUKTIONSKOCHVORRICHTUNG | [2018/12] | English: | INDUCTION COOKING DEVICE | [2018/12] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE CUISSON PAR INDUCTION | [2018/12] | Examination procedure | 21.04.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.09.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.09.2018 | Examination requested [2018/43] | 07.01.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.02.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 04.02.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.02.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/09] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.04.2017 | AL | 20.03.2019 | AT | 20.03.2019 | CY | 20.03.2019 | CZ | 20.03.2019 | DK | 20.03.2019 | EE | 20.03.2019 | ES | 20.03.2019 | FI | 20.03.2019 | HR | 20.03.2019 | IT | 20.03.2019 | LT | 20.03.2019 | LV | 20.03.2019 | MC | 20.03.2019 | MK | 20.03.2019 | MT | 20.03.2019 | NL | 20.03.2019 | PL | 20.03.2019 | RO | 20.03.2019 | RS | 20.03.2019 | SE | 20.03.2019 | SI | 20.03.2019 | SK | 20.03.2019 | SM | 20.03.2019 | TR | 20.03.2019 | IE | 21.04.2019 | LU | 21.04.2019 | BE | 30.04.2019 | FR | 20.05.2019 | BG | 20.06.2019 | NO | 20.06.2019 | GR | 21.06.2019 | IS | 20.07.2019 | PT | 20.07.2019 | [2022/32] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 21.04.2017 | |
AL | 20.03.2019 | ||
AT | 20.03.2019 | ||
CY | 20.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.03.2019 | ||
DK | 20.03.2019 | ||
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
ES | 20.03.2019 | ||
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
MC | 20.03.2019 | ||
MT | 20.03.2019 | ||
NL | 20.03.2019 | ||
PL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RO | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
SE | 20.03.2019 | ||
SI | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
SM | 20.03.2019 | ||
TR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IE | 21.04.2019 | ||
LU | 21.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
FR | 20.05.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
IS | 20.07.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 21.04.2017 | |
AL | 20.03.2019 | ||
AT | 20.03.2019 | ||
CY | 20.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.03.2019 | ||
DK | 20.03.2019 | ||
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
ES | 20.03.2019 | ||
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
MC | 20.03.2019 | ||
NL | 20.03.2019 | ||
PL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RO | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
SE | 20.03.2019 | ||
SI | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
SM | 20.03.2019 | ||
TR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IE | 21.04.2019 | ||
LU | 21.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
FR | 20.05.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
IS | 20.07.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 20.03.2019 | |
AT | 20.03.2019 | ||
CY | 20.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.03.2019 | ||
DK | 20.03.2019 | ||
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
ES | 20.03.2019 | ||
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
MC | 20.03.2019 | ||
NL | 20.03.2019 | ||
PL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RO | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
SE | 20.03.2019 | ||
SI | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
SM | 20.03.2019 | ||
TR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IE | 21.04.2019 | ||
LU | 21.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
FR | 20.05.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
IS | 20.07.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 20.03.2019 | |
AT | 20.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.03.2019 | ||
DK | 20.03.2019 | ||
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
ES | 20.03.2019 | ||
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
MC | 20.03.2019 | ||
NL | 20.03.2019 | ||
PL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RO | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
SE | 20.03.2019 | ||
SI | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
SM | 20.03.2019 | ||
TR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IE | 21.04.2019 | ||
LU | 21.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
FR | 20.05.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
IS | 20.07.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/21] | AL | 20.03.2019 | |
AT | 20.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.03.2019 | ||
DK | 20.03.2019 | ||
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
ES | 20.03.2019 | ||
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
MC | 20.03.2019 | ||
NL | 20.03.2019 | ||
PL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RO | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
SE | 20.03.2019 | ||
SI | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
SM | 20.03.2019 | ||
TR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IE | 21.04.2019 | ||
LU | 21.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
IS | 20.07.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 20.03.2019 | |
AT | 20.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.03.2019 | ||
DK | 20.03.2019 | ||
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
ES | 20.03.2019 | ||
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
MC | 20.03.2019 | ||
NL | 20.03.2019 | ||
PL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RO | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
SE | 20.03.2019 | ||
SI | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
SM | 20.03.2019 | ||
TR | 20.03.2019 | ||
LU | 21.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
IS | 20.07.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AL | 20.03.2019 | |
AT | 20.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.03.2019 | ||
DK | 20.03.2019 | ||
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
ES | 20.03.2019 | ||
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
MC | 20.03.2019 | ||
NL | 20.03.2019 | ||
PL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RO | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
SE | 20.03.2019 | ||
SI | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
SM | 20.03.2019 | ||
LU | 21.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
IS | 20.07.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 20.03.2019 | |
AT | 20.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.03.2019 | ||
DK | 20.03.2019 | ||
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
ES | 20.03.2019 | ||
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
MC | 20.03.2019 | ||
NL | 20.03.2019 | ||
PL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RO | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
SE | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
SM | 20.03.2019 | ||
LU | 21.04.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
IS | 20.07.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/07] | AL | 20.03.2019 | |
AT | 20.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.03.2019 | ||
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
ES | 20.03.2019 | ||
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
MC | 20.03.2019 | ||
NL | 20.03.2019 | ||
PL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RO | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
SE | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
SM | 20.03.2019 | ||
LU | 21.04.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
IS | 20.07.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 20.03.2019 | |
AT | 20.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.03.2019 | ||
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
ES | 20.03.2019 | ||
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
NL | 20.03.2019 | ||
PL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RO | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
SE | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
SM | 20.03.2019 | ||
LU | 21.04.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
IS | 20.07.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/03] | AL | 20.03.2019 | |
AT | 20.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.03.2019 | ||
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
ES | 20.03.2019 | ||
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
NL | 20.03.2019 | ||
PL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RO | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
SE | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
SM | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/52] | AL | 20.03.2019 | |
CZ | 20.03.2019 | ||
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
ES | 20.03.2019 | ||
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
NL | 20.03.2019 | ||
PL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RO | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
SE | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
SM | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 20.03.2019 | |
CZ | 20.03.2019 | ||
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
ES | 20.03.2019 | ||
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
NL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RO | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
SE | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
SM | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 20.03.2019 | |
CZ | 20.03.2019 | ||
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
ES | 20.03.2019 | ||
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
NL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RO | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
SE | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | ES | 20.03.2019 | |
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
NL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
SE | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | ES | 20.03.2019 | |
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
NL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
SE | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | FI | 20.03.2019 | |
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
NL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
SE | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | FI | 20.03.2019 | |
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
NL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
SE | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | FI | 20.03.2019 | |
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
SE | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | FI | 20.03.2019 | |
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
SE | 20.03.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | FI | 20.03.2019 | |
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
SE | 20.03.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | FI | 20.03.2019 | |
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2008026443 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,7-9 * paragraphs [0035] , [0039] * * paragraphs [0077] , [0078] * * figures 1,2,5,7,11 * [I] 3-6,10,11; | [A]JP2009052864 (PANASONIC CORP) [A] 1-11* figure 10 * | by applicant | JPS62136091U | JP2006147303 | JP2013118197 |