EP3232485 - BENZIMIDAZO[1,2-A]BENZIMIDAZOLE DERIVATIVES FOR ELECTRONIC APPLICATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.09.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.10.2018 [2018/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UDC Ireland Limited Blanchardstown Corporate Park 2 Ballycoolin, Dublin 15 / IE | [2017/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHÄFER, Thomas Weidweg 15 d 4410 Liestal / CH | 02 /
BENEDITO, Flavio Luiz Sternstr. 40 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | 03 /
HEINEMEYER, Ute Gimmeldinger Str. 22 67433 Neustadt / DE | 04 /
LANGER, Nicolle Anne-Frank-Str.21 68623 Lampertheim / DE | 05 /
WOLLEB, Heinz Steinenbühlstr. 173 4232 Fehren / CH | 06 /
FIGUEIRA DUARTE, Teresa Marina Flat A 41/F Tower 6 Bel-Air No. 8 Hong Kong / CN | 07 /
WATANABE, Soichi 101-304 Park Tower Yongsan-dong 5-ga 24 Yongsan-gu 140-025 Seoul / KR | 08 /
LENNARTZ, Christian Hans-Purrmann-Str. 24 67105 Schifferstadt / DE | 09 /
WAGENBLAST, Gerhard Am Judenacker 8 67157 Wachenheim / DE | 10 /
WOLLEB, Annemarie Steinenbühlstr. 173 4232 Fehren / CH | 11 /
BARDON, Kristina Kalvarienbergstr. 5 79761 Waldshut / DE | [2017/42] | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/42] | Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 17169994.5 | 08.07.2013 | [2017/42] | Priority number, date | US201261669677P | 10.07.2012 Original published format: US 201261669677 P | EP20120175635 | 10.07.2012 Original published format: EP 12175635 | EP20120184786 | 18.09.2012 Original published format: EP 12184786 | US201261702267P | 18.09.2012 Original published format: US 201261702267 P | [2017/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3232485 | Date: | 18.10.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.08.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H01L51/00, G03G5/06 | [2017/42] | CPC: |
C07D487/04 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H10K85/6572 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C07D519/00 (EP,CN,US);
C09K11/025 (EP,US);
C09K11/06 (EP,US);
G03G5/0661 (EP,US);
H05B33/00 (EP,US);
H10K50/11 (EP,KR,US);
H10K50/15 (EP,KR,US);
H10K85/30 (EP,KR,US);
H10K85/342 (EP,KR,US);
H10K85/622 (EP,KR,US);
H10K85/657 (CN);
H10K85/6574 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H10K99/00 (US);
C09K2211/1007 (US);
C09K2211/1074 (US);
C09K2211/185 (US);
H10K2101/10 (EP,US);
H10K50/18 (EP,CN,US);
Y02E10/549 (EP,US);
Y02P70/50 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/42] | Title | German: | BENZIMIDAZO[1,2-A]BENZIMIDAZOL-DERIVATE FÜR ELEKTRONISCHE ANWENDUNGEN | [2017/42] | English: | BENZIMIDAZO[1,2-A]BENZIMIDAZOLE DERIVATIVES FOR ELECTRONIC APPLICATIONS | [2017/42] | French: | DÉRIVÉS DE BENZIMIDAZO[1,2-A]BENZIMIDAZOLE POUR APPLICATIONS ÉLECTRONIQUES | [2017/42] | Examination procedure | 08.05.2017 | Examination requested [2017/42] | 08.05.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.04.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/42] | 28.05.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/42] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP13739168.6 / EP2872512 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US6551723 (OKADA HISASHI [JP], et al); | [AD]US2005074632 (LEE SEOK-JONG [KR], et al); | [AD]US2010244006 (ISE TOSHIHIRO [JP], et al); | [AD]WO2011160757 (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE], et al) | by applicant | WO9947474 | WO0070655 | WO0141512 | JP2001160488 | US2001015432 | US2001019782 | WO0202714 | WO0215645 | US2002024293 | EP1191612 | EP1191613 | US2002048689 | US2002055014 | EP1211257 | US2002094453 | WO02060910 | US2002151456 | US6551723 | WO2005019373 | US2005074632 | US2005079387 | WO2005113704 | WO2006056418 | WO2006067074 | WO2006100298 | WO2006115301 | WO2006121811 | JP2007180147 | WO2007095118 | WO2007101820 | WO2007115970 | WO2007115981 | WO2008000727 | EP1885818 | WO2008034758 | WO2009050281 | WO2009050290 | WO2010056669 | WO2010079051 | WO2010086089 | US2010244006 | WO2010129323 | KR20110008784 | WO2011051404 | WO2011073149 | WO2011160757 | WO2012023947 | WO2012130709 | WO2013050401 | WO2008EP58106 | WO2008EP58207 | EP20100187176 |