Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2022098327 | ![]() | 31.03.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201816005045 | 11.06.2018 | US201313766659 | 13.02.2013 | US201414262272 | 25.04.2014 | US201916688374 | 19.11.2019 | US201615257353 | 06.09.2016 | US202016842195 | 07.04.2020 | US23974709 | 03.09.2009 | US202117355587 | 23.06.2021 | US16063009 | 16.03.2009 | US72527210 | 16.03.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9605265 | ![]() | 28.03.2017 | B2 | US2014371294 | 18.12.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201313766659 | 13.02.2013 | US201414262272 | 25.04.2014 | US23974709 | 03.09.2009 | US16063009 | 16.03.2009 | US72527210 | 16.03.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8753638 | ![]() | 17.06.2014 | B2 | US2013243766 | 19.09.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201313766659 | 13.02.2013 | US23974709 | 03.09.2009 | US16063009 | 16.03.2009 | US72527210 | 16.03.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8404242 | ![]() | 26.03.2013 | B2 | US2010297149 | 25.11.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US23974709 | 03.09.2009 | US16063009 | 16.03.2009 | US72527210 | 16.03.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11078299 | ![]() | 03.08.2021 | B2 | US2020231704 | 23.07.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201816005045 | 11.06.2018 | US201313766659 | 13.02.2013 | US201414262272 | 25.04.2014 | US201916688374 | 19.11.2019 | US201615257353 | 06.09.2016 | US202016842195 | 07.04.2020 | US23974709 | 03.09.2009 | US16063009 | 16.03.2009 | US72527210 | 16.03.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10941214 | ![]() | 09.03.2021 | B2 | US2020216564 | 09.07.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201816005045 | 11.06.2018 | US201313766659 | 13.02.2013 | US201414262272 | 25.04.2014 | US201916688374 | 19.11.2019 | US201615257353 | 06.09.2016 | US23974709 | 03.09.2009 | US16063009 | 16.03.2009 | US72527210 | 16.03.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10526419 | ![]() | 07.01.2020 | B2 | US2019031775 | 31.01.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201816005045 | 11.06.2018 | US201313766659 | 13.02.2013 | US201414262272 | 25.04.2014 | US201615257353 | 06.09.2016 | US23974709 | 03.09.2009 | US16063009 | 16.03.2009 | US72527210 | 16.03.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10017582 | ![]() | 10.07.2018 | B2 | US2017114148 | 27.04.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201313766659 | 13.02.2013 | US201414262272 | 25.04.2014 | US201615257353 | 06.09.2016 | US23974709 | 03.09.2009 | US16063009 | 16.03.2009 | US72527210 | 16.03.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5730280B | ![]() | 03.06.2015 | B2 | JP2012520681 | 10.09.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | US23974709 | 03.09.2009 | WO2010US27525 | 16.03.2010 | US16063009 | 16.03.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2408905 | ![]() | 10.05.2017 | B1 | EP2408905 | 19.12.2012 | A4 | EP2408905 | 25.01.2012 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US23974709 | 03.09.2009 | WO2010US27525 | 16.03.2010 | US16063009 | 16.03.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN107574157 | ![]() | 12.01.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | CN201080020335 | 16.03.2010 | US23974709 | 03.09.2009 | US16063009 | 16.03.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN104830812B | ![]() | 05.09.2017 | B | CN104830812 | 12.08.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | CN201080020335 | 16.03.2010 | US23974709 | 03.09.2009 | US16063009 | 16.03.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102428175 | ![]() | 25.04.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | US23974709 | 03.09.2009 | WO2010US27525 | 16.03.2010 | US16063009 | 16.03.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2755784 | ![]() | 24.03.2020 | C | CA2755784 | 23.09.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US23974709 | 03.09.2009 | WO2010US27525 | 16.03.2010 | US16063009 | 16.03.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2010226726B | ![]() | 14.08.2014 | B8 | AU2010226726 | 14.08.2014 | A8 | AU2010226726B | 03.07.2014 | B2 | AU2010226726 | 20.10.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US23974709 | 03.09.2009 | WO2010US27525 | 16.03.2010 | US16063009 | 16.03.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3255146 | ![]() | 15.05.2019 | B1 | EP3255146 | 13.12.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US23974709 | 03.09.2009 | WO2010US27525 | 16.03.2010 | EP10753998 | 16.03.2010 | US16063009 | 16.03.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK2408905T | 28.08.2017 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US23974709 | 03.09.2009 | WO2010US27525 | 16.03.2010 | US16063009 | 16.03.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK3255146T | 19.08.2019 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US23974709 | 03.09.2009 | EP10753998 | 16.03.2010 | US16063009 | 16.03.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2638779T | 24.10.2017 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US23974709 | 03.09.2009 | WO2010US27525 | 16.03.2010 | US16063009 | 16.03.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2010107825 | ![]() | 03.03.2011 | A3 | WO2010107825 | 23.09.2010 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US23974709 | 03.09.2009 | US16063009 | 16.03.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2018046857 | ![]() | 29.03.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | US23974709 | 03.09.2009 | US16063009 | 16.03.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2017055768 | ![]() | 23.03.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US23974709 | 03.09.2009 | US16063009 | 16.03.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6166241B | ![]() | 19.07.2017 | B2 | JP2015034176 | 19.02.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US23974709 | 03.09.2009 | US16063009 | 16.03.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2742251T | 13.02.2020 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US23974709 | 03.09.2009 | US16063009 | 16.03.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1247243 | 28.02.2020 | B | Priority number | Date | US23974709 | 03.09.2009 | US16063009 | 16.03.2009 | Type | ![]() | EP2408905 |