EP3239678 - TORQUE DETECTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.12.2019 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.12.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.07.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.04.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 29.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JTEKT CORPORATION 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 542-8502 / JP | [2017/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TOYAMA, Yuichi c/o JTEKT CORPORATION 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 542-8502 / JP | [2017/44] | Representative(s) | Winter, Brandl - Partnerschaft mbB Alois-Steinecker-Straße 22 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/44] | Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner, Röss, Kaiser, Polte - Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 17168043.2 | 25.04.2017 | [2017/44] | Priority number, date | JP20160091394 | 28.04.2016 Original published format: JP 2016091394 | [2017/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3239678 | Date: | 01.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3239678 | Date: | 23.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.09.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G01L3/10, G01R33/00 | [2018/31] | CPC: |
G01L3/104 (EP,US);
G01L3/00 (CN);
G01R33/0011 (US)
|
Former IPC [2017/44] | G01L3/10, B62D6/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/19] |
Former [2017/44] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | DREHMOMENTDETEKTOR | [2017/44] | English: | TORQUE DETECTOR | [2017/44] | French: | DÉTECTEUR DE COUPLE | [2017/44] | Examination procedure | 25.04.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.03.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.03.2018 | Examination requested [2018/19] | 17.07.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.11.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 21.11.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.11.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 24.10.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/01] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.04.2017 | AL | 23.01.2019 | AT | 23.01.2019 | CY | 23.01.2019 | CZ | 23.01.2019 | DK | 23.01.2019 | EE | 23.01.2019 | ES | 23.01.2019 | FI | 23.01.2019 | HR | 23.01.2019 | IT | 23.01.2019 | LT | 23.01.2019 | LV | 23.01.2019 | MC | 23.01.2019 | MK | 23.01.2019 | MT | 23.01.2019 | NL | 23.01.2019 | PL | 23.01.2019 | RO | 23.01.2019 | RS | 23.01.2019 | SE | 23.01.2019 | SI | 23.01.2019 | SK | 23.01.2019 | SM | 23.01.2019 | TR | 23.01.2019 | BG | 23.04.2019 | NO | 23.04.2019 | GR | 24.04.2019 | IE | 25.04.2019 | LU | 25.04.2019 | BE | 30.04.2019 | IS | 23.05.2019 | PT | 23.05.2019 | [2022/32] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 25.04.2017 | |
AL | 23.01.2019 | ||
AT | 23.01.2019 | ||
CY | 23.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 23.01.2019 | ||
DK | 23.01.2019 | ||
EE | 23.01.2019 | ||
ES | 23.01.2019 | ||
FI | 23.01.2019 | ||
HR | 23.01.2019 | ||
IT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LV | 23.01.2019 | ||
MC | 23.01.2019 | ||
MT | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
PL | 23.01.2019 | ||
RO | 23.01.2019 | ||
RS | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
SI | 23.01.2019 | ||
SK | 23.01.2019 | ||
SM | 23.01.2019 | ||
TR | 23.01.2019 | ||
BG | 23.04.2019 | ||
NO | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IE | 25.04.2019 | ||
LU | 25.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
IS | 23.05.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 25.04.2017 | |
AL | 23.01.2019 | ||
AT | 23.01.2019 | ||
CY | 23.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 23.01.2019 | ||
DK | 23.01.2019 | ||
EE | 23.01.2019 | ||
ES | 23.01.2019 | ||
FI | 23.01.2019 | ||
HR | 23.01.2019 | ||
IT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LV | 23.01.2019 | ||
MC | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
PL | 23.01.2019 | ||
RO | 23.01.2019 | ||
RS | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
SI | 23.01.2019 | ||
SK | 23.01.2019 | ||
SM | 23.01.2019 | ||
TR | 23.01.2019 | ||
BG | 23.04.2019 | ||
NO | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IE | 25.04.2019 | ||
LU | 25.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
IS | 23.05.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 23.01.2019 | |
AT | 23.01.2019 | ||
CY | 23.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 23.01.2019 | ||
DK | 23.01.2019 | ||
EE | 23.01.2019 | ||
ES | 23.01.2019 | ||
FI | 23.01.2019 | ||
HR | 23.01.2019 | ||
IT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LV | 23.01.2019 | ||
MC | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
PL | 23.01.2019 | ||
RO | 23.01.2019 | ||
RS | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
SI | 23.01.2019 | ||
SK | 23.01.2019 | ||
SM | 23.01.2019 | ||
TR | 23.01.2019 | ||
BG | 23.04.2019 | ||
NO | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IE | 25.04.2019 | ||
LU | 25.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
IS | 23.05.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/21] | AL | 23.01.2019 | |
AT | 23.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 23.01.2019 | ||
DK | 23.01.2019 | ||
EE | 23.01.2019 | ||
ES | 23.01.2019 | ||
FI | 23.01.2019 | ||
HR | 23.01.2019 | ||
IT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LV | 23.01.2019 | ||
MC | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
PL | 23.01.2019 | ||
RO | 23.01.2019 | ||
RS | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
SI | 23.01.2019 | ||
SK | 23.01.2019 | ||
SM | 23.01.2019 | ||
TR | 23.01.2019 | ||
BG | 23.04.2019 | ||
NO | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IE | 25.04.2019 | ||
LU | 25.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
IS | 23.05.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 23.01.2019 | |
AT | 23.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 23.01.2019 | ||
DK | 23.01.2019 | ||
EE | 23.01.2019 | ||
ES | 23.01.2019 | ||
FI | 23.01.2019 | ||
HR | 23.01.2019 | ||
IT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LV | 23.01.2019 | ||
MC | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
PL | 23.01.2019 | ||
RO | 23.01.2019 | ||
RS | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
SI | 23.01.2019 | ||
SK | 23.01.2019 | ||
SM | 23.01.2019 | ||
TR | 23.01.2019 | ||
BG | 23.04.2019 | ||
NO | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
LU | 25.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
IS | 23.05.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AL | 23.01.2019 | |
AT | 23.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 23.01.2019 | ||
DK | 23.01.2019 | ||
EE | 23.01.2019 | ||
ES | 23.01.2019 | ||
FI | 23.01.2019 | ||
HR | 23.01.2019 | ||
IT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LV | 23.01.2019 | ||
MC | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
PL | 23.01.2019 | ||
RO | 23.01.2019 | ||
RS | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
SI | 23.01.2019 | ||
SK | 23.01.2019 | ||
SM | 23.01.2019 | ||
BG | 23.04.2019 | ||
NO | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
LU | 25.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
IS | 23.05.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 23.01.2019 | |
AT | 23.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 23.01.2019 | ||
DK | 23.01.2019 | ||
EE | 23.01.2019 | ||
ES | 23.01.2019 | ||
FI | 23.01.2019 | ||
HR | 23.01.2019 | ||
IT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LV | 23.01.2019 | ||
MC | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
PL | 23.01.2019 | ||
RO | 23.01.2019 | ||
RS | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
SK | 23.01.2019 | ||
SM | 23.01.2019 | ||
BG | 23.04.2019 | ||
NO | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
LU | 25.04.2019 | ||
IS | 23.05.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/03] | AL | 23.01.2019 | |
AT | 23.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 23.01.2019 | ||
DK | 23.01.2019 | ||
EE | 23.01.2019 | ||
ES | 23.01.2019 | ||
FI | 23.01.2019 | ||
HR | 23.01.2019 | ||
IT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LV | 23.01.2019 | ||
MC | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
PL | 23.01.2019 | ||
RO | 23.01.2019 | ||
RS | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
SK | 23.01.2019 | ||
SM | 23.01.2019 | ||
BG | 23.04.2019 | ||
NO | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IS | 23.05.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/02] | AL | 23.01.2019 | |
CZ | 23.01.2019 | ||
DK | 23.01.2019 | ||
EE | 23.01.2019 | ||
ES | 23.01.2019 | ||
FI | 23.01.2019 | ||
HR | 23.01.2019 | ||
IT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LV | 23.01.2019 | ||
MC | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
PL | 23.01.2019 | ||
RO | 23.01.2019 | ||
RS | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
SK | 23.01.2019 | ||
SM | 23.01.2019 | ||
BG | 23.04.2019 | ||
NO | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IS | 23.05.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 23.01.2019 | |
CZ | 23.01.2019 | ||
DK | 23.01.2019 | ||
EE | 23.01.2019 | ||
ES | 23.01.2019 | ||
FI | 23.01.2019 | ||
HR | 23.01.2019 | ||
IT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LV | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
PL | 23.01.2019 | ||
RO | 23.01.2019 | ||
RS | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
SK | 23.01.2019 | ||
SM | 23.01.2019 | ||
BG | 23.04.2019 | ||
NO | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IS | 23.05.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 23.01.2019 | |
CZ | 23.01.2019 | ||
DK | 23.01.2019 | ||
EE | 23.01.2019 | ||
ES | 23.01.2019 | ||
FI | 23.01.2019 | ||
HR | 23.01.2019 | ||
IT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LV | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
PL | 23.01.2019 | ||
RO | 23.01.2019 | ||
RS | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
SK | 23.01.2019 | ||
BG | 23.04.2019 | ||
NO | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IS | 23.05.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | DK | 23.01.2019 | |
ES | 23.01.2019 | ||
FI | 23.01.2019 | ||
HR | 23.01.2019 | ||
IT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LV | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
PL | 23.01.2019 | ||
RS | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
BG | 23.04.2019 | ||
NO | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IS | 23.05.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | ES | 23.01.2019 | |
FI | 23.01.2019 | ||
HR | 23.01.2019 | ||
IT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LV | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
PL | 23.01.2019 | ||
RS | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
BG | 23.04.2019 | ||
NO | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IS | 23.05.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | ES | 23.01.2019 | |
FI | 23.01.2019 | ||
HR | 23.01.2019 | ||
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LV | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
PL | 23.01.2019 | ||
RS | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
BG | 23.04.2019 | ||
NO | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IS | 23.05.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | ES | 23.01.2019 | |
FI | 23.01.2019 | ||
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
PL | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
BG | 23.04.2019 | ||
NO | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | ES | 23.01.2019 | |
FI | 23.01.2019 | ||
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
PL | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
NO | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | ES | 23.01.2019 | |
FI | 23.01.2019 | ||
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
PL | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
NO | 23.04.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | FI | 23.01.2019 | |
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
NO | 23.04.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | FI | 23.01.2019 | |
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
NO | 23.04.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/30] | NL | 23.01.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [XDA]JP2014029304 (JTEKT CORP) [XD] 1-3,5,6 * figures 4-7 *[A] 4; | [XAI]EP2749856 (JTEKT CORP [JP]) [X] 1,3,5,6 * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0041] * * paragraph [0054] - paragraph [0070] * * paragraph [0099] * * figures 2,3,4,11 * [A] 4 [I] 2; | [XDAI]EP2833110 (JTEKT CORP [JP]) [XD] 1-3,6 * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0044] * * paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0068] * * figures 2-7 * [A] 4 [I] 5 | by applicant | JP2013160535 | JP2014029304 | JP2015031600 |