EP3241571 - BIOACTIVE SOFT TISSUE IMPLANT AND METHODS OF MANUFACTURE AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.05.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.06.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.02.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.10.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.05.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 06.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Howmedica Osteonics Corporation 325 Corporate Drive Mahwah, New Jersey 07430 / US | [2017/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHETH, Sonny 1440 Radbill Circle Berwyn, PA 19312 / US | 02 /
ARAZAWA, David 2173 Deer Run Drive Hummelstown, PA 17036 / US | 03 /
BURLEY, J. Brook 435 Chagall Street Montain View, CA 94041 / US | 04 /
SMITH, Sarah Elisabeth 1400 Hunters Lane West Chester, PA 19380 / US | 05 /
HAVENER, Matt 220 Bullock Avenue Conshohocken, PA 19428 / US | 06 /
SAN ANTONIO, James 641 Farnum Road Media, PA 19063 / US | [2020/11] |
Former [2017/45] | 01 /
SHETH, Sonny 1440 Radbill Circle BERWYN, PA Pennsylvania 19312 / US | ||
02 /
ARAZAWA, David 2173 Deer Run Drive Hummelstown, PA Pennsylvania 17036 / US | |||
03 /
BURLEY, J. Brook 435 Chagall Street MOUNTAIN VIEW, CA California 94041 / US | |||
04 /
SMITH, Sarah Elisabeth 1400 Hunters Lane WEST CHESTER, PA Pennsylvania 19380 / US | |||
05 /
HAVENER, Matt 220 Bullock Avenue CONSHOHOCKEN, PA Pennsylvania 19428 / US | |||
06 /
SAN ANTONIO, James 641 Farnum Road MEDIA, PA Pennsylvania 19063 / US | Representative(s) | Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | [2017/45] | Application number, filing date | 17169126.4 | 02.05.2017 | [2017/45] | Priority number, date | US201662330584P | 02.05.2016 Original published format: US 201662330584 P | [2017/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3241571 | Date: | 08.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3241571 | Date: | 22.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.10.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61L27/36, A61L27/46, A61L27/54, A61L31/00, A61L31/12, A61L31/16 | [2017/45] | CPC: |
A61L31/10 (EP);
A61F2/28 (US);
A61F2/30767 (US);
A61F2/4601 (US);
A61L27/02 (US);
A61L27/025 (US);
A61L27/3645 (US);
A61L27/365 (US);
A61L27/40 (US);
A61L31/005 (US);
A61L31/127 (US);
A61L31/16 (EP,US);
A61F2/30965 (US);
A61F2002/2835 (US);
A61F2002/3006 (US);
A61F2002/30062 (US);
A61F2002/3093 (US);
A61L2420/02 (EP,US);
A61L2420/04 (EP);
A61L2420/06 (US);
A61L27/26 (US);
C12N2533/18 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/25] |
Former [2017/45] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | BIOAKTIVES WEICHGEWEBEIMPLANTAT UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG UND VERWENDUNG | [2017/45] | English: | BIOACTIVE SOFT TISSUE IMPLANT AND METHODS OF MANUFACTURE AND USE THEREOF | [2017/45] | French: | IMPLANT DE TISSU MOU BIOACTIF ET LEURS PROCÉDÉS DE FABRICATION ET D'UTILISATION | [2017/45] | Examination procedure | 02.05.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.05.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.05.2018 | Examination requested [2018/25] | 17.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.12.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.02.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.06.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 09.06.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.06.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP20187075.5 / EP3782658 | EP24161724.0 / EP4356938 | Opposition(s) | 23.04.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.05.2017 | AL | 22.07.2020 | AT | 22.07.2020 | CY | 22.07.2020 | CZ | 22.07.2020 | DK | 22.07.2020 | EE | 22.07.2020 | ES | 22.07.2020 | FI | 22.07.2020 | HR | 22.07.2020 | IT | 22.07.2020 | LT | 22.07.2020 | LV | 22.07.2020 | MC | 22.07.2020 | MK | 22.07.2020 | MT | 22.07.2020 | NL | 22.07.2020 | PL | 22.07.2020 | RO | 22.07.2020 | RS | 22.07.2020 | SE | 22.07.2020 | SI | 22.07.2020 | SK | 22.07.2020 | SM | 22.07.2020 | BG | 22.10.2020 | NO | 22.10.2020 | GR | 23.10.2020 | IS | 22.11.2020 | PT | 23.11.2020 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 02.05.2017 | |
AL | 22.07.2020 | ||
AT | 22.07.2020 | ||
CY | 22.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.07.2020 | ||
DK | 22.07.2020 | ||
EE | 22.07.2020 | ||
ES | 22.07.2020 | ||
FI | 22.07.2020 | ||
HR | 22.07.2020 | ||
IT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LV | 22.07.2020 | ||
MC | 22.07.2020 | ||
MK | 22.07.2020 | ||
NL | 22.07.2020 | ||
PL | 22.07.2020 | ||
RO | 22.07.2020 | ||
RS | 22.07.2020 | ||
SE | 22.07.2020 | ||
SI | 22.07.2020 | ||
SK | 22.07.2020 | ||
SM | 22.07.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
GR | 23.10.2020 | ||
IS | 22.11.2020 | ||
PT | 23.11.2020 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 02.05.2017 | |
AL | 22.07.2020 | ||
AT | 22.07.2020 | ||
CY | 22.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.07.2020 | ||
DK | 22.07.2020 | ||
EE | 22.07.2020 | ||
ES | 22.07.2020 | ||
FI | 22.07.2020 | ||
HR | 22.07.2020 | ||
IT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LV | 22.07.2020 | ||
MC | 22.07.2020 | ||
NL | 22.07.2020 | ||
PL | 22.07.2020 | ||
RO | 22.07.2020 | ||
RS | 22.07.2020 | ||
SE | 22.07.2020 | ||
SI | 22.07.2020 | ||
SK | 22.07.2020 | ||
SM | 22.07.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
GR | 23.10.2020 | ||
IS | 22.11.2020 | ||
PT | 23.11.2020 | ||
Former [2023/29] | HU | 02.05.2017 | |
AL | 22.07.2020 | ||
AT | 22.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.07.2020 | ||
DK | 22.07.2020 | ||
EE | 22.07.2020 | ||
ES | 22.07.2020 | ||
FI | 22.07.2020 | ||
HR | 22.07.2020 | ||
IT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LV | 22.07.2020 | ||
MC | 22.07.2020 | ||
NL | 22.07.2020 | ||
PL | 22.07.2020 | ||
RO | 22.07.2020 | ||
RS | 22.07.2020 | ||
SE | 22.07.2020 | ||
SI | 22.07.2020 | ||
SK | 22.07.2020 | ||
SM | 22.07.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
GR | 23.10.2020 | ||
IS | 22.11.2020 | ||
PT | 23.11.2020 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 22.07.2020 | |
AT | 22.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.07.2020 | ||
DK | 22.07.2020 | ||
EE | 22.07.2020 | ||
ES | 22.07.2020 | ||
FI | 22.07.2020 | ||
HR | 22.07.2020 | ||
IT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LV | 22.07.2020 | ||
MC | 22.07.2020 | ||
NL | 22.07.2020 | ||
PL | 22.07.2020 | ||
RO | 22.07.2020 | ||
RS | 22.07.2020 | ||
SE | 22.07.2020 | ||
SI | 22.07.2020 | ||
SK | 22.07.2020 | ||
SM | 22.07.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
GR | 23.10.2020 | ||
IS | 22.11.2020 | ||
PT | 23.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 22.07.2020 | |
AT | 22.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.07.2020 | ||
DK | 22.07.2020 | ||
EE | 22.07.2020 | ||
ES | 22.07.2020 | ||
FI | 22.07.2020 | ||
HR | 22.07.2020 | ||
IT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LV | 22.07.2020 | ||
NL | 22.07.2020 | ||
PL | 22.07.2020 | ||
RO | 22.07.2020 | ||
RS | 22.07.2020 | ||
SE | 22.07.2020 | ||
SI | 22.07.2020 | ||
SK | 22.07.2020 | ||
SM | 22.07.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
GR | 23.10.2020 | ||
IS | 22.11.2020 | ||
PT | 23.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AL | 22.07.2020 | |
AT | 22.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.07.2020 | ||
DK | 22.07.2020 | ||
EE | 22.07.2020 | ||
ES | 22.07.2020 | ||
FI | 22.07.2020 | ||
HR | 22.07.2020 | ||
IT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LV | 22.07.2020 | ||
NL | 22.07.2020 | ||
PL | 22.07.2020 | ||
RO | 22.07.2020 | ||
RS | 22.07.2020 | ||
SE | 22.07.2020 | ||
SK | 22.07.2020 | ||
SM | 22.07.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
GR | 23.10.2020 | ||
IS | 22.11.2020 | ||
PT | 23.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 22.07.2020 | |
AT | 22.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.07.2020 | ||
DK | 22.07.2020 | ||
EE | 22.07.2020 | ||
ES | 22.07.2020 | ||
FI | 22.07.2020 | ||
HR | 22.07.2020 | ||
IT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LV | 22.07.2020 | ||
NL | 22.07.2020 | ||
PL | 22.07.2020 | ||
RO | 22.07.2020 | ||
RS | 22.07.2020 | ||
SE | 22.07.2020 | ||
SM | 22.07.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
GR | 23.10.2020 | ||
IS | 22.11.2020 | ||
PT | 23.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | AT | 22.07.2020 | |
CZ | 22.07.2020 | ||
DK | 22.07.2020 | ||
EE | 22.07.2020 | ||
ES | 22.07.2020 | ||
FI | 22.07.2020 | ||
HR | 22.07.2020 | ||
IT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LV | 22.07.2020 | ||
NL | 22.07.2020 | ||
PL | 22.07.2020 | ||
RO | 22.07.2020 | ||
RS | 22.07.2020 | ||
SE | 22.07.2020 | ||
SM | 22.07.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
GR | 23.10.2020 | ||
IS | 22.11.2020 | ||
PT | 23.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AT | 22.07.2020 | |
DK | 22.07.2020 | ||
ES | 22.07.2020 | ||
FI | 22.07.2020 | ||
HR | 22.07.2020 | ||
IT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LV | 22.07.2020 | ||
NL | 22.07.2020 | ||
PL | 22.07.2020 | ||
RS | 22.07.2020 | ||
SE | 22.07.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
GR | 23.10.2020 | ||
IS | 22.11.2020 | ||
PT | 23.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/17] | AT | 22.07.2020 | |
ES | 22.07.2020 | ||
FI | 22.07.2020 | ||
HR | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LV | 22.07.2020 | ||
NL | 22.07.2020 | ||
PL | 22.07.2020 | ||
RS | 22.07.2020 | ||
SE | 22.07.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
GR | 23.10.2020 | ||
IS | 22.11.2020 | ||
PT | 23.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 22.07.2020 | |
ES | 22.07.2020 | ||
FI | 22.07.2020 | ||
HR | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LV | 22.07.2020 | ||
PL | 22.07.2020 | ||
RS | 22.07.2020 | ||
SE | 22.07.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
GR | 23.10.2020 | ||
IS | 22.11.2020 | ||
PT | 23.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AT | 22.07.2020 | |
ES | 22.07.2020 | ||
FI | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
SE | 22.07.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
GR | 23.10.2020 | ||
PT | 23.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | ES | 22.07.2020 | |
FI | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
SE | 22.07.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
PT | 23.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 22.07.2020 | |
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2008081063 (WANG YUNBING [US], et al); | [I]US2011022085 (MURPHY WILLIAM L [US], et al) | by applicant | US2014039552 | US8821494 | US9445803 |