EP3244648 - WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEMS COEXISTENCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.02.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.12.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.05.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 13.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.02.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.03.2021 [2021/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke KPN N.V. Wilhelminakade 123 3072 AP Rotterdam / NL | For all designated states Nederlandse Organisatie voor toegepast- natuurwetenschappelijk onderzoek TNO Anna van Buerenplein 1 2595 DA 's-Gravenhage / NL | [2018/24] |
Former [2017/46] | For all designated states Koninklijke KPN N.V. Maanplein 55 2516 CK The Hague / NL | ||
For all designated states Nederlandse Organisatie voor toegepast- natuurwetenschappelijk onderzoek TNO Anna van Buerenplein 1 2595 DA 's-Gravenhage / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TRICHIAS, Konstantinos Obrechtstraat 376 2517 VH The Hague / NL | 02 /
ZHANG, Haibin Laan van Nieuw Oosteinde 29 2274 EA Voorburg / NL | [2017/46] | Representative(s) | Wuyts, Koenraad Maria Koninklijke KPN N.V. Intellectual Property Group P.O. Box 25110 3001 HC Rotterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2017/46] | Wuyts, Koenraad Maria Koninklijke KPN N.V. Intellectual Property Group P.O. Box 95321 2509 CH Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 17170035.4 | 09.05.2017 | [2017/46] | Priority number, date | EP20160169394 | 12.05.2016 Original published format: EP 16169394 | [2017/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3244648 | Date: | 15.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.09.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04W16/14, H04W74/04 | [2017/46] | CPC: |
H04W16/14 (EP,US);
H04L47/562 (US);
H04L47/115 (US);
H04L47/125 (US);
H04L47/50 (US);
H04L47/58 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/25] |
Former [2017/46] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KOEXISTENZ VON DRAHTLOSKOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEMEN | [2017/46] | English: | WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEMS COEXISTENCE | [2017/46] | French: | COEXISTENCE DE SYSTÈMES DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL | [2017/46] | Examination procedure | 09.05.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.05.2018 | Examination requested [2018/25] | 30.08.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.12.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.09.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/10] | 03.11.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/10] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 30.09.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 30.09.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 15.10.2019 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 30.08.2018 | Request for further processing filed | 30.08.2018 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 14.09.2018 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]WO2015116789 (INTEL IP CORP [US]) [X] 6,8,14 * paragraphs [0034] , [ 0036] , [ 0047] , [ 0069] , [ 0070]; figures 5, 10 * [Y] 1-5,10-13,15 [I] 7,9; | [A]WO2015174748 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0108] - [0110] - [ 117] , [ 138] - [0147]; figures 4, 5, 10 *; | [XYI]US2016095110 (LI YONG GORDON [US], et al) [X] 6,8,14 * paragraphs [0061] , [ 0109] - [0114] - [ 0180] - [0185]; figures 1, 22, 23, 27, 29 * [Y] 1-5,10-13,15 [I] 7,9; | [A]US2016105897 (LIU JIALING [US], et al) [A] 1-15* paragraphs [0079] - [0082]; figures 11B, 11D, 12, 14 * |