EP3236092 - ACTIVE MAGNETIC BEARING CONTROLLER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.06.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.07.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.03.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.03.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.11.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.04.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.05.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 22.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ingersoll-Rand Industrial U.S., Inc. 800-E Beaty Street Davidson, NC 28036 / US | [2021/33] |
Former [2020/18] | For all designated states Ingersoll-Rand Industrial U.S., Inc. 800-E Beaty Street Davidson, NC 28036 / US | ||
Former [2017/43] | For all designated states Ingersoll-Rand Company 800-D Beaty Street Davidson, NC 28036 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SALMIA, Lauri Juhani Hyljekoukku 7 A 1 Espoo 02260 Uusimma / FI | 02 /
SAARI, Juha T Vuoriharjunpuisto 22 Espoo 02260 Uusimma / FI | 03 /
MÄKI-ONTTO, Petri J Rajamannynahde 3A Espoo 02260 Uusimma / FI | 04 /
KOMULAINEN, Risto Harjutie 5 A 01820 Klaukkala / FI | [2021/33] |
Former [2017/43] | 01 /
SALMIA, Lauri Juhani Hyljekoukku 7 A 1 Espoo FI-02260 Uusimma / FI | ||
02 /
SAARI, Juha T Vuoriharjunpuisto 22 Espoo FI-02260 Uusimma / FI | |||
03 /
MÄKI-ONTTO, Petri J Rajamannynahde 3A Espoo FI-02260 Uusimma / FI | |||
04 /
KOMULAINEN, Risto Harjutie 5 A 01820 Klaukkala / FI | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/33] | Murgitroyd & Company Murgitroyd House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | ||
Former [2017/43] | McCartney, Jonathan William Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 17167765.1 | 24.04.2017 | [2017/43] | Priority number, date | US201615136153 | 22.04.2016 Original published format: US201615136153 | [2017/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3236092 | Date: | 25.10.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3236092 | Date: | 18.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.09.2017 | Classification | IPC: | F16C32/04 | [2017/43] | CPC: |
F16C32/0457 (EP,US);
F16C32/0451 (CN);
F16C2380/26 (CN);
F16C32/0448 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/23] |
Former [2017/43] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | AKTIVES MAGNETLAGERSTEUERGERÄT | [2017/43] | English: | ACTIVE MAGNETIC BEARING CONTROLLER | [2017/43] | French: | COMMANDE DE PALIER MAGNÉTIQUE ACTIF | [2017/43] | Examination procedure | 24.04.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.04.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.04.2018 | Examination requested [2018/23] | 14.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.08.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.11.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.03.2021 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 09.04.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.07.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 12.07.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.07.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 19.05.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.04.2017 | AL | 18.08.2021 | AT | 18.08.2021 | CY | 18.08.2021 | CZ | 18.08.2021 | DK | 18.08.2021 | EE | 18.08.2021 | ES | 18.08.2021 | FI | 18.08.2021 | HR | 18.08.2021 | LT | 18.08.2021 | LV | 18.08.2021 | MC | 18.08.2021 | MK | 18.08.2021 | MT | 18.08.2021 | NL | 18.08.2021 | PL | 18.08.2021 | RO | 18.08.2021 | RS | 18.08.2021 | SE | 18.08.2021 | SI | 18.08.2021 | SK | 18.08.2021 | SM | 18.08.2021 | TR | 18.08.2021 | BG | 18.11.2021 | NO | 18.11.2021 | GR | 19.11.2021 | IS | 18.12.2021 | PT | 20.12.2021 | GB | 24.04.2022 | IE | 24.04.2022 | LU | 24.04.2022 | CH | 30.04.2022 | FR | 30.04.2022 | LI | 30.04.2022 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 24.04.2017 | |
AL | 18.08.2021 | ||
AT | 18.08.2021 | ||
CY | 18.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2021 | ||
DK | 18.08.2021 | ||
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
ES | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
MC | 18.08.2021 | ||
MK | 18.08.2021 | ||
NL | 18.08.2021 | ||
PL | 18.08.2021 | ||
RO | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
SI | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
SM | 18.08.2021 | ||
TR | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
GB | 24.04.2022 | ||
IE | 24.04.2022 | ||
LU | 24.04.2022 | ||
CH | 30.04.2022 | ||
FR | 30.04.2022 | ||
LI | 30.04.2022 | ||
Former [2024/22] | HU | 24.04.2017 | |
AL | 18.08.2021 | ||
AT | 18.08.2021 | ||
CY | 18.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2021 | ||
DK | 18.08.2021 | ||
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
ES | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
MC | 18.08.2021 | ||
MK | 18.08.2021 | ||
NL | 18.08.2021 | ||
PL | 18.08.2021 | ||
RO | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
SI | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
SM | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
GB | 24.04.2022 | ||
IE | 24.04.2022 | ||
LU | 24.04.2022 | ||
CH | 30.04.2022 | ||
FR | 30.04.2022 | ||
LI | 30.04.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 24.04.2017 | |
AL | 18.08.2021 | ||
AT | 18.08.2021 | ||
CY | 18.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2021 | ||
DK | 18.08.2021 | ||
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
ES | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
MC | 18.08.2021 | ||
NL | 18.08.2021 | ||
PL | 18.08.2021 | ||
RO | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
SI | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
SM | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
GB | 24.04.2022 | ||
IE | 24.04.2022 | ||
LU | 24.04.2022 | ||
CH | 30.04.2022 | ||
FR | 30.04.2022 | ||
LI | 30.04.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 24.04.2017 | |
AL | 18.08.2021 | ||
AT | 18.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2021 | ||
DK | 18.08.2021 | ||
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
ES | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
MC | 18.08.2021 | ||
NL | 18.08.2021 | ||
PL | 18.08.2021 | ||
RO | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
SI | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
SM | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
GB | 24.04.2022 | ||
IE | 24.04.2022 | ||
LU | 24.04.2022 | ||
CH | 30.04.2022 | ||
FR | 30.04.2022 | ||
LI | 30.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | AL | 18.08.2021 | |
AT | 18.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2021 | ||
DK | 18.08.2021 | ||
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
ES | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
MC | 18.08.2021 | ||
NL | 18.08.2021 | ||
PL | 18.08.2021 | ||
RO | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
SI | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
SM | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
GB | 24.04.2022 | ||
IE | 24.04.2022 | ||
LU | 24.04.2022 | ||
CH | 30.04.2022 | ||
FR | 30.04.2022 | ||
LI | 30.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AL | 18.08.2021 | |
AT | 18.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2021 | ||
DK | 18.08.2021 | ||
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
ES | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
MC | 18.08.2021 | ||
NL | 18.08.2021 | ||
PL | 18.08.2021 | ||
RO | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
SI | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
SM | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
GB | 24.04.2022 | ||
LU | 24.04.2022 | ||
CH | 30.04.2022 | ||
FR | 30.04.2022 | ||
LI | 30.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AL | 18.08.2021 | |
AT | 18.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2021 | ||
DK | 18.08.2021 | ||
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
ES | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
MC | 18.08.2021 | ||
NL | 18.08.2021 | ||
PL | 18.08.2021 | ||
RO | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
SI | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
SM | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
GB | 24.04.2022 | ||
LU | 24.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/06] | AL | 18.08.2021 | |
AT | 18.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2021 | ||
DK | 18.08.2021 | ||
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
ES | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
MC | 18.08.2021 | ||
NL | 18.08.2021 | ||
PL | 18.08.2021 | ||
RO | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
SI | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
SM | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 18.08.2021 | |
AT | 18.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2021 | ||
DK | 18.08.2021 | ||
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
ES | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
NL | 18.08.2021 | ||
PL | 18.08.2021 | ||
RO | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
SI | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
SM | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 18.08.2021 | |
AT | 18.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2021 | ||
DK | 18.08.2021 | ||
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
ES | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
NL | 18.08.2021 | ||
PL | 18.08.2021 | ||
RO | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
SM | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AT | 18.08.2021 | |
CZ | 18.08.2021 | ||
DK | 18.08.2021 | ||
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
ES | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
NL | 18.08.2021 | ||
PL | 18.08.2021 | ||
RO | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
SM | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 18.08.2021 | |
CZ | 18.08.2021 | ||
DK | 18.08.2021 | ||
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
ES | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
NL | 18.08.2021 | ||
PL | 18.08.2021 | ||
RO | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 18.08.2021 | |
DK | 18.08.2021 | ||
ES | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
NL | 18.08.2021 | ||
PL | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/16] | AT | 18.08.2021 | |
ES | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
NL | 18.08.2021 | ||
PL | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 18.08.2021 | |
ES | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
PL | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 18.08.2021 | |
ES | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 18.08.2021 | |
ES | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 18.08.2021 | |
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2001013733 (SCHOB RETO [CH]) [A] 1-15* paragraphs [0001] - [0009]; figure - *; | [A]US2006125436 (LIN HUAI Y [CA]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0008] - [0013]; figure - *; | [A]US2007278987 (BARTHOLET MARTIN [CH], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0006] - [0019]; figure - *; | [XI]JP2016042768 (TOKYO INST TECH) [X] 1,2,4,5,7,8,11-15 * figure - * [I] 3,6,9,10 |