EP3260943 - PREDICTION METHODS AND SYSTEMS FOR STRUCTURAL REPAIR DURING HEAVY MAINTENANCE OF AIRCRAFT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 18.12.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.02.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.12.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 20.01.2021 [2021/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago, IL 60606-1596 / US | [2017/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ethington, James M. c/o The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago, 60606-1596 / US | 02 /
Sturlaugson, Liessman c/o The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago, 60606-1596 / US | [2017/52] | Representative(s) | Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | [2017/52] | Application number, filing date | 17170615.3 | 11.05.2017 | [2017/52] | Priority number, date | US201615192700 | 24.06.2016 Original published format: US201615192700 | [2017/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3260943 | Date: | 27.12.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.07.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G05B23/02, G06Q10/06 | [2017/52] | CPC: |
G05B23/024 (EP);
G06F30/15 (US);
G05B23/0283 (EP,US);
G06N5/022 (US);
G06Q10/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/52] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEME ZUR VORHERSAGE STRUKTURELLER REPARATUREN BEI SCHWERER WARTUNG EINES FLUGZEUGS | [2017/52] | English: | PREDICTION METHODS AND SYSTEMS FOR STRUCTURAL REPAIR DURING HEAVY MAINTENANCE OF AIRCRAFT | [2017/52] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET SYSTÈMES DE PRÉVISION DE RÉPARATION DE STRUCTURE LORS D'UN ENTRETIEN DE GRANDE ENVERGURE D'UN AÉRONEF | [2017/52] | Examination procedure | 11.05.2017 | Examination requested [2017/52] | 11.05.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.06.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.02.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.06.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.12.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 14.12.2020 | 14.12.2020 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 15.12.2020 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2021/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0195174 (BAE SYSTEMS PLC [GB], et al) [A] 1-14 * abstract *; | [A]US2008021604 (BOUVIER KEN D [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * abstract *; | [A]US2008154458 (BRANDSTETTER JASON C [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * abstract *; | [I]US2012221193 (DELAYE GUILLAUME [FR], et al) [I] 1-14 * abstract * * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0042]; figure 1 *; | [A] - LUO WEI, "Prediction of the aircraft fault maintenance sorties based on least squares of linear regression", SYSTEM SCIENCE, ENGINEERING DESIGN AND MANUFACTURING INFORMATIZATION (ICSEM), 2012 3RD INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, (20121020), doi:10.1109/ICSSEM.2012.6340849, ISBN 978-1-4673-0914-1, pages 223 - 225, XP032468050 [A] 1-14 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICSSEM.2012.6340849 | [AP] - Alexander Kählert, "Specification and Evaluation of Prediction Concepts in Aircraft Maintenance Spezifikation und Evaluierung von Prädiktionskonzepten in der Flugzeuginstandhaltung", (20170404), URL: http://tuprints.ulb.tu-darmstadt.de/6065/, (20170711), XP055389755 [AP] 1-14 * page 155 - page 166 * |