EP3226560 - LOW-COMPLEXITY INTRA PREDICTION FOR VIDEO CODING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.08.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.04.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NTT DoCoMo, Inc. 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | [2017/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOSSEN, Frank Jan c/o DOCOMO Communications Laboratories USA, Inc. 3240 Hillview Avenue Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | 02 /
TAN, Thiow Keng 24 Jalan Sindor 808379 Singapore / SG | [2019/36] |
Former [2017/40] | 01 /
BOSSEN, Frank Jan c/o DOCOMO Communications Laboratories USA, Inc. 3240 Hillview Avenue Palo Alto, CA California 94304 / US | ||
02 /
TAN, Thiow Keng 24 Jalan Sindor 808379 Singapore / SG | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Brauhaus 8 01099 Dresden / DE | [2017/40] | Application number, filing date | 17170581.7 | 14.07.2011 | [2017/40] | Priority number, date | US20100364322P | 14.07.2010 Original published format: US 364322 P | US20100388541P | 30.09.2010 Original published format: US 388541 P | [2017/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3226560 | Date: | 04.10.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3226560 | Date: | 04.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.07.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04N19/176, H04N19/61, H04N19/82, H04N19/11, H04N19/593 | [2017/40] | CPC: |
H04N19/593 (EP,BR,KR,RU,US);
H04N19/44 (RU);
H04N19/11 (EP,BR,KR,US);
H04N19/176 (EP,BR,KR,US);
H04N19/61 (EP,BR,KR,US);
H04N19/82 (EP,BR,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/18] |
Former [2017/40] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | INTRAPRÄDIKTION FÜR VIDEOKODIERUNGEN MIT GERINGER KOMPLEXITÄT | [2019/18] | English: | LOW-COMPLEXITY INTRA PREDICTION FOR VIDEO CODING | [2017/40] | French: | PRÉDICTION INTRA DE FAIBLE COMPLEXITÉ POUR CODAGE VIDÉO | [2017/40] |
Former [2017/40] | INTRAPRÄDIKTION ZUR VIDEOCODIERUNGEN MIT GERINGER KOMPLEXITÄT | Examination procedure | 11.05.2017 | Examination requested [2017/40] | 11.05.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.03.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.04.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.07.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 22.07.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.07.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP11807512.6 / EP2594076 | EP15169606.9 / EP2934009 | Divisional application(s) | EP19183613.9 / EP3570545 | Opposition(s) | 05.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 07.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.07.2011 | AL | 04.09.2019 | AT | 04.09.2019 | CY | 04.09.2019 | DK | 04.09.2019 | EE | 04.09.2019 | FI | 04.09.2019 | HR | 04.09.2019 | LT | 04.09.2019 | LV | 04.09.2019 | MC | 04.09.2019 | MK | 04.09.2019 | MT | 04.09.2019 | RS | 04.09.2019 | SI | 04.09.2019 | SM | 04.09.2019 | BG | 04.12.2019 | GR | 05.12.2019 | IS | 05.01.2020 | [2022/33] |
Former [2022/28] | HU | 14.07.2011 | |
AL | 04.09.2019 | ||
AT | 04.09.2019 | ||
CY | 04.09.2019 | ||
DK | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
MC | 04.09.2019 | ||
MT | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SI | 04.09.2019 | ||
SM | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
IS | 05.01.2020 | ||
Former [2021/15] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
AT | 04.09.2019 | ||
DK | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
MC | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SI | 04.09.2019 | ||
SM | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
IS | 05.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
AT | 04.09.2019 | ||
DK | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SI | 04.09.2019 | ||
SM | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
IS | 05.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
AT | 04.09.2019 | ||
DK | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SM | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
IS | 05.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/28] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
AT | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SM | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/26] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
AT | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
AT | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | FI | 04.09.2019 | |
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | FI | 04.09.2019 | |
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | FI | 04.09.2019 | |
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | LT | 04.09.2019 |