EP3231440 - MODIFIED COAGULATION FACTORS WITH PROLONGED IN VIVO HALF-LIFE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.05.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.08.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.04.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 15.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.05.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.06.2021 [2021/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CSL Behring GmbH Emil-von-Behring-Strasse 76 35041 Marburg / DE | [2017/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHULTE, Stefan Bauerbacher Strasse 46 35043 Marburg / DE | 02 /
WEIMER, Thomas Richard-Wagner-Strasse 8 35075 Gladenbach / DE | 03 /
METZNER, Hubert Im Boden 6 35041 Marburg / DE | [2017/42] | Representative(s) | Ludwig, Holger, et al CSL Behring AG Wankdorfstrasse 10 3014 Bern / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2017/42] | Ludwig, Holger, et al CSL Behring GmbH Emil-von-Behring-Straße 76 35041 Marburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 17167481.5 | 21.12.2007 | [2017/42] | Priority number, date | EP20060026747 | 22.12.2006 Original published format: EP 06026747 | US20070879334P | 09.01.2007 Original published format: US 879334 P | [2017/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3231440 | Date: | 18.10.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.09.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/37, A61K38/38, C07K14/755, C07K14/76, C12N15/09, C07K14/745, C07K14/765, C07K16/18 | [2017/42] | CPC: |
C07K14/755 (EP,US);
A61P7/04 (EP);
C07K14/745 (EP,US);
C07K14/765 (US);
C07K16/18 (US);
C07K2319/31 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/22] |
Former [2017/42] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERÄNDERTE KOAGULATIONSFAKTOREN MIT VERLÄNGERTER IN-VIVO-HALBWERTZEIT | [2017/42] | English: | MODIFIED COAGULATION FACTORS WITH PROLONGED IN VIVO HALF-LIFE | [2017/42] | French: | FACTEURS DE COAGULATION MODIFIÉS AVEC UNE DEMI-VIE IN VIVO PROLONGÉE | [2017/42] | Examination procedure | 21.04.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.04.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.04.2018 | Examination requested [2018/22] | 24.08.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.01.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/23] | 03.02.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/23] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP07857067.8 / EP2097096 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 02.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 02.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 02.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2020 | 14   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IY]WO2006108590 (ZLB BEHRING GMBH [DE], et al) [I] 1-21 * Th whole document, but see in particular page 5, last paragraph; page 6, lines 1-6; pages 23,24; claims 1-19 * [Y] 1-21; | [Y]WO2006027111 (ZLB BEHRING GMBH [DE], et al) [Y] 1-21 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO2005111074 (ZLB BEHRING GMBH [DE], et al) [Y] 1-21 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO2004082640 (NEW CENTURY PHARMACEUTICALS [US], et al) [Y] 1-21 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP1444986 (AVENTIS BEHRING GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-21 * the whole document *; | [Y]US5364771 (LOLLAR JOHN S [US], et al) [Y] 1-21 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO0168109 (UNIV EMORY [US]) [Y] 1-21 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO0071714 (AMERICAN NAT RED CROSS [US], et al) [Y] 1-21 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO0101749 (GENENTECH INC [US]) [Y] 1-21 * the whole document *; | [YD]WO2004101740 (SYNTONIX PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al) [YD] 1-21 * the whole document *; | [YD]WO0179271 (PRINCIPIA PHARMACEUTICAL CORP [US], et al) [YD] 1-21 * the whole document *; | [YD]WO2005024044 (GTC BIOTHERAPEUTICS INC [US], et al) [YD] 1-21 * the whole document *; | [YP]EP1867660 (CSL BEHRING GMBH [DE]) [YP] 1-21 * the whole document *; | [YP]EP1816201 (CSL BEHRING GMBH [DE]) [YP] 1-21 * See in particular paragraph [0054] and Table 3 * | [Y] - SHEFFIELD W P ET AL, "Effects of genetic fusion of factor IX to albumin on in vivo clearance in mice and rabbits", BRITISH JOURNAL OF HAEMATOLOGY, OXFORD, GB, (200408), vol. 126, no. 4, ISSN 0007-1048, pages 565 - 573, XP002395198 [Y] 1-21 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1365-2141.2004.05106.x | [Y] - LIN YI ET AL, "Use of blood outgrowth endothelial cells for gene therapy for hemophilia A", BLOOD, (20020115), vol. 99, no. 2, ISSN 0006-4971, pages 457 - 462, XP002430423 [Y] 1-21 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1182/blood.V99.2.457 | [YD] - PIPE S W ET AL, "Characterization of a genetically engineered inactivation-resistant coagulation factor VIIIa", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA, NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCE, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (199710), vol. 94, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 11851 - 11856, XP002969281 [YD] 1-21 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.94.22.11851 | [Y] - PITTMAN D D ET AL, "BIOCHEMICAL, IMMUNOLOGICAL, AND IN VIVO FUNCTIONAL CHARACTERIZATIONOF B-DOMAIN-DELETED FACTOR VIII", BLOOD, W.B. SAUNDERS, PHILADELPHIA, VA, US, (19930601), vol. 81, no. 11, ISSN 0006-4971, pages 2925 - 2935, XP000676711 [Y] 1-21 * the whole document * | by applicant | WO03093313 | WO02060951 | WO9415625 | WO9711957 | US4970300 | WO9955306 | WO9703193 | WO9740145 | WO03087355 | WO02072023 | WO02103024 | WO2006108590 | WO0179271 | WO2005024044 | WO2004101740 | US2004087778 | WO2005001025 | WO2006000448 | WO2005063808 | WO03076567 | WO2005000892 | US6403077 | WO2004005347 | - WOOD ET AL., NATURE, (1984), vol. 312, pages 330 - 336 | - VEHAR ET AL., NATURE, (1984), vol. 312, pages 337 - 342 | - SAENKO ET AL., VOX SANG., (2002), vol. 83, pages 89 - 96 | - FAY ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1991), vol. 266, page 8957 | - FAY; SMUDZIN, J. BIOL. CHEM., (1992), vol. 267, pages 13246 - 50 | - PIPE; KAUFMAN, PNAS, (1997), vol. 94, pages 11851 - 11856 | - GALE ET AL., PROTEIN SCIENCE, (2002), vol. 11, pages 2091 - 2101 | - GALE ET AL., J. THROMB. HAEMOST., (2003), vol. 1, pages 1966 - 1971 | - ALEDORT, J THROMB HAEMOST, (2004), vol. 2, pages 1700 - 1708 | - BEATTIE; DUGAICZYK, GENE, (1982), vol. 20, pages 415 - 422 | - LICHENSTEIN ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1994), vol. 269, pages 18149 - 18154 | - COOKE; DAVID, J. CLIN. INVEST., (1985), vol. 76, pages 2420 - 2424 | - DUMONT JA ET AL., BIODRUGS, (2006), vol. 20, pages 151 - 160 | - AMANO, THROMB. HAEMOST., (1998), vol. 79, pages 557 - 563 | - SWAROOP ET AL., JBC, (1997), vol. 272, pages 24121 - 24124 | - LOLLAR, THROMB. HAEMOST., (1999), vol. 82, pages 505 - 508 | - OH ET AL., EXP. MOL. MED., (1999), vol. 31, pages 95 - 100 | - ANANYEVA ET AL., TCM, (2001), vol. 11, pages 251 - 257 | - GALE ET AL., J. THROMB. HEMOST., (2006), vol. 4, pages 1315 - 1322 | - MIAO ET AL., BLOOD, (2004), vol. 103, pages 3412 - 3419 | - WAKABAYASHI ET AL., BIOCHEMISTRY, (2005), vol. 44, pages 10298 - 304 | - PIPE, SEM. THROMB. HEMOST., (2004), vol. 30, pages 227 - 237 | - S. ROSEN, SCAND J HAEMATOL, (1984), vol. 33, pages 139 - 145 | - PITTMAN ET AL., BLOOD, (1992), vol. 81, pages 2925 - 2935 | - NAKAYAMA, BIOCHEM. J., (1997), vol. 327, pages 625 - 635 | - COLLINS ET AL., PROC NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1987), vol. 84, pages 4393 - 4397 | - FEDERICI AB ET AL., HAEMATOLOGICA, (2004), vol. 89, pages 77 - 85 | - SUCKER ET AL., CLIN APPL THROMB HEMOST., (2006), vol. 12, pages 305 - 310 | - KALLAS; TALPSEP, ANNALS OF HEMATOLOGY, (2001), vol. 80, pages 466 - 471 | - SELIGSOHN ET AL., BLOOD, (1978), vol. 52, pages 978 - 988 | - MORISSEY ET AL., BLOOD, (1993), vol. 81, pages 734 - 744 | - CHAVIN; WEIDNER, J. BIOL. CHEM., (1984), vol. 259, pages 3387 - 3390 | - VAN WIJK ET AL., THROMB. RES., (1981), vol. 22, pages 681 - 686 | - COMB ET AL., BLOOD, (1984), vol. 63, pages 15 - 21 | - HEEB ET AL., J. THROMB. HAEMOST., (2006), vol. 4, pages 385 - 391 | - PETROVAN ET AL., AM. J. CLIN. PATHOL., (1999), vol. 112, pages 705 - 711 | - TABATABAI ET AL., THROMB. HAEMOST., (2001), vol. 85, pages 655 - 660 | - BICK ET AL., BEITR. PATHOL., (1973), vol. 150, pages 311 - 315 |