EP3238898 - CUTTING MACHINE AND METHOD FOR SLICING ELASTIC STRANDS, IN PARTICULAR MEAT STRANDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2017/44] | CUTTING MACHINE AND METHOD FOR SLICING FOOD ELASTIC STRANDS, IN PARTICULAR MEAT STRANDS | ||
[2019/16] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.08.2020 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.09.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.05.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.10.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 29.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TVI Entwicklung und Produktion GmbH Robert-Bosch-Str. 2 83052 Bruckmühl / DE | [2020/31] |
Former [2017/44] | For all designated states TVI Entwicklung und Produktion GmbH Salzhub 16 (Gewerbegebiet) 83737 Irschenberg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mayr, Martin Obere Bergstraße 3 83549 Eiselfing / DE | 02 /
Völkl, Thomas Josef-Völkl-Str. 12 83052 Bruckmühl / DE | [2017/44] | Representative(s) | Weickmann & Weickmann PartmbB Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | [2017/44] | Application number, filing date | 17168340.2 | 27.04.2017 | [2017/44] | Priority number, date | DE201610107849 | 28.04.2016 Original published format: DE102016107849 | [2017/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3238898 | Date: | 01.11.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3238898 | Date: | 16.10.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.09.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A22C17/00, A22C25/10, B26D5/30, B26D3/16, A22C25/08, A22C25/18, B26D5/02, B26D5/06, B26D5/08, B26D7/06, B26D7/30, B26D7/01 | [2019/16] | CPC: |
B26D7/30 (EP,CN,US);
B26D1/143 (CN);
A22C17/002 (EP,US);
A22C17/0033 (EP,US);
A22C17/02 (EP,US);
A22C25/08 (EP,US);
A22C25/10 (US);
A22C25/18 (EP,US);
B26D3/16 (EP,US);
B26D5/02 (EP,US);
B26D5/06 (EP,US);
B26D5/08 (EP,US);
B26D5/086 (EP,US);
B26D5/30 (EP,US);
B26D7/01 (EP,US);
B26D7/0608 (EP,CN,US);
B26D7/0625 (EP,US);
B26D7/0641 (EP,US);
B26D7/0683 (EP,US);
B26D7/08 (CN);
B26D7/1818 (CN);
|
Former IPC [2017/44] | B26D3/16, B26D5/06, B26D7/06, B26D7/30, A22C25/08, A22C25/18, B26D5/02, B26D5/08, B26D7/01 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/48] |
Former [2017/44] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SCHNEIDEMASCHINE SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUM AUFSCHNEIDEN VON ELASTISCHEN STRÄNGEN, INSBESONDERE FLEISCHSTRÄNGEN | [2017/44] | English: | CUTTING MACHINE AND METHOD FOR SLICING ELASTIC STRANDS, IN PARTICULAR MEAT STRANDS | [2019/16] | French: | MACHINE DE COUPE ET PROCÉDÉ DE COUPE DE CORDONS ÉLASTIQUES, EN PARTICULIER DES CORDONS DE VIANDE | [2019/16] |
Former [2017/44] | CUTTING MACHINE AND METHOD FOR SLICING FOOD ELASTIC STRANDS, IN PARTICULAR MEAT STRANDS | ||
Former [2017/44] | MACHINE DE COUPE ET PROCÉDÉ DE COUPE DE PETITES BLOCS ÉLASTIQUES, EN PARTICULIER DES BLOCS DE VIANDE | Examination procedure | 27.04.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.10.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.10.2017 | Examination requested [2017/48] | 03.05.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.09.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 03.09.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.09.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 17.07.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.04.2017 | AL | 16.10.2019 | CY | 16.10.2019 | CZ | 16.10.2019 | DK | 16.10.2019 | EE | 16.10.2019 | FI | 16.10.2019 | HR | 16.10.2019 | LT | 16.10.2019 | LV | 16.10.2019 | MC | 16.10.2019 | MK | 16.10.2019 | MT | 16.10.2019 | RO | 16.10.2019 | RS | 16.10.2019 | SE | 16.10.2019 | SI | 16.10.2019 | SK | 16.10.2019 | SM | 16.10.2019 | TR | 16.10.2019 | BG | 16.01.2020 | NO | 16.01.2020 | GR | 17.01.2020 | IS | 16.02.2020 | PT | 17.02.2020 | IE | 27.04.2020 | LU | 27.04.2020 | BE | 30.04.2020 | CH | 30.04.2020 | LI | 30.04.2020 | [2022/33] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 27.04.2017 | |
AL | 16.10.2019 | ||
CY | 16.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2019 | ||
DK | 16.10.2019 | ||
EE | 16.10.2019 | ||
FI | 16.10.2019 | ||
HR | 16.10.2019 | ||
LT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LV | 16.10.2019 | ||
MC | 16.10.2019 | ||
MT | 16.10.2019 | ||
RO | 16.10.2019 | ||
RS | 16.10.2019 | ||
SE | 16.10.2019 | ||
SI | 16.10.2019 | ||
SK | 16.10.2019 | ||
SM | 16.10.2019 | ||
TR | 16.10.2019 | ||
BG | 16.01.2020 | ||
NO | 16.01.2020 | ||
GR | 17.01.2020 | ||
IS | 16.02.2020 | ||
PT | 17.02.2020 | ||
IE | 27.04.2020 | ||
LU | 27.04.2020 | ||
BE | 30.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AL | 16.10.2019 | |
CZ | 16.10.2019 | ||
DK | 16.10.2019 | ||
EE | 16.10.2019 | ||
FI | 16.10.2019 | ||
HR | 16.10.2019 | ||
LT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LV | 16.10.2019 | ||
MC | 16.10.2019 | ||
RO | 16.10.2019 | ||
RS | 16.10.2019 | ||
SE | 16.10.2019 | ||
SI | 16.10.2019 | ||
SK | 16.10.2019 | ||
SM | 16.10.2019 | ||
BG | 16.01.2020 | ||
NO | 16.01.2020 | ||
GR | 17.01.2020 | ||
IS | 16.02.2020 | ||
PT | 17.02.2020 | ||
IE | 27.04.2020 | ||
LU | 27.04.2020 | ||
BE | 30.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
Former [2021/13] | AL | 16.10.2019 | |
CZ | 16.10.2019 | ||
DK | 16.10.2019 | ||
EE | 16.10.2019 | ||
FI | 16.10.2019 | ||
HR | 16.10.2019 | ||
LT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LV | 16.10.2019 | ||
MC | 16.10.2019 | ||
RO | 16.10.2019 | ||
RS | 16.10.2019 | ||
SE | 16.10.2019 | ||
SI | 16.10.2019 | ||
SK | 16.10.2019 | ||
SM | 16.10.2019 | ||
BG | 16.01.2020 | ||
NO | 16.01.2020 | ||
GR | 17.01.2020 | ||
IS | 16.02.2020 | ||
PT | 17.02.2020 | ||
LU | 27.04.2020 | ||
BE | 30.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 16.10.2019 | |
CZ | 16.10.2019 | ||
DK | 16.10.2019 | ||
EE | 16.10.2019 | ||
FI | 16.10.2019 | ||
HR | 16.10.2019 | ||
LT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LV | 16.10.2019 | ||
MC | 16.10.2019 | ||
RO | 16.10.2019 | ||
RS | 16.10.2019 | ||
SE | 16.10.2019 | ||
SI | 16.10.2019 | ||
SK | 16.10.2019 | ||
SM | 16.10.2019 | ||
BG | 16.01.2020 | ||
NO | 16.01.2020 | ||
GR | 17.01.2020 | ||
IS | 16.02.2020 | ||
PT | 17.02.2020 | ||
LU | 27.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/52] | AL | 16.10.2019 | |
CZ | 16.10.2019 | ||
DK | 16.10.2019 | ||
EE | 16.10.2019 | ||
FI | 16.10.2019 | ||
HR | 16.10.2019 | ||
LT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LV | 16.10.2019 | ||
MC | 16.10.2019 | ||
RO | 16.10.2019 | ||
RS | 16.10.2019 | ||
SE | 16.10.2019 | ||
SI | 16.10.2019 | ||
SK | 16.10.2019 | ||
SM | 16.10.2019 | ||
BG | 16.01.2020 | ||
NO | 16.01.2020 | ||
GR | 17.01.2020 | ||
IS | 16.02.2020 | ||
PT | 17.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 16.10.2019 | |
CZ | 16.10.2019 | ||
DK | 16.10.2019 | ||
EE | 16.10.2019 | ||
FI | 16.10.2019 | ||
HR | 16.10.2019 | ||
LT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LV | 16.10.2019 | ||
RO | 16.10.2019 | ||
RS | 16.10.2019 | ||
SE | 16.10.2019 | ||
SI | 16.10.2019 | ||
SK | 16.10.2019 | ||
SM | 16.10.2019 | ||
BG | 16.01.2020 | ||
NO | 16.01.2020 | ||
GR | 17.01.2020 | ||
IS | 16.02.2020 | ||
PT | 17.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 16.10.2019 | |
CZ | 16.10.2019 | ||
DK | 16.10.2019 | ||
EE | 16.10.2019 | ||
FI | 16.10.2019 | ||
HR | 16.10.2019 | ||
LT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LV | 16.10.2019 | ||
RO | 16.10.2019 | ||
RS | 16.10.2019 | ||
SE | 16.10.2019 | ||
SK | 16.10.2019 | ||
SM | 16.10.2019 | ||
BG | 16.01.2020 | ||
NO | 16.01.2020 | ||
GR | 17.01.2020 | ||
IS | 16.02.2020 | ||
PT | 17.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 16.10.2019 | |
CZ | 16.10.2019 | ||
DK | 16.10.2019 | ||
EE | 16.10.2019 | ||
FI | 16.10.2019 | ||
HR | 16.10.2019 | ||
LT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LV | 16.10.2019 | ||
RO | 16.10.2019 | ||
RS | 16.10.2019 | ||
SE | 16.10.2019 | ||
BG | 16.01.2020 | ||
NO | 16.01.2020 | ||
GR | 17.01.2020 | ||
IS | 16.02.2020 | ||
PT | 17.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 16.10.2019 | |
CZ | 16.10.2019 | ||
FI | 16.10.2019 | ||
HR | 16.10.2019 | ||
LT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LV | 16.10.2019 | ||
RO | 16.10.2019 | ||
RS | 16.10.2019 | ||
SE | 16.10.2019 | ||
BG | 16.01.2020 | ||
NO | 16.01.2020 | ||
GR | 17.01.2020 | ||
PT | 17.02.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 16.10.2019 | |
FI | 16.10.2019 | ||
HR | 16.10.2019 | ||
LT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LV | 16.10.2019 | ||
RS | 16.10.2019 | ||
SE | 16.10.2019 | ||
BG | 16.01.2020 | ||
NO | 16.01.2020 | ||
GR | 17.01.2020 | ||
PT | 17.02.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/26] | FI | 16.10.2019 | |
HR | 16.10.2019 | ||
LT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LV | 16.10.2019 | ||
RS | 16.10.2019 | ||
SE | 16.10.2019 | ||
BG | 16.01.2020 | ||
NO | 16.01.2020 | ||
GR | 17.01.2020 | ||
PT | 17.02.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | FI | 16.10.2019 | |
LT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LV | 16.10.2019 | ||
SE | 16.10.2019 | ||
BG | 16.01.2020 | ||
NO | 16.01.2020 | ||
GR | 17.01.2020 | ||
PT | 17.02.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | FI | 16.10.2019 | |
LT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LV | 16.10.2019 | ||
SE | 16.10.2019 | ||
BG | 16.01.2020 | ||
NO | 16.01.2020 | ||
GR | 17.01.2020 | ||
PT | 17.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 16.10.2019 | |
LT | 16.10.2019 | ||
SE | 16.10.2019 | ||
BG | 16.01.2020 | ||
NO | 16.01.2020 | ||
PT | 17.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | NO | 16.01.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE102004041915 (VOELKL THOMAS [DE]) [A] 1-34 * paragraph [0098] - paragraph [0156]; figures 1-4 *; | [A]DE102007019106 (VOELKL THOMAS [DE]) [A] 1,23* paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0051]; figures 1-5 *; | [A]EP2366508 (TVI ENTWICKLUNG & PRODUCTION GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,23 * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0125]; figures 1a-2d * |