EP3239474 - TURBINE SEAL REPAIR PATCH AND METHODS OF REPAIRING TURBINE SEALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.07.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.09.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.05.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 29.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.01.2020 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [2017/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WORD, Jacob Wade 300 Garlington Road Greenville, SC 29615 / US | 02 /
KIDDER, Kyle Lee 300 Garlington Road Greenville, SC 29615 / US | 03 /
HENDERSON, Brian Leslie 300 Garlington Road Greenville, SC 29615 / US | 04 /
COOK, Paul Albert 300 Garlington Road Greenville, SC 29615 / US | [2017/44] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [N/P] |
Former [2017/44] | Pöpper, Evamaria General Electric Technology GmbH GE Corporate Intellectual Property Brown Boveri Strasse 7 5400 Baden / CH | Application number, filing date | 17168416.0 | 27.04.2017 | [2017/44] | Priority number, date | US201615139728 | 27.04.2016 Original published format: US201615139728 | [2017/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3239474 | Date: | 01.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.09.2017 | Classification | IPC: | F01D11/00 | [2017/44] | CPC: |
F01D11/00 (EP,KR,US);
F01D25/285 (KR);
F01D11/003 (CN);
F01D11/005 (US);
F01D25/00 (CN);
F02C7/20 (CN);
F02C7/28 (CN);
F16J15/061 (US);
F16J15/0812 (US);
F05D2220/32 (US);
F05D2230/232 (KR);
F05D2230/80 (EP,US);
F05D2240/55 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/24] |
Former [2017/44] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TURBINENDICHTUNGREPARATURPATCH UND VERFAHREN ZUR REPARATUR VON TURBINENDICHTUNGEN | [2017/44] | English: | TURBINE SEAL REPAIR PATCH AND METHODS OF REPAIRING TURBINE SEALS | [2017/44] | French: | PATCH DE RÉPARATION DE JOINT DE TURBINE ET PROCÉDÉS DE RÉPARATION DE JOINTS DE TURBINE | [2017/44] | Examination procedure | 27.04.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.04.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.05.2018 | Examination requested [2018/24] | 05.09.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.03.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/33] | 11.04.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP1734136 (ROLLS ROYCE PLC [GB]) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0024] - [0027]; figure 3 * [A] 8; | [A]US2008166233 (JOHNSON JERE A [US], et al) [A] 1,8* paragraphs [0016] - [0018]; figures 3,4 *; | [A]US2013082446 (PEZZUTTI MARK DEAN [US]) [A] 1,8 * paragraphs [0015] - [0017]; figure 2 * |