EP3252664 - METHOD FOR FINGERPRINT TEMPLATE UPDATE AND TERMINAL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.07.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Refusal of application | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP., LTD. No. 18 Haibin Road Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2019/50] | For all designated states GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP., LTD. No. 18 Haibin Road Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan Guangdong 523860 / CN | ||
Former [2017/49] | For all designated states Guangdong Oppo Mobile Telecommunications Corp., Ltd. No.18 Haibin Road Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHOU, Yibao Guangdong Oppo Mobile Telecommunications Corp., Ltd. No.18 Haibin Road Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong / CN | [2017/49] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/49] | Johnson, Richard Alan, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | Application number, filing date | 17170324.2 | 10.05.2017 | [2017/49] | Priority number, date | CN201610375553 | 30.05.2016 Original published format: CN201610375553 | [2017/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3252664 | Date: | 06.12.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.10.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G06K9/00, G06K9/03 | [2017/49] | CPC: |
G06V40/12 (EP,US);
G06V40/1365 (CN);
G06F16/2358 (CN);
G06V10/993 (EP,US);
G06V40/1347 (CN);
G06V40/1353 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/49] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR AKTUALISIERUNG EINER FINGERABDRUCKSCHABLONE UND ENDGERÄTEVORRICHTUNG | [2017/49] | English: | METHOD FOR FINGERPRINT TEMPLATE UPDATE AND TERMINAL DEVICE | [2017/49] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE MISE À JOUR DE MODÈLES D'EMPREINTES DIGITALES ET DISPOSITIF DE TERMINAL | [2017/49] | Examination procedure | 10.05.2017 | Examination requested [2017/49] | 10.05.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.04.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.07.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.11.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.12.2019 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2020/33] | 06.12.2019 | Date of oral proceedings | 24.02.2020 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 26.02.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2020/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]JP2007011764 (CASIO COMPUTER CO LTD) [X] 1,7,13,14 * claims 1, 6 * [Y] 2,3,8,9,15 [I] 4-6,10-12; | [A]CN101499130 (SHENZHEN PULUOBAKE SCIENCE & T [CN]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]EP2416274 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [XYI]US2013038426 (YAMADA SHIGEFUMI [JP]) [X] 1,7,13,14 * paragraph [0051]; claim 1 * [Y] 2,3,8,9,15 [I] 4-6,10-12; | [XI]US9195879 (DU ELIZA YINGZI [US], et al) [X] 1-4,7-10,13-15 * abstract * * column 2, line 21 - line 29 * * column 18, paragraph 8 - paragraph 23 * * column 18, line 42 - column 19, line 11; figure 1F * [I] 5,6,11,12; | [Y]CN105303176 (GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMM) [Y] 2,3,8,9,15 * claim 6 *; | [A]CN105389565 (GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP LTD) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]CN105447454 (GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP LTD) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * |